Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Valera, Susan Foppiano, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Carter, Brian Charles, De Martini, James F., Wayland, Gregory, against All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Interest In The Property, Foppiano, Helaine N, Foppiano, Louis M, Foppiano, Paul, Hocker, Gina M, (total of 5) See All represented by Mccutchan, B. Edward, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Honigsberg, Christopher M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHonigsberg, Christopher M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
Category26: Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Management Statement
Date: February 14, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: December 16, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: October 17, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 13, 202294511Stipu00ebba
Date: March 22, 2024CMS 4-9-24
Date: March 22, 20242024 03-19 CMC STT
Date: March 19, 202492716Reply01a4c7
Date: February 26, 202492716Proof00aad6
Date: February 26, 20242024 02-22 OPPO Mtn Approval of Ref Fees - PnA
Date: February 23, 20242024 02-22 OPPO Mtn Apprvl Ref Fees AMND POS
Date: February 23, 20242024 02-22 OPPO Mtn Approval of Ref Fees - RJN
Date: February 23, 20242024 02-22 OPPO Mtn Apprvl of Ref Fees Dec EAF
Date: February 23, 202490816Suppl00a293
Date: January 26, 202490541Proof002310
Date: January 23, 202489722Proof0011f9
Date: January 10, 202489517Notic004fef
Date: January 05, 202489517Memor010196
Date: January 05, 2024NOM_05042022
Date: May 05, 2022RJN_05042022
Date: May 05, 2022Evidence_05042022
Date: May 05, 2022SepStm_05042022
Date: May 05, 2022CMCStmValeraMay522
Date: May 05, 2022NoticeUnavailabilityCounsel
Date: May 24, 202288337Propo027969
Date: December 14, 202388337Proof03a15a
Date: December 13, 202388337ExPar007643
Date: December 13, 202388337Decla015b0b
Date: December 13, 202387311CaseM00e408
Date: November 28, 20232023 12-12 CMC STT
Date: November 27, 2023Declaration of Paul Foppiano
Date: July 26, 2022Objections
Date: July 26, 2022Separate Statement
Date: July 26, 2022Declaration of Edward McCutchan
Date: July 26, 2022Memorandum of Points and Aauthorities
Date: July 26, 2022ReplyOct0722_
Date: October 07, 2022Proposed_OrderCoverSheet_utoryJudgmentOct2422
Date: October 25, 2022Proposed_OrderMSAReInter_toryJudgmentOct2422
Date: October 26, 2022CMCStmSValeraOct2722
Date: October 28, 2022AmdCMCStmOct2822
Date: October 28, 2022OrderProposedPerTentativemtd_2
Date: November 01, 2022NotEntryOrder
Date: November 02, 202220221212135541217
Date: December 13, 2022Declaration_of_Gregory_P_Wayland_2
Date: December 23, 2022Objections to Proposed Referee Linda Pond
Date: December 29, 2022Objections
Date: December 30, 2022Proposed_Interlocutory_J__mmary_Adjudication_2
Date: January 03, 2023Declaration of Edward McCutchan
Date: January 11, 2023Declaration of Gary Weiner
Date: March 02, 2023Declaration of Edward McCutchan
Date: March 15, 2023Valera_Linda_Pond_Decl_
Date: March 15, 2023POS_Valera_Linda_Pond_Decl_
Date: March 15, 2023Objections
Date: March 16, 2023ValeraPOS
Date: March 17, 2023ValeraObjection
Date: March 17, 202373411Propo00de08
Date: April 05, 20232023 05-16 Assoc. of Counsel-L. Foppiano
Date: May 16, 20232023 05-22 Proposed Order
Date: May 22, 20232023 05-22 MPA
Date: May 22, 20232023 05-22 Notice
Date: May 22, 20232023 05-22 Decl. of EAF
Date: May 22, 20232023 05-22 RJN
Date: May 22, 20232023 05-31 POS Foppiano
Date: May 31, 20232023 06-08 Decl. EAF iso Oppo
Date: June 08, 20232023 06-08 Oppo. to Ex Parte Appl
Date: June 08, 2023Dec_re_Valera
Date: June 07, 2023Dec
Date: June 07, 2023Ex_Parte_app
Date: June 07, 2023Proposed_Order
Date: June 08, 20232023 06-22 Ex Parte Appl and Dec
Date: June 22, 20232023 06-22 Prop. Order Ex Parte Appl
Date: June 22, 20232023 06-22 NOE-Order re OST
Date: June 22, 2023781521OPPO0046f4
Date: June 28, 202378152Propo02b542
Date: June 28, 202378152DECLA01871c
Date: June 28, 202378152Proof039779
Date: June 28, 2023POS
Date: June 30, 2023Proposed Order (Reply)
Date: June 30, 20232023 06-30 Decl. EAF reply
Date: June 30, 20232023 06-30 Meet Conf. Decl.
