Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TUROSKI VS. MITCHELL BROWN GENERAL ENGINEERING
A 23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Lampe, David R. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 26, 2013
Last Refreshed
November 19, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
Category
23-CV Other PI/PD/WD - Civil Unlimited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Case Duration
2 years, 1 month and 18 days
Time To Trial
1 year, 4 months and 9 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2015 | hearing |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal Filed by Matthew C. Clark |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal Filed by Matthew C. Clark |
|
May 12, 2015 | hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) With prejudice, Entire Action, Duly Filed and Entered. Filed by Matthew C. Clark. |
|
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) With prejudice, Entire Action, Duly Filed and Entered. Filed by Matthew C. Clark. |
|
April 03, 2015 | hearing |
NP1820 Department: 11 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. *************************************************************************************** UPON THE COURTS OWN MOTION, DUE TO A COURT HOLIDAY, THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 5/25/15 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT HAS BEEN CHANGED TO 5/26/15 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 11. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
NP1820 Department: 11 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. *************************************************************************************** UPON THE COURTS OWN MOTION, DUE TO A COURT HOLIDAY, THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 5/25/15 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT HAS BEEN CHANGED TO 5/26/15 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 11. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
March 19, 2015 | hearing |
Ruling/Certificate of Progress PLAINTIFF IS TO FILE A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OR FURTHER CERTIFICATE OF PROGRESS BY 5/25/15. THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SCHEDULED FOR 3/23/15 IS CONTINUED TO 5/25/15. **JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE** |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ruling/Certificate of Progress PLAINTIFF IS TO FILE A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OR FURTHER CERTIFICATE OF PROGRESS BY 5/25/15. THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SCHEDULED FOR 3/23/15 IS CONTINUED TO 5/25/15. **JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE** |
|
March 12, 2015 | hearing |
Certificate of Progress FILED BY MATTHEW C. CLARK, ESQ. |
|
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Progress FILED BY MATTHEW C. CLARK, ESQ. |
|
February 23, 2015 | hearing |
Court Trial Calendar Notes: JURY FOR BOTH SIDES T/E 5-6 DAYS D-11 JURY FOR BOTH SIDES T/E 5-6 DAYS D-11 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Calendar Notes: JURY FOR BOTH SIDES T/E 5-6 DAYS D-11 JURY FOR BOTH SIDES T/E 5-6 DAYS D-11 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
February 04, 2015 | hearing |
Hearing Vacated NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED. ~ calid=2576601 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4143, CourtDate:02/23/2015, Courtroom:11, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:11, SessionType:CTC, Judge:DRL, SystemDate:6/10/2014 8:41:18 AM |
|
February 04, 2015 | hearing |
NP1821 Department: 11 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED 2/2/15, BY ATTORNEY MATTEW C. CLARK, ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF. *************************************************************************************** COUNSEL TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT AND FILE DISMISSAL BY 3/16/15. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1385 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE SET FOR 3/23/15 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 11 UNLESS SOONER DISMISSED. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED. ~ calid=2576601 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4143, CourtDate:02/23/2015, Courtroom:11, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:11, SessionType:CTC, Judge:DRL, SystemDate:6/10/2014 8:41:18 AM |
|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
NP1821 Department: 11 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED 2/2/15, BY ATTORNEY MATTEW C. CLARK, ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF. *************************************************************************************** COUNSEL TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT AND FILE DISMISSAL BY 3/16/15. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1385 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE SET FOR 3/23/15 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 11 UNLESS SOONER DISMISSED. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
February 02, 2015 | hearing |
Notice of Settlement Unconditional FILED BY MATTHEW C. CLARK, ESQ. |
|
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Unconditional FILED BY MATTHEW C. CLARK, ESQ. |
|
