Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Daniel Bonilla, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Haling, Andrew Travis Wilshire Law Firm, against Baljit Toor, Harjoban Toor, represented by Hirsig, Peter J. Mcnamara, Ambacher, Wheeler, Hirsig & Gray Llp, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2022 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedMarch 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Minutes - Civil
Date: March 13, 2024Opposition PLT Daniel Gregory Bonilla's Opposition to DEF's Ex Parte Applications 02/22/24
Date: February 21, 2024Notice of Remote Appearance 03/15/24
Date: March 12, 2024Motion Leave to perform a Further Independent Medical Physical Examination of Plaintiff
Date: February 22, 2024Notice of Rejection
Date: March 11, 2024Motion Set Aside-Vacate Trial and Pre-Trial Conference Dates
Date: February 29, 2024Order Attachment to Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: March 14, 2024Notice Demand for Jury
Date: February 09, 2023Case Management Conference Statement 12/12/2022
Date: November 28, 2022Proof Service- Summons Harjoban Kaur Toor
Date: January 17, 2023Order Other Ruling on Ex Parte Appl for Order Shortening Time - granted
Date: February 22, 2024Minutes - Civil
Date: December 09, 2022Proof Service motion documents 3/14/2024
Date: February 29, 2024Brief Plaintiff Daniel Gregory Bonilla's Settlement Conference Brief
Date: March 05, 2024Proof Service Via Email - motion documents 3/12/2024
Date: February 22, 2024Notice of Remote Appearance 3/15/2024
Date: March 11, 2024Minutes - Civil
Date: April 13, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: March 11, 2024Proof Service 02/22/24
Date: February 21, 2024Notice Case Management Conference
Date: August 19, 2022Notice Entry of Judgment
Date: February 23, 2024Proof Service via email - 3/12/2024 motion
Date: February 22, 2024Answer
Date: February 09, 2023Proof Service motion documents 3/12/2024
Date: February 22, 2024Proof Service 02/29/24
Date: February 28, 2024Notice of Lodging
Date: March 08, 2024Proof Service Ex Parte Appl 02/21/24
Date: February 20, 2024Notice of Rejection (ra020)
Date: March 11, 2024Order Attachment to Notice of Remote Appearance Granted for MSC on 3-15-24
Date: March 11, 2024Declaration of Todd Drakeford
Date: March 05, 2024Settlement Conditional Settlement Notice 3/15/2024
Date: March 08, 2024Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time 02/21/24
Date: February 20, 2024Notice Entry of Order
Date: February 29, 2024Motion Protective Order to Reduce the List of Plaintiffs Non-Retained Experts
Date: February 22, 2024Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: February 22, 2024Motion Other to for Order Granting Leave to Take a Second Volume of Plaintiffs Deposition
Date: February 22, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 19, 2022Proof Service- Summons Baljit Singh Toor
Date: January 17, 2023Notice Rejection (Remote)
Date: March 12, 2024Brief Defendants Mandatory Settlement Conference Brief
Date: March 08, 2024Summons
Date: August 19, 2022Ex Parte Application DEF's Amended Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time 02/22/24
Date: February 21, 2024Complaint
Date: August 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Attachment to Notice of Remote Appearance | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance 03/15/24 | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice Rejection (Remote) | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Attachment to Notice of Remote Appearance 03/15/24 | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Rejection | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance 3/15/2024 | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Rejection (ra020) | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Attachment to Notice of Remote Appearance Granted for MSC on 3-15-24 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.