Date: June 30, 20232023 06-30 Reply Brief
Date: June 30, 202379275CaseM007805
Date: July 20, 202379275Proof015eb1
Date: July 20, 20232023 07-17 CMC Stmt-Foppiano
Date: July 17, 20232023 07-10 Proposed Order-Foppiano
Date: July 11, 202379899Memor01dbde
Date: August 01, 202379899Notic000134
Date: August 01, 202379899Proof02ab50
Date: August 01, 202380022Notic00c47d
Date: August 03, 202380022Proof01be25
Date: August 03, 20232023 08-03 RJN iso Oppo
Date: August 03, 20232023 08-03 Oppo to L. Pond Ex Parte august
Date: August 03, 20232023 08-03 Oppo to L. Pond Ex Parte
Date: August 03, 20232023 08-03 Decl. of EAF iso Oppo
Date: August 03, 20232023 08-03 POS Oppo
Date: August 03, 202379899Propo038d5a
Date: August 04, 20232023 07-10 Proposed Order-Foppiano
Date: August 08, 20232023 08-10 NOE Order Pet. for Ins.
Date: August 10, 202380548Proof018c70
Date: August 11, 202380548Subst001de4
Date: August 11, 202380901Proof000ff7
Date: August 17, 202381270Memor0490e6
Date: August 23, 202381270Notic00e72f
Date: August 23, 202381270Memor016cf3
Date: August 23, 202381270Notic035d97
Date: August 23, 202381723Memor01b015
Date: August 29, 202381723Notic00e53f
Date: August 29, 202381723Memor04ded1
Date: August 29, 202381723Notic03c8b7
Date: August 29, 202383197ExPar0089c7
Date: September 20, 202383197Decla023fdd
Date: September 20, 202383197Decla01544b
Date: September 20, 20232023 10-11 DEC Resp Referees Mtn for Sale
Date: October 11, 20232023 10-11 RJN Resp Referees Mtn for Sale
Date: October 11, 20232023 10-11 PA Resp Referees Mtn for Sale
Date: October 11, 20232023 10-11 POS Ref MTN for Sale
Date: October 11, 202385002Decla00caa7
Date: October 19, 202385002Proof01dc10
Date: October 19, 202386219DECLA0220ba
Date: November 07, 202386219Proof038c38
Date: November 07, 202385575Propo00478b
Date: October 30, 202386275Proof001218
Date: November 08, 202386054ORDER004bc0
Date: November 06, 202386219NOTIC009d44
Date: November 07, 202386276Proof00012e
Date: November 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Cont'd from 12/12/23 for status following Motion to be Relieved Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order Approving Proposed Distribution of Proceeds of Sale, Authorizing Referee to Make Distribution, Approving Referee and Attorney Fees and Costs, and Discharging Referee Upon Filing of Receipts |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw
Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 94511Stipu00ebba | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | CMS 4-9-24 | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024 03-19 CMC STT | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Referee Fees and Costs and Approving Attorney Fees and Costs |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for Approval of Referee Fees and Costs and Approval of Attorney Fees and Costs (Motions) Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.