January 23, 2015 | hearing |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for TUROSKI, LARRY (PL-1). Received from CHAIN COHN STILES, check no(s) 59517. Receipt #819901 for amount of $20.00. |
|
January 23, 2015 | hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Calendar Notes: J/T 2/23/15 T/E 5-6 DAYS D-11 JURY FOR BOTH SIDES J/T 2/23/15 T/E 5-6 DAYS D-11 JURY FOR BOTH SIDES Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Calendar Notes: J/T 2/23/15 T/E 5-6 DAYS D-11 JURY FOR BOTH SIDES J/T 2/23/15 T/E 5-6 DAYS D-11 JURY FOR BOTH SIDES Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for TUROSKI, LARRY (PL-1). Received from CHAIN COHN STILES, check no(s) 59517. Receipt #819901 for amount of $20.00. |
|
January 22, 2015 | hearing |
Hearing Vacated PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FILED 1/21/2015 ~ calid=2576602 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4007, CourtDate:01/23/2015, Courtroom:17, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:12, SessionType:STL, Judge:LHB, SystemDate:6/10/2014 8:42:27 AM |
|
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FILED 1/21/2015 ~ calid=2576602 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4007, CourtDate:01/23/2015, Courtroom:17, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:12, SessionType:STL, Judge:LHB, SystemDate:6/10/2014 8:42:27 AM |
|
January 21, 2015 | hearing |
Stipulation and Order IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 1/23/15 IS VACATED, ***DAVID R. LAMPE*** |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 1/23/15 IS VACATED, ***DAVID R. LAMPE*** |
|
August 04, 2014 | hearing |
Court Trial Calendar Notes: JURY REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES T/E - 4 DAYS JURY REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES T/E - 4 DAYS Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Calendar Notes: JURY REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES T/E - 4 DAYS JURY REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES T/E - 4 DAYS Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
June 27, 2014 | hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Calendar Notes: JURY TRIAL/FCMC 08/04/2014 DRL T/E - 4 DAYS JURY TRIAL/FCMC 08/04/2014 DRL T/E - 4 DAYS Judge: Friedman, Gary T. |
|
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Calendar Notes: JURY TRIAL/FCMC 08/04/2014 DRL T/E - 4 DAYS JURY TRIAL/FCMC 08/04/2014 DRL T/E - 4 DAYS Judge: Friedman, Gary T. |
|
June 13, 2014 | hearing |
Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE / FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / TRIAL o TIME ESTIMATE 5-6 DAYS. o CAUSE SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 1/23/2015 AT 9:00A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 17, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. o CAUSE SET FOR FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 2/23/2015 AT 9:00A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT DEPARTMENT 11, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE DRL (see pretrial rules on next page). o CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON 2/23/2015 AT 9:00A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 11, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE DRL. o OTHER: YOUR ATTENTION IS DIRECTED TO THE ATTACHED SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES AND THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1380. DUTY OF ATTORNEYS AS TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: EXCEPT AS OTHERWISE DIRECTED BY THE COURT FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, ALL PARTIES, THEIR ATTORNEYS AND, WHEN A PARTY IS INSURED, A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE INSURANCE COMPANY WHO HAS THE AUTHORITY TO SETTLE SUCH CASE, SHALL ATTEND THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE / FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / TRIAL o TIME ESTIMATE 5-6 DAYS. o CAUSE SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 1/23/2015 AT 9:00A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 17, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. o CAUSE SET FOR FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 2/23/2015 AT 9:00A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT DEPARTMENT 11, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE DRL (see pretrial rules on next page). o CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON 2/23/2015 AT 9:00A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 11, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE DRL. o OTHER: YOUR ATTENTION IS DIRECTED TO THE ATTACHED SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES AND THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1380. DUTY OF ATTORNEYS AS TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: EXCEPT AS OTHERWISE DIRECTED BY THE COURT FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, ALL PARTIES, THEIR ATTORNEYS AND, WHEN A PARTY IS INSURED, A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE INSURANCE COMPANY WHO HAS THE AUTHORITY TO SETTLE SUCH CASE, SHALL ATTEND THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. |
|
