Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Doe , Jane, Suchard , David, Suchard , Jody, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Weaver, Jack W., against Sonoma Academy, represented by Abernethy, Ryan Edward, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Pardo, Oscar A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePardo, Oscar A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2022 |
Category07: Unlimited Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Management Statement
Date: August 23, 20232306375_Proposed_Amended_o_SAC_4252701x9DE17_
Date: April 08, 20242291541_Respondents_Noti_ppeal_4201257x9DE17_
Date: February 28, 2024Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: February 24, 2024POS - Appeal
Date: February 16, 2024Sonoma Academy Class_Notice of Appeal.
Date: February 16, 2024Response to Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal
Date: February 16, 20242271429_NOE_re_Sonoma_Ac_o_SAC_4132460x9DE17_
Date: January 05, 2024Summons
Date: June 10, 2022CCCS
Date: June 10, 2022Sonoma Academy Class Action Complaint-all plaintiffs-NS
Date: June 10, 2022CV-1
Date: June 13, 2022Proof of Service of Summons (SA)
Date: July 18, 20222257193_Academy_Demurrer_ing_4095624_3x9DE17_
Date: December 14, 2023Points and Authorities ISO Sonoma Academy's Demurrer to Class Action Complaint (3580784x9DE17)
Date: September 07, 2022Sonoma Academy's Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Class Action Complaint (3580779x9DE17)
Date: September 07, 2022Decl. of Ryan Abernethy ISO Sonoma Academy's Demurrer w-Exhibits (3580775x9DE17)
Date: September 07, 20222109566 - Academy Notice of Posting Jury Fees (3604603x9DE17)
Date: September 28, 20222109566 - Academy CMS (CMC 10-13-22) (3604087x9DE17)
Date: September 28, 2022Sonoma Academy Class_CMC Statement Plaintiffs
Date: September 28, 2022Opposition to demurrer-Final
Date: January 26, 2023Proof of Service - 01-26-23
Date: January 26, 20232151007_Academy_REPLY_IS_laint_3707434x9DE17_
Date: February 02, 20232157491_NOE_re_Sonoma_Academy_Demurrer
Date: February 22, 2023Sonoma Academy Class Action First Amended Complaint-V4-Clean-Final
Date: March 04, 2023Sonoma Academy Class_CMC Statement Plaintiff
Date: March 21, 20232167191_Sonoma_Academy_C_8_23_3748181x9DE17_
Date: March 22, 20232176182_Academy_Demurrer_C_MPA_3821630x9DE17_
Date: April 17, 20232176182_Academy_Demurrer_urrer_3821423x9DE17_
Date: April 17, 20232176182_Academy_Demurrer_nethy_3821432x9DE17_
Date: April 17, 20232177736_Academy_Demurrer_Date_3831369x9DE17_
Date: April 20, 20232181374 - Academy's Motion for Protective Order - Notice (3843537x9DE17)
Date: May 02, 20232185813_Academy_s_Motion_otice_3857151x9DE17_
Date: May 12, 2023Opposition to Demurrer to FAC-Final
Date: June 01, 20232195243_Academy_Reply_re_n_FAC_3890548x9DE17_
Date: June 09, 20232195243_Academy_Reply_re_nethy_3890558x9DE17_
Date: June 09, 20232023-06-14 Case Management Statement
Date: June 14, 20232023-06-14 Proof of Service
Date: June 14, 20232196904_Sonoma_Academy_C_29_23_3900768x9DE17_
Date: June 14, 20232023-06-21 Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: June 21, 20232023-06-21 Proof of Service
Date: June 21, 2023Seperate Statement
Date: June 21, 2023Proof of Service
Date: June 21, 2023points and authorities in support of opp
Date: June 21, 20232201564_Academy_s_Reply_r_MPA_3925713x9DE17_
Date: June 28, 2023Order re Demurrer
Date: June 27, 20232202004_Stip_and_Propose_Order_3927723x9DE17_
Date: June 28, 20232202004_decl_in_sup_of_motion
Date: June 28, 2023Ntc. Entry of Order
Date: June 29, 2023Second Amended Class Action Complaint
Date: July 26, 2023Proposed Order
Date: August 02, 2023Ntc. Entry of Order
Date: August 03, 20232222821_CMS_CMC_9_7_23_3998807x9DE17_
Date: August 23, 20232224050_Academy_Demurrer_r_4001507x9DE17_002_
Date: August 25, 20232224050_Academy_Demurrer_A_4001579x9DE17_002_
Date: August 25, 20232224050_Academy_Demurrer_y_4001582x9DE17_002_
Date: August 25, 2023Opposition to Demurrer to SAC-Final
Date: October 26, 20232250003_Academy_Reply_re_n_SAC_4079724x9DE17_
Date: November 02, 20232251256_Academy_Demurrer_nethy_4082699x9DE17_
Date: November 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal cont from 11/30 for status of case and possible dismissal Judge: Pardo, Oscar A |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing / Transmittial of Record on Appeal | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate Regarding Appendix | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | 2306375_Proposed_Amended_o_SAC_4252701x9DE17_ | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Ntc of Estimate for Appellant's Copy of Clerk's Transcript | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Clerk's Estimate Worksheet | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Estimated Cost to Prepare Reporter's Transcripts Amended to Respondent |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Estimated Cost to Prepare Reporter's Transcripts | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
DCA File Number A169841 D3 |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Notification of the Filing of an Appeal/Cross-Appeal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.