Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gonis James, Gonis Marie Matthews, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Harouni Kaivon, against Bank Of America National Association, Mtc Financial Inc., New Penn Financial Llc, Ocwen Loan Servicing Llc, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, (total of 6) See All represented by Burke Williams & Sorenson, Guerami-Dahi Shahrzad, Mcglinchey Stafford, Stafford Mcglinchey, Ekmekchyan Pavel, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Marc D. Gross presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarc D. Gross Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time822 days |
Motion to Compel - Further Responses
Date: August 02, 2018Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: January 03, 2019Other - - Other - Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 16, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 16, 2018Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM BIBLE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 16, 2018Complaint
Date: January 27, 2017Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: January 31, 2019Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Amendment to Complaint
Date: August 15, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 05, 2018Summons
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-02-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-02-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO STAY ACTINO IN ITS ENTIRETY FOR 90 DAYS; ORDER )
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-29 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (DOE 1 OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC )
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Verified First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-03 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-02 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Verified First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT )
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer (TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF )
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF CMC )
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Notice-Settlement (AS TO OCWEN LOAN SERVICING )
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAIN COMPLAINT CONTD TO 1-3-18 8:30 AM DEPT K )
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTD TO 1-19-18 8:30 AM DEPT K )
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Stipulation (FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION AS AGAINST OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC WITH PREJUDICE )
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (AMENDED DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Other - (Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Order (RE STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION AGAINST OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC WITH PREJUDICE )
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES )
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Declaration (of William Bible in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: April 22, 2019Opposition (TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: April 29, 2019Declaration (of telephonic notice re: ex parte application)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00in Department K
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: April 03, 2019in Department K
Date: February 28, 2019Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF WILLIAM BIBLE
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue defendant's motio...))
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00in Department K
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00in Department K
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.