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE / FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / TRIAL o TIME ESTIMATE 5-6 DAYS. o CAUSE SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 1/23/2015 AT 9:00A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 17, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. o CAUSE SET FOR FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 2/23/2015 AT 9:00A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT DEPARTMENT 11, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE DRL (see pretrial rules on next page). o CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON 2/23/2015 AT 9:00A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 11, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE DRL. o OTHER: YOUR ATTENTION IS DIRECTED TO THE ATTACHED SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES AND THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1380. DUTY OF ATTORNEYS AS TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: EXCEPT AS OTHERWISE DIRECTED BY THE COURT FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, ALL PARTIES, THEIR ATTORNEYS AND, WHEN A PARTY IS INSURED, A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE INSURANCE COMPANY WHO HAS THE AUTHORITY TO SETTLE SUCH CASE, SHALL ATTEND THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE / FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / TRIAL o TIME ESTIMATE 5-6 DAYS. o CAUSE SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 1/23/2015 AT 9:00A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 17, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. o CAUSE SET FOR FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 2/23/2015 AT 9:00A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT DEPARTMENT 11, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE DRL (see pretrial rules on next page). o CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON 2/23/2015 AT 9:00A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 11, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE DRL. o OTHER: YOUR ATTENTION IS DIRECTED TO THE ATTACHED SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES AND THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1380. DUTY OF ATTORNEYS AS TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: EXCEPT AS OTHERWISE DIRECTED BY THE COURT FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, ALL PARTIES, THEIR ATTORNEYS AND, WHEN A PARTY IS INSURED, A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE INSURANCE COMPANY WHO HAS THE AUTHORITY TO SETTLE SUCH CASE, SHALL ATTEND THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. |
|
June 11, 2014 | hearing |
Hearing Vacated PER MINUTE ORDER RE-SET FOR 01/23/2015 ~ calid=2359363 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4007, CourtDate:06/27/2014, Courtroom:3, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:6, SessionType:STL, Judge:GTF, SystemDate:9/23/2013 9:21:48 AM |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated PER MINUTE ORDER RE-SET FOR 01/23/2015 ~ calid=2359363 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4007, CourtDate:06/27/2014, Courtroom:3, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:6, SessionType:STL, Judge:GTF, SystemDate:9/23/2013 9:21:48 AM |
|
June 10, 2014 | hearing |
NP1430 Department: 11 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: LARRY TUROSKI (PL-1) APPEARS BY MATTHEW C CLARK. APPEARANCE TELEPHONICALLY BY COURTCALL BY R SCOTT SOKOL ON BEHALF OF MITCHELL BROWN GENERAL ENGINEERING, INC. (DE-1). *************************************************************************************** THE COURT SETS THE FOLLOWING TRIAL DATES: JURY TRIAL/FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET ON 02/23/15 AT 9:00AM IN DEPARTMENT 11. MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET: 01/23/15 AT 9:00AM IN DEPARTMENT 17. PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT REQUEST A JURY. TIME ESTIMATE: 5-6 DAYS. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
|
June 10, 2014 | hearing |
4153 Case Management Conference Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
|
June 10, 2014 | hearing |
Case Management Conference TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1430 Department: 11 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: LARRY TUROSKI (PL-1) APPEARS BY MATTHEW C CLARK. APPEARANCE TELEPHONICALLY BY COURTCALL BY R SCOTT SOKOL ON BEHALF OF MITCHELL BROWN GENERAL ENGINEERING, INC. (DE-1). *************************************************************************************** THE COURT SETS THE FOLLOWING TRIAL DATES: JURY TRIAL/FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET ON 02/23/15 AT 9:00AM IN DEPARTMENT 11. MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET: 01/23/15 AT 9:00AM IN DEPARTMENT 17. PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT REQUEST A JURY. TIME ESTIMATE: 5-6 DAYS. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
4153 Case Management Conference Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
June 09, 2014 | hearing |
Case Management Statement FILED BY R. SCOTT SOKOL, ESQ |
|
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement FILED BY R. SCOTT SOKOL, ESQ |
|
May 21, 2014 | hearing |
Case Management Statement FILED BY MATTHEW C. CLARK, ESQ. |
|
May 21, 2014 | hearing |
172F Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 70617(A) Amount of $60.00 for TUROSKI, LARRY (PL-1). Received from CHAIN, COHN & STILES, check no(s) 56467. Receipt #779541 for amount of $80.00. |
|
