Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Donald Machholz, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against Ascent Wealth Management, Cunningham Legal, James Cunningham, Preston Marx, represented by Stuart, Scott Friedlander Hoge Fenton Jones & Appel, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2019 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions472 days |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time472 days |
Answer -
Date: October 15, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: November 25, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: November 26, 2019Proof Service -
Date: October 15, 2019Proof Service- Summons -
Date: September 26, 2019Proof Service -
Date: December 10, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: December 06, 2019Notice Rejection by Clerk -
Date: January 03, 2020Ex Parte Application -
Date: July 07, 2020Motion Compel -
Date: July 15, 2020Declaration -
Date: July 07, 2020Proof Service -
Date: July 07, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: July 08, 2020Complaint -
Date: August 06, 2019Notice Case Management Conference -
Date: August 06, 2019Summons -
Date: August 06, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: August 06, 2019Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: August 12, 2020Statement -
Date: August 12, 2020Response -
Date: September 03, 2020Request Judicial Notice -
Date: August 21, 2020Declaration -
Date: August 12, 2020Request Judicial Notice -
Date: August 20, 2020Motion Compel -
Date: August 20, 2020Declaration -
Date: August 20, 2020Declaration -
Date: August 21, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: August 20, 2020Proof Service -
Date: August 21, 2020Brief Reply -
Date: August 27, 2020Declaration -
Date: September 28, 2020Declaration -
Date: September 03, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: September 03, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: September 24, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: September 16, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: September 28, 2020Order Other -
Date: September 25, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: September 28, 2020Order Ruling on Submitted Matter -
Date: October 08, 2020Ex Parte Application -
Date: October 08, 2020Request Judicial Notice -
Date: October 06, 2020Declaration Support -
Date: October 13, 2020Ex Parte Application -
Date: October 13, 2020Declaration -
Date: October 08, 2020Order Other -
Date: October 14, 2020Stipulation Order -
Date: October 09, 2020Request Judicial Notice -
Date: September 24, 2020Opposition -
Date: September 03, 2020Declaration -
Date: September 24, 2020Declaration -
Date: October 06, 2020Dismissal Full With Prejudice -
Date: November 20, 2020Order Show Cause -
Date: November 02, 2020Notice Settlement of Entire Case -
Date: October 29, 2020Opposition -
Date: October 13, 2020Notice Entry of Order -
Date: October 09, 2020Statement -
Date: August 20, 2020Notice -
Date: September 10, 2020Reply -
Date: September 10, 2020Proof Service -
Date: September 24, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: August 21, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: October 06, 2020Proof Service -
Date: October 06, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: September 24, 2020Request Judicial Notice -
Date: July 07, 2020Proof Service -
Date: August 20, 2020Statement -
Date: October 06, 2020Motion Continuance (Trial) -
Date: September 24, 2020Ex Parte Application -
Date: September 24, 2020Statement -
Date: August 21, 2020Motion Compel -
Date: October 06, 2020Proof Service -
Date: August 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Not Heard: Vacated (413210) | ||
February 05, 2021 | Not Heard: Settled (413310) | ||
January 26, 2021 | Not Heard: Dismissed | ||
January 25, 2021 | Continued: Defendant/Respondent | ||
January 21, 2021 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
January 15, 2021 | Continued: Defendant/Respondent | ||
January 08, 2021 | Not Heard: Vacated (413210) | ||
December 10, 2020 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
December 03, 2020 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissal Full With Prejudice - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.