Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Duggan, Sean, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mccurdy, Lisa Christine, against Duggan, Lynn, Moffat, Kelly, The Duggan Family Limited Partnership, represented by Bluestone, Marshall E, Olsen, Anne Frassetto, Shklovsky, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with DeMeo, Bradford presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeMeo, Bradford Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2021 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
96486Notic0004ca
Date: April 22, 2024Case Management Statement
Date: March 09, 2022Joint Case Management Statement
Date: April 03, 20242024 04 03 DFLP CMC Stmt
Date: April 03, 2024LA507633 - CMS
Date: April 03, 202490772PROPO002b99
Date: January 26, 202490259SUPPL00637a
Date: January 18, 202489974Joind009e41
Date: January 12, 20242-Declaration of A. Olsen ISO Opposition - Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: January 12, 20244-Declaration of Dr. Dutton ISO Opposition to Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: January 12, 20241-Opposition - Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: January 12, 20243-Declaration of L. Duggan ISO Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: January 12, 20242024 01 12 Joinder
Date: January 12, 202489649DECLA0179fe
Date: January 09, 202489649STIPU000dec
Date: January 09, 202452930Decla013c51
Date: February 03, 202252930Oppos0007ca
Date: February 03, 202252930Decla02e559
Date: February 03, 202252930Proof03a0a7
Date: February 03, 20222022 02-03 Notice of Errata re Dec of Turner
Date: February 03, 20222022 02-08 Reply to Opposition
Date: February 08, 202254401Moffa0041d9
Date: March 07, 202254411NOTIC0030b3
Date: March 07, 20222022 03-09 Our CMC Stmt
Date: March 09, 2022General Denial with Affirmative Defenses.1
Date: March 09, 2022Notice of Jury Fee Deposit
Date: March 09, 20222022 03-11 Def DFLP's Answer
Date: March 11, 202254653Answe008d17
Date: March 11, 202256162NOTIC00b2fe
Date: April 13, 2022Proof of Service
Date: May 03, 2022McCurdy Declaration
Date: May 03, 2022Ntc and Motion
Date: May 03, 2022Memo of Points & Authorities
Date: May 03, 2022Sean Duggan Declaration
Date: May 03, 2022Proposed Order
Date: May 03, 20222022 05-11 Declaration of Moffat ISO
Date: May 12, 20222022 05-11 Declaration of Duggan ISO
Date: May 12, 20222022 05-11 Declaration of Geisberg ISO
Date: May 12, 20222022 05-11 Opposition to Motion for Receiver
Date: May 12, 20222022 05-11 Declaration of Shapiro ISO
Date: May 12, 20222022 05-11 POS of Opposition Docs
Date: May 12, 20222022 05-11 Declaration of Turner ISO
Date: May 12, 2022Duggan Decl ISO Reply
Date: May 13, 2022Reply ISO Motion
Date: May 13, 20222022 05-13 Supp Declaration of Duggan ISO
Date: May 13, 20222022 05-16 Defs' Objection to Evidence
Date: May 16, 202257792PLAIN0051a5
Date: May 18, 202257792TENTA01db00
Date: May 18, 202257829SUPPL007d31
Date: May 18, 202259306Oppos00ce9a
Date: June 21, 202259306Blues011154
Date: June 21, 202259306LynnD02432c
Date: June 21, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: June 21, 202259306Reque04a9e5
Date: June 21, 2022Memo of P&As ISO Ex Parte
Date: June 21, 202259313Proof00524f
Date: June 21, 202259306Turne036083
Date: June 21, 2022Decl of McCurdy ISO Ex Parte
Date: June 21, 2022Coversheet - Prop Order on Ex Parte
Date: June 21, 2022Decl of Duggan ISO Ex Parte
Date: June 21, 2022SEAN - Ntc of Entry of Order
Date: June 22, 202288762DECLA0268ad
Date: December 21, 202388762DECLA01b368
Date: December 21, 202388762NOTIC003bd0
Date: December 21, 202388728Notic00c684
Date: December 20, 202388565Notic006ad3
Date: December 18, 202354544CaseM000600
Date: March 09, 2022Stipulation - Leave to File Amended General Denial; Order
Date: February 01, 202370924DECLA028cc7
Date: February 15, 202370924DECLA03dd41
Date: February 15, 202370924PLAIN00b64e
Date: February 15, 202370924Propo04fd84
Date: February 15, 202370924PLAIN01dd6e
Date: February 15, 202371818EXPAR008feb
Date: March 03, 2023Request for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: April 27, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: April 27, 2023Declaration of E. Reed ISO to Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: April 27, 2023Def Oppo to Motion to Compel
Date: April 27, 202374885Oppos001ff6
Date: April 28, 202374885Moffa01f4c2
Date: April 28, 202375158PLAIN00c449
Date: May 03, 202375158PLAIN01b67b
Date: May 03, 202376087Motio00af93
Date: May 19, 202376321Propo007114
Date: May 24, 202376629NOTIC005b6f
Date: May 31, 202377434SECON006654
Date: June 15, 2023Def DFLP Non Oppo To Motion To File SAC
Date: July 18, 202378931Joind00e97e
Date: July 13, 2023Statement of Non-Opposition - Motion for Leave to File SAC
Date: July 13, 202379891Decla02a74c
Date: August 01, 2023Defendants Request For Judicial Notice
Date: August 01, 202379891ExPar004ef7
Date: August 01, 2023Def Oppo to Ex Parte TRO
Date: August 01, 2023Dec of Leon iso Opposition
Date: August 01, 2023Dec of MEB iso of Opposition
Date: August 01, 2023Dec of Anne Olsen iso Opposition
Date: August 01, 202379891Propo017e1b
Date: August 01, 2023Dec of Moffat iso Opposition
Date: August 01, 2023Dec of Lynn iso Opposition
Date: August 01, 202379900DECLA001c8f
Date: August 01, 2023POS
Date: August 01, 202380586SECON00ff9f
Date: August 11, 202380586PROPO019916
Date: August 21, 202381440SECON00c106
Date: August 25, 2023Verified Answer to SAC - Lynn Duggan
Date: September 07, 20232023 09 07 DFLP Answer to SAC
Date: September 07, 202382357Answe007c94
Date: September 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Continued from 4/18 for Jury Trial Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 96486Notic0004ca | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Party appeared by audio and/or video Counsel Lisa McCurdy appears via Zoom on behalf of the plaintiffs. Counsel Lindsey Berg-James appears via Zoom for counsel of record on behalf of Defendant Lynn Duggan. Counsel Marshall Bluestone appears via Zoom on behalf of Defendant The Duggan Faimly Limited Partnership. Counsel Michael Shklovsky appears via Zoom on behalf of Defendant Kelly Moffat. |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference continued from 1/19/24 L&M per tentative ruling, trial date vacated Judge: Daum, Elliot Lee |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Joint Case Management Statement | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024 04 03 DFLP CMC Stmt | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | LA507633 - CMS | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion for Trial Continuance and Vacating Trial Date |
|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 7 days Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.