May 21, 2014 | hearing |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for TUROSKI, LARRY (PL-1). Received from CHAIN, COHN & STILES, check no(s) 56467. Receipt #779541 for amount of $80.00. |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement FILED BY MATTHEW C. CLARK, ESQ. |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
172F Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 70617(A) Amount of $60.00 for TUROSKI, LARRY (PL-1). Received from CHAIN, COHN & STILES, check no(s) 56467. Receipt #779541 for amount of $80.00. |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for TUROSKI, LARRY (PL-1). Received from CHAIN, COHN & STILES, check no(s) 56467. Receipt #779541 for amount of $80.00. |
|
May 07, 2014 | hearing |
NP1821 Department: 11 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED 5/5/2014. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: MATTER TO BE SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 6/10/2014. CASE MANAGEMENT/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 6/10/2014 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 11. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1821 Department: 11 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED 5/5/2014. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: MATTER TO BE SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 6/10/2014. CASE MANAGEMENT/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 6/10/2014 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 11. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
May 05, 2014 | hearing |
Stipulation to Continue and Order THE 8/4/14 TRIAL DATE, 8/4/14 FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND 6/27/14 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ARE HEREBY VACATED. THE COURT WILL SCHEDULE A FURHTER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ***DAVID R. LAMPE*** |
|
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation to Continue and Order THE 8/4/14 TRIAL DATE, 8/4/14 FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND 6/27/14 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ARE HEREBY VACATED. THE COURT WILL SCHEDULE A FURHTER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ***DAVID R. LAMPE*** |
|
September 26, 2013 | hearing |
Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE / FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / TRIAL o TIME ESTIMATE 4 DAYS. o CAUSE SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 6/27/2014 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 3, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. o CAUSE SET FOR FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 8/4/2014 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT DEPARTMENT 11, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE DAVID R. LAMPE (see pretrial rules on next page). o CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON 8/4/2014 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 11, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE DAVID R. LAMPE. o OTHER: JURY TRIAL REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES YOUR ATTENTION IS DIRECTED TO THE ATTACHED SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES AND THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1380. DUTY OF ATTORNEYS AS TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: EXCEPT AS OTHERWISE DIRECTED BY THE COURT FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, ALL PARTIES, THEIR ATTORNEYS AND, WHEN A PARTY IS INSURED, A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE INSURANCE COMPANY WHO HAS THE AUTHORITY TO SETTLE SUCH CASE, SHALL ATTEND THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE / FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / TRIAL o TIME ESTIMATE 4 DAYS. o CAUSE SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 6/27/2014 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 3, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. o CAUSE SET FOR FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 8/4/2014 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT DEPARTMENT 11, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE DAVID R. LAMPE (see pretrial rules on next page). o CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON 8/4/2014 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 11, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE DAVID R. LAMPE. o OTHER: JURY TRIAL REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES YOUR ATTENTION IS DIRECTED TO THE ATTACHED SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES AND THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1380. DUTY OF ATTORNEYS AS TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: EXCEPT AS OTHERWISE DIRECTED BY THE COURT FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, ALL PARTIES, THEIR ATTORNEYS AND, WHEN A PARTY IS INSURED, A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE INSURANCE COMPANY WHO HAS THE AUTHORITY TO SETTLE SUCH CASE, SHALL ATTEND THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. |
|
