Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Taylor, Kelly, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Rahman, Mustafa Abdul, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Charles J Umeda presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2022 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a notice for a small claims hearing in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Fontana District. The case number is SCVA2200982. The plaintiff, Kelly Taylor, filed the claim on 03/30/2022, seeking an amount of $7...
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles
Date: March 06, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 17, 2023Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 17, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 02, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed re:
Date: August 24, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 24, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: September 30, 2022Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles
Date: August 23, 2022Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed
Date: April 15, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed
Date: January 30, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: November 01, 2022Notice of Appeal on the Denial of the Motion to Vacate
Date: September 21, 2022Request for Action Filed
Date: February 24, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 21, 2023ORAP Returned Served Filed with Costs of:
Date: June 26, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed
Date: May 31, 2022Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: September 08, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: August 16, 2023Order to Quash Writ Issued
Date: February 17, 2023Stipulation & Order re: Appointment of Judge Pro Tem filed
Date: May 25, 2022Claim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed
Date: March 30, 2022Motion to Vacate - Small Claims Judgment Filed
Date: June 30, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: July 24, 2023Order Regarding Remote Appearance
Date: September 28, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: September 27, 2022Declaration & Order re:
Date: February 17, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 01, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2023 |
Department F6 - Fontana
Judge: Driessen, Robert |
||
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Application for Order for Examination Filed | |
September 07, 2023 |
Department F5 - Fontana
Judge: Umeda, Charles J |
||
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: SEE ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
July 20, 2023 |
Department F8 - Fontana
Judge: Thornton-Harris, Stephanie |
||
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ORAP Returned Served Filed with Costs of: | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Application for Order for Examination Filed AS TO MUSTAFA ABDUL RAHMON |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles ISSUED AT WINDOW2 AND HANDED TO PLAINTIFF/ APPROVED BY ZACH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.