Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Smith Stephanie, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Eilenberg Ben A., against Palisades News, Pascoe. Sue, Sanderson Matt, Sue Pascoe., represented by Jassy Jean-Paul S, Jassyu Vick Carolan Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Marc D. Gross presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarc D. Gross Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 14, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Status Conference Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STEPHANIE SMITH (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Document:Reply Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Other - Request for Refund; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Designation of Record Filed by: Attorney for Appellant
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Document:Objection Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B292107. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Appellant
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Reversed B292107; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: PALISADES NEWS (Defendant)
Date: November 20, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: PASCOE. SUE (Defendant)
Date: November 20, 2020Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: MATT SANDERSON (Defendant)
Date: November 20, 2020Summons
Date: March 14, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 14, 2018Answer
Date: April 30, 2018Complaint
Date: March 14, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Strike
Date: May 11, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition
Date: May 29, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Reply
Date: June 05, 2018Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 12, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Objection
Date: June 05, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-06-13 00:00:00
Date: June 13, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: August 06, 2018Notice of Motion - And Motion to Recover Attorneys' Fees and Cost
Date: August 10, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-08-08 00:00:00
Date: August 08, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion
Date: August 10, 2018Other - - Other - Request for Refund
Date: August 21, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF RECORD
Date: August 16, 2018Request for Refund / Order -
Date: August 21, 2018Motion for Sanctions -
Date: August 28, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: August 28, 2018Case Management Statement -
Date: August 28, 2018Notice of Status Conference and Order -
Date: September 13, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00
Date: September 13, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NTC TO REPTR/MON TO PREP TRANSCRPT
Date: September 25, 2018Notice - Notice of non receipt of opposition to motion to recover attorneys' fees and costs
Date: November 01, 2018Notice - Notice of Entry of Order
Date: November 27, 2018Notice - Notice of entry of order
Date: January 10, 2019Notice - Notice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SACTIONS
Date: January 22, 2019Order - Dismissal
Date: January 22, 2019Order - Order Granting Defendant Matt Sanderson's Motion for Sanctions
Date: January 22, 2019Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: March 20, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 27, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: April 22, 2019Status Report - DEFENDANT'S STATUS REPORT RE ONGOING APPEAL
Date: July 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL STATUS)
Date: July 31, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 01, 2019Appeal - Remittitur - Reversed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - REVERSED B292107
Date: December 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL STATUS)
Date: January 31, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROPOSED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL
Date: February 04, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ADVANCEMENT OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
Date: February 04, 2020Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: March 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: March 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: July 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: September 18, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 09/18/2020
Date: September 18, 2020Order - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: October 05, 2020Judgment - (AMENDED)
Date: October 05, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
Date: October 05, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 13, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 20, 2020Complaint
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Opposition (TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT )
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUAN TO CCP 425.16 )
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Ntc to Atty re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Other - (Request for Refund)
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Ntc to Atty re Notice of Appeal (for Notice of Appeal filed 8/13/18 )
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00in Department K
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Notice (OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL )
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B292107.)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings re Defendant's Ex Parte Application for ...))
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Notice (of entry of order)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Order (Granting Defendant Matt Sanderson's Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SACTIONS)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00in Department K
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff and Her Cou...))
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00[PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MATT SANDERSON?S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Defendant's Status Report re Ongoing Appeal
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference Re Appeal Status))
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Notice (of Status Conference)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Reversed (B292107)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference Re Appeal Status))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Order to Show Cause re Proposed Judgment of Dismissal)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Judgment (Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Notice (of Advancement of Hearing on Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Judgment (of Dismissal of Entire Action)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 20, 2020Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/18/2020)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Order (Granting Defendant Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/13/2020)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/17/2020)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment; With Exhibit 1)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 20, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 20, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.