September 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE / FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / TRIAL o TIME ESTIMATE 4 DAYS. o CAUSE SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 6/27/2014 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 3, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. o CAUSE SET FOR FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 8/4/2014 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT DEPARTMENT 11, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE DAVID R. LAMPE (see pretrial rules on next page). o CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON 8/4/2014 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 11, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE DAVID R. LAMPE. o OTHER: JURY TRIAL REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES YOUR ATTENTION IS DIRECTED TO THE ATTACHED SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES AND THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1380. DUTY OF ATTORNEYS AS TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: EXCEPT AS OTHERWISE DIRECTED BY THE COURT FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, ALL PARTIES, THEIR ATTORNEYS AND, WHEN A PARTY IS INSURED, A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE INSURANCE COMPANY WHO HAS THE AUTHORITY TO SETTLE SUCH CASE, SHALL ATTEND THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE / FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / TRIAL o TIME ESTIMATE 4 DAYS. o CAUSE SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 6/27/2014 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 3, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. o CAUSE SET FOR FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 8/4/2014 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT DEPARTMENT 11, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE DAVID R. LAMPE (see pretrial rules on next page). o CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON 8/4/2014 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 11, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE DAVID R. LAMPE. o OTHER: JURY TRIAL REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES YOUR ATTENTION IS DIRECTED TO THE ATTACHED SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES AND THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1380. DUTY OF ATTORNEYS AS TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: EXCEPT AS OTHERWISE DIRECTED BY THE COURT FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, ALL PARTIES, THEIR ATTORNEYS AND, WHEN A PARTY IS INSURED, A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE INSURANCE COMPANY WHO HAS THE AUTHORITY TO SETTLE SUCH CASE, SHALL ATTEND THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. |
|
September 23, 2013 | hearing |
NP1430 Department: 11 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: LARRY TUROSKI (PL-1) APPEARS BY MATTHEW C CLARK. APPEARANCE TELEPHONICALLY BY COURTCALL BY R SCOTT SOKOL ON BEHALF OF MITCHELL BROWN GENERAL ENGINEERING, INC. (DE-1). *************************************************************************************** JURY TRIAL/FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET ON 08/04/2014 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 11. MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET: 06/27/2014 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 3. JURY TRIAL REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES. TIME ESTIMATE: 4 DAYS. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
|
September 23, 2013 | hearing |
4153 Case Management Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
September 23, 2013 | hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
4153 Case Management Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
NP1430 Department: 11 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: LARRY TUROSKI (PL-1) APPEARS BY MATTHEW C CLARK. APPEARANCE TELEPHONICALLY BY COURTCALL BY R SCOTT SOKOL ON BEHALF OF MITCHELL BROWN GENERAL ENGINEERING, INC. (DE-1). *************************************************************************************** JURY TRIAL/FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET ON 08/04/2014 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 11. MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET: 06/27/2014 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 3. JURY TRIAL REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES. TIME ESTIMATE: 4 DAYS. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
|
September 05, 2013 | hearing |
199 Pmt: Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable) CCP 631(B) 8/6/12 Amount of $150.00 for TUROSKI, LARRY (PL-1). Received from LARRY TUROSKI, check no(s) 42674. Receipt #736597 for amount of $150.00. |
|
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
199 Pmt: Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable) CCP 631(B) 8/6/12 Amount of $150.00 for TUROSKI, LARRY (PL-1). Received from LARRY TUROSKI, check no(s) 42674. Receipt #736597 for amount of $150.00. |
|
September 03, 2013 | hearing |
Case Management Statement FILED BY MATTHEW C. CLARK, ESQ |
|
September 03, 2013 | hearing |
Deposit of Jury Fees FILED BY MATTHEW C. CLARK, ESQ |
|
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement FILED BY MATTHEW C. CLARK, ESQ |
|
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Deposit of Jury Fees FILED BY MATTHEW C. CLARK, ESQ |
|
July 19, 2013 | hearing |
Notice of Lien BY COUNTY OF KERN, FILED BY DAVID T. UNGAR |
|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lien BY COUNTY OF KERN, FILED BY DAVID T. UNGAR |
|
July 09, 2013 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
