Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lizama, Celeste Lucero, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Grijalvarocha, Mario Albino, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Driessen, Robert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a notice for a small claims hearing in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Fontana District. The case number is SCVA2101744. The plaintiff, Celeste Lucero Lizama, filed a claim on 07/01/2021 for an amount of ...
Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted
Date: July 01, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 01, 2021Claim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed
Date: August 24, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted
Date: January 26, 2022Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino
Date: January 26, 2022Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: March 30, 2022Declaration & Order re:
Date: March 30, 2022Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino
Date: April 07, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted
Date: April 14, 2022Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles
Date: April 14, 2022Writ Returned
Date: April 14, 2022Writ Returned
Date: November 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document Received RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned LOS ANGELES COUNTY, UNSATISFIED, COSTS OF $0.00 |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted WRIT |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles ISSUED AT WINDOW |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned SAN BERNARDINO UNSTISFIED WITH COSTS OF 0.00 |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees Filed | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino CALLED CUSTOMER FOR PICK UP |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of COSTS $0.00/ INTEREST $550.41 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.