Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Placer Valley Sports Complex, Inc, Sherry Larsen, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Fry, Christopher John Fry Law Corporation, Newsum, Alexander N. Mccormick Barstow Llp, against Placer Valley Sports Complex, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2020 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order re Demurrer to Plaintiffs Complaint
Date: February 10, 2021Complaint Cross
Date: December 02, 2020Motion Continuance (Trial) and related dates
Date: November 15, 2022Notice Entry of Order
Date: March 29, 2022Order Other Granting Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time
Date: January 19, 2023Motion Attorney Withdrawal
Date: August 17, 2023Order Other Ruling on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Trial Date - GRANTED
Date: March 22, 2024Order Other on Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time
Date: November 17, 2022Settlement Conference Statement
Date: March 19, 2024Stipulation Order
Date: April 21, 2022Declaration Support of Attorneys Motion to be relieved as counsel
Date: August 17, 2023Summons Cross Complaint
Date: December 02, 2020Minutes - Civil
Date: June 21, 2021Minutes - Civil
Date: February 10, 2023Motion Relief Notice of motion and motion to be relieved as counsel
Date: May 17, 2022In Limine Opposition
Date: March 27, 2023Case Management Conference Statement 1/26/21
Date: January 13, 2021Notice Rejection by Clerk
Date: June 23, 2021Witness List
Date: March 23, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: February 04, 2021Response to PLT's Motion to Continue Trial - 12/08/2022
Date: November 30, 2022Stipulation
Date: April 20, 2022Brief Trial
Date: November 03, 2022General Denial
Date: March 11, 2021Notice Entry of Order
Date: September 27, 2023Order Attorney Withdrawal
Date: September 26, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: March 14, 2022Notice of Settlement Conference, Civil Trial Conference and Trial Dates
Date: November 06, 2023Case Management Conference Statement 6/22/2021
Date: June 03, 2021Memorandum Points & Authorities IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: January 04, 2021Notice of Remote Appearance - 09/02/2022
Date: August 30, 2022Case Management Conference Statement 06/05/2023
Date: May 18, 2023Memorandum Points & Authorities IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: January 25, 2021Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production of Documents (Set Two)
Date: September 13, 2022Minutes - Civil
Date: September 26, 2022Request Judicial Notice in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: February 15, 2022Notice Entry of Order
Date: February 22, 2021Notice NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: January 04, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: March 22, 2024Proof Service 03/22/24
Date: March 21, 2024Minutes - Civil
Date: December 07, 2022Brief Trial
Date: March 23, 2023Notice Hearing of Tentative Ruling Procedure
Date: August 17, 2023Brief Reply in Support of Motion to Reopen Discovery - 02/14/2023
Date: February 09, 2023Statement of Case
Date: November 03, 2022Settlement Conference Statement
Date: August 23, 2022Order Attachment to Notice of Remote Appearance GRANTED- PLT
Date: August 30, 2022Memorandum Points & Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: February 15, 2022Request for Remote Appearance Non-Evidentiary Hearing MSC for 4-1-22 Granted
Date: March 23, 2022Stipulation Order to cont trial
Date: March 24, 2022Demurrer TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: January 04, 2021In Limine Motion
Date: November 03, 2022Proof Service
Date: January 04, 2021Minutes - Civil
Date: September 18, 2023Motion Compel Responses to Plainiff's Request for Production of Documents, Set Two
Date: September 02, 2022Case Management Conference Statement 1/11/2021
Date: January 11, 2021Memorandum Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Continue Trial And Related Dates
Date: November 15, 2022Case Management Conference Statement 06/05/2023
Date: May 23, 2023Response to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for A Noticed Motion
Date: November 16, 2022Minutes - Civil
Date: September 29, 2023Brief Trial
Date: March 22, 2023Proof Service opposition documents for 3/01/2022
Date: February 15, 2022Declaration of Christopher J. Fry in Support of Motion to Continue Trial and Related Dates
Date: November 15, 2022Order Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: December 08, 2022Statement of Evidence in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: February 15, 2022Stipulation and Order for Temporary Judge
Date: March 22, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 02, 2020Complaint
Date: October 02, 2020Attorney Substitution - Pro Per subs out, Fry subs in
Date: November 10, 2022Proof Service Motion documents 9/19/2023
Date: August 17, 2023Stipulation to cont trial
Date: March 23, 2022Minutes - Civil
Date: June 02, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: November 02, 2022Proof Service reply documents 3/1/2022
Date: February 24, 2022Memorandum Points & Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Discovery
Date: January 03, 2023Witness List
Date: March 22, 2023Notice Entry of Order
Date: January 23, 2023Reply MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2021Proof Service Order Relief Granting attorney to be relieved as counsel
Date: June 29, 2022Settlement Conference Statement
Date: March 22, 2022Minutes - Civil
Date: June 27, 2022Order Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: April 12, 2022Declaration of Robert F. Sinclair in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Discovery
Date: January 03, 2023Opposition to PLTF's Ex Parte Motion to Continue Trial 03/22/24
Date: March 21, 2024Case Management Conference Statement 10/30/2023
Date: October 12, 2023Summons
Date: October 02, 2020Witness List
Date: November 03, 2022Proof Service motion summary adjudgment documents for 3/1/2022
Date: December 10, 2021Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial
Date: November 16, 2022Notice Case Management Conference
Date: November 04, 2020Declaration OF ROBERT F. SINCLAIR IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: January 04, 2021Minutes - Civil
Date: January 13, 2023Brief
Date: March 27, 2023Reply in support of mtn to cont trial and related dates.
Date: December 02, 2022Minutes - Civil
Date: October 27, 2023Settlement Conference Statement
Date: August 26, 2022Statement in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: February 15, 2022Declaration of Christopher J. Fry in Support of Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial
Date: November 16, 2022Proposed Request for Remote Appearance Non-Evidentiary Hearing
Date: March 22, 2022Stipulation and Order for Temporary Judge
Date: September 01, 2022Notice Hearing
Date: April 25, 2023Declaration Support of Sherry Larsen in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: February 15, 2022Minutes - Civil
Date: January 25, 2021Minutes - Civil
Date: February 28, 2022Case Management Conference Statement 10/2/2023
Date: September 14, 2023Declaration of Robert F. Sinclair in opposition to PLT's motion to reopen discovery
Date: February 07, 2023Case Management Conference Statement 6/22/2021
Date: June 02, 2021Answer Cross Complaint
Date: January 20, 2021Order Continuance
Date: September 30, 2022Memorandum Points & Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial
Date: November 16, 2022Attorney Declaration for Relief as Counsel
Date: May 17, 2022Order Relief Granting attorney to be relieved as counsel
Date: June 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Other Ruling on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Trial Date - GRANTED | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Temporary Judge | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof Service 03/22/24 | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to PLTF's Ex Parte Motion to Continue Trial 03/22/24 | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Sherry Larsen in Support Thereof 03/22/24 | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference Statement | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Conference, Civil Trial Conference and Trial Dates | |
October 30, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | S-CV-0045659 Larsen, Sherry vs. Placer Valley Sports Complex ** NOTE: telephonic appearances are strongly encouraged Appearance required. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.