Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Devra Hutchinson, Gary Lydia, Hutchinson, Devra, Lydia, Gary, filed a(n) Product Liability case represented by Alexander, Mary E., Mary E. Alexander, against Johnson & Johnson, A New Jersey Corporation, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc, represented by Emily M. Weissenberger, Weissenberger, Emily M., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Brad Seligman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrad Seligman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management13 days |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2020 |
CategoryProduct Liability |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
||
Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: January 14, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: January 12, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: February 09, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: February 09, 2021Motion Granted
Date: January 12, 2021Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: January 12, 2021Re-Notice of Coordination Of Add-On Cases Filed
Date: December 01, 2020Notice of Submission of Potential Add-On Cases for Coordination of this case into JCCP4872 Filed
Date: November 12, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: November 10, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: November 10, 2020Case Management Statement of Devra Hutchinson, Gary Lydia Filed
Date: October 28, 2020Notice of of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: October 28, 2020Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: October 20, 2020Complaint - Product Liability - Motion Rescheduled
Date: October 20, 2020Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: October 20, 2020Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: October 20, 2020Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: September 22, 2020Complaint - Product Liability - Motion Rescheduled
Date: September 22, 2020Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: September 22, 2020Case Management Conference 11/10/2020 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: August 06, 2020Declaration Declaration of Devra Hutchinson Filed
Date: July 24, 2020Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: July 24, 2020Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: July 24, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Debra Hutchinson
Date: July 24, 2020Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Submission of Potential Add-On Cases for Coordination of this case into JCCP4872 Filed
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Devra Hutchinson Filed
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Re-Notice of Coordination Of Add-On Cases Filed
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Devra Hutchinson, Gary Lydia Filed
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Removal Filed for Johnson & Johnson, a New Jersey corporation, Johnson & Johnson consumer
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Motion Granted
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Debra Hutchinson
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference 11/10/2020 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Complaint - Product Liability - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Complaint - Product Liability - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case is Deemed Complete. Case |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing scheduled for 02/08/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/08/2022 Event |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order re: Compliance Hearing Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Compliance Hearing) Minute Order |
|
February 08, 2022 | Compliance Hearing | ||
February 08, 2022 |
Judge: Compliance Hearing |
||
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing 02/08/2022 03:00 PM D- 23 ScheduleHearing |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Order Issued Ruling |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed Hearing |
|
February 09, 2021 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brad Seligman |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.