May 18, 2013 | hearing |
801N First Appearance Unlimited Civil GC 70612 8/6/12 Amount of $435.00 for MITCHELL BROWN GENERAL ENGINEERING, INC. (DE-1). Received from SAN LUIS OBISPO LEGAL SVCS, IN, check no(s) 3156. Receipt #718467 for amount of $435.00. |
|
May 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
801N First Appearance Unlimited Civil GC 70612 8/6/12 Amount of $435.00 for MITCHELL BROWN GENERAL ENGINEERING, INC. (DE-1). Received from SAN LUIS OBISPO LEGAL SVCS, IN, check no(s) 3156. Receipt #718467 for amount of $435.00. |
|
May 13, 2013 | hearing |
Answer to Complaint FILED BY R. SCOTT SOKOL, ESQ. |
|
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint FILED BY R. SCOTT SOKOL, ESQ. |
|
April 24, 2013 | hearing |
Notice / Assign / Status / JES NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULED HEARING DATE(S) BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE David R Lampe FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 11 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "DRL" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE David R Lampe ON 3/26/2013 AT 8:30 A.M.. IN DEPARTMENT 11 OF THIS COURT. PARTIES ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTIFYING COURT CALL OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULED HEARING DATE(S) BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE David R Lampe FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 11 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "DRL" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE David R Lampe ON 3/26/2013 AT 8:30 A.M.. IN DEPARTMENT 11 OF THIS COURT. PARTIES ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTIFYING COURT CALL OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE. |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice / Assign / Status / JES NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULED HEARING DATE(S) BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE David R Lampe FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 11 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "DRL" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE David R Lampe ON 3/26/2013 AT 8:30 A.M.. IN DEPARTMENT 11 OF THIS COURT. PARTIES ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTIFYING COURT CALL OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULED HEARING DATE(S) BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE David R Lampe FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 11 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "DRL" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE David R Lampe ON 3/26/2013 AT 8:30 A.M.. IN DEPARTMENT 11 OF THIS COURT. PARTIES ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTIFYING COURT CALL OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE. |
|
April 18, 2013 | hearing |
Hearing Vacated 7/9/13 OSC VACATED POS FILED ~ calid=2203823 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:07/09/2013, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:1, SessionType:OSC, Judge:SPC, Deputy:anah, SystemDate:3/27/2013 12:37:24 PM |
|
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated 7/9/13 OSC VACATED POS FILED ~ calid=2203823 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:07/09/2013, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:1, SessionType:OSC, Judge:SPC, Deputy:anah, SystemDate:3/27/2013 12:37:24 PM |
|
April 17, 2013 | hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint AS TO MITCHELL BROWN GENERAL ENGINEERING, INC. SUB SERVED 4/12/13 |
|
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint AS TO MITCHELL BROWN GENERAL ENGINEERING, INC. SUB SERVED 4/12/13 |
|
April 09, 2013 | hearing |
Notice OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON WORKER'S COMPENSATION CARRIER |
|
April 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON WORKER'S COMPENSATION CARRIER |
|
March 28, 2013 | hearing |
800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) Amount of $435.00 for TUROSKI, LARRY (PL-1). Received from CHAIN COHN STILES, check no(s) 040700. Receipt #709622 for amount of $435.00. |
|
March 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) Amount of $435.00 for TUROSKI, LARRY (PL-1). Received from CHAIN COHN STILES, check no(s) 040700. Receipt #709622 for amount of $435.00. |
|
March 27, 2013 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 09, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 09, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. |
|
March 27, 2013 | hearing |
Summons Issued and Filed (BIN) |
|
March 27, 2013 | hearing |
CONV New case created by deputy: 676 |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
CONV New case created by deputy: 676 |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued and Filed (BIN) |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 09, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 09, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. |
|
March 26, 2013 | hearing |
Complaint - Fast Track FILED BY MATTHEW C. CLARK, ESQ. |
|
March 26, 2013 | hearing |
Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) FILED BY MATTHEW C. CLARK, ESQ. |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) FILED BY MATTHEW C. CLARK, ESQ. |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Complaint - Fast Track FILED BY MATTHEW C. CLARK, ESQ. |