Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Janene Bauhofer, Michael Johnson, Oregon Shepherd, Llc, Quincy Mccourt, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Gary, Todd Bernard The Gary Law Firm, against Oregon Shepherd, Llc, Quincy Mccourt, represented by Krmpotic, Joy Stephanie, Mcelroy, Julie Diane Jacobsen & Mcelroy, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions388 days |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time707 days |
Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: November 09, 2018Notice Entry of Order -
Date: June 20, 2018Declaration -
Date: November 09, 2018Notice Entry Dismissal -
Date: June 20, 2018Declaration -
Date: November 13, 2018Document Other -
Date: December 04, 2018Request Judicial Notice -
Date: November 13, 2018Statement -
Date: November 13, 2018Declaration -
Date: January 04, 2018Order Show Cause -
Date: January 30, 2019Document Other -
Date: January 30, 2018Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: January 04, 2018Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: February 06, 2018Declaration Support -
Date: January 30, 2018Reply -
Date: February 05, 2018Reply -
Date: February 02, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: February 16, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: February 09, 2018Notice Entry of Order -
Date: February 15, 2018Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: January 30, 2018Motion Good Faith Settlement -
Date: April 02, 2018Opposition -
Date: April 09, 2018Reply -
Date: April 17, 2018Objection -
Date: April 09, 2018Document Other -
Date: February 07, 2018Declaration -
Date: April 02, 2018Declaration -
Date: April 17, 2018Proof Service -
Date: April 02, 2018Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: April 02, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: April 23, 2018Motion Summary Judgment -
Date: November 13, 2018Dismissal Partial With prejudice -
Date: May 21, 2018Order Good Faith Settlement -
Date: May 17, 2018Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: May 15, 2018Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: May 21, 2018Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: November 13, 2018Proof Service -
Date: November 09, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: June 04, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: January 29, 2019Answer Amended -
Date: December 28, 2018Proof Service -
Date: November 13, 2018Notice Settlement of Entire Case -
Date: January 29, 2019Dismissal Partial With prejudice -
Date: February 28, 2019Document Other -
Date: February 06, 2019Dismissal Partial With Prejudice Not Entered -
Date: March 04, 2019Document Other -
Date: November 14, 2018Notice Entry Dismissal -
Date: March 15, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: December 10, 2018Dismissal Partial With prejudice -
Date: March 11, 2019Notice Presiding Judge -
Date: December 14, 2018Notice Entry Dismissal -
Date: March 19, 2019Answer -
Date: September 25, 2017Answer Cross Complaint -
Date: December 12, 2017Complaint Cross -
Date: August 30, 2017Complaint Cross -
Date: September 25, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2019 | Not Heard: Dismissed | ||
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Dismissal Partial With prejudice - | |
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Entry Dismissal - | |
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Entry Dismissal - | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Dismissal Partial With prejudice - | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Dismissal Partial With Prejudice Not Entered - | |
March 04, 2019 | Not Heard: Settled (413310) | ||
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Dismissal Partial With prejudice - | |
February 22, 2019 | Not Heard: Settled (413310) | ||
February 19, 2019 | Dropped from Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.