Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Hunter Lenthe, Jeffrey Zapper, Julie Zapper, Lenthe, Hunter, Lenthe, Mycalah, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case represented by Larry Edward Cook, against East Bay Motorsports Inc., East Bay Motorsports, Inc., Yamaha Motor Co, Ltd, Yamaha Motor Co., Ltd., represented by Adams, Lindsey R., Lindsey R. Adams, Mary Katherine Back, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior Court of Alameda County with James R. Reilly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames R. Reilly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Alameda County |
Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 10/28/2021 03:00 PM D- 25
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Inc., Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corpora
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Hunter Lenthe, Mycalah Lenthe Filed
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Motion for Pro Hac Vice Filed by Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Inc., Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Co
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Mycalah Lenthe Filed
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Annual Payment of Pro Hac Vice for John W. Knottenerus and Thomas Purcell Filed
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for East Bay Motorsports, Inc.
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 10/14/2021 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Non-Opposition to Applic for an Order Admitting Christopher Ruesk to Appear as Counsel Pro
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Non_Opposition to Appli for an Order Admitting Adolfo "J.R" Rodriguez, Jr to appear as Pro
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Motion for Pro Hac Vice Filed by East Bay Motorsports, Inc.
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement of East Bay Motorsports, Inc. Filed
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Order ORDER RELATING AND REASSIGNING CASES Filed
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement of East Bay Motorsports, Inc. Filed
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 03/03/2021 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Motion for Pro Hac Vice Filed by Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Inc., Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Co
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement of East Bay Motorsports, Inc. Filed
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Inc., Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corpora
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Yamaha Motor Co., LTD.
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Inc., Yamaha Motor Manufacturing C
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for East Bay Motorsports, Inc.
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America,, Yamaha Motor Corpo
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Yamaha Motor Co., LTD. Filed
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Inc. Filed
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America, Filed
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to East Bay Motorsports, Inc. Filed
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 01/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 16
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hunter Lenthe
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 08, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: April 06, 2020Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted
Date: March 03, 2020Case Management Statement of East Bay Motorsports, Inc. Filed
Date: September 14, 2020Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: March 12, 2020Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: March 03, 2020Motion for Pro Hac Vice Filed by East Bay Motorsports, Inc.
Date: September 18, 2020Proof of Service on Motion
Date: January 27, 2020Compliance Hearing 03/03/2021 09:00 AM D- 16
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: July 20, 2020Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: May 11, 2020Case Management Statement of East Bay Motorsports, Inc. Filed
Date: July 20, 2020Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 15, 2020Proposed Order
Date: January 27, 2020Order ORDER RELATING AND REASSIGNING CASES Filed
Date: August 03, 2020Proposed Order
Date: September 18, 2020Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: March 10, 2020Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: March 10, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 29, 2020Motion for Pro Hac Vice Hearing Confirmed for 10/14/2020 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/29/2020 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: July 31, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 31, 2020Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: June 17, 2020Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 16
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Motion for Pro Hac Vice Hearing Confirmed for 03/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 16
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: January 22, 2020Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: January 17, 2020Case Management Conf Continuance 05/04/2020 09:00 AM D- 16
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement of East Bay Motorsports, Inc. Filed
Date: January 10, 2020Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: January 22, 2020Answer to Complaint Filed for Yamaha Motor Co., LTD.
Date: December 20, 2019Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 07, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: January 22, 2020Answer to Complaint Filed for East Bay Motorsports, Inc.
Date: October 15, 2019Proof of Service on Complaint As to Yamaha Motor Co., LTD. Filed
Date: September 27, 2019Proof of Service on Complaint As to Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Inc. Filed
Date: September 27, 2019Proof of Service on Complaint As to Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America, Filed
Date: September 27, 2019Proof of Service on Complaint As to East Bay Motorsports, Inc. Filed
Date: September 17, 2019Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: September 10, 2019Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: September 09, 2019Initial Case Management Conference 01/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 16
Date: September 10, 2019Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: September 09, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hunter Lenthe
Date: September 09, 2019Motion for Leave Joinder to Motion Filed by: Jeffrey Zapper (Plaintiff); Julie Zapper (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Hunter Lenthe (Plaintiff); Mycalah Lenthe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Hunter Lenthe (Plaintiff); Mycalah Lenthe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Jeffrey Zapper (Plaintiff); Julie Zapper (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Hunter Lenthe (Plaintiff); Mycalah Lenthe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey C. Warren;...)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Updated -- Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice: Result: Granted Result Date: 02/02/2022
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 05, 2021Order re: Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 03, 2021Minute Order (Compliance Hearing; Compliance Hearing)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)
Date: November 03, 2021Order re: Compliance Hearing; Compliance Hearing Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Order to Consolidate Cases Filed
Date: October 08, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: September 02, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 02, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 02, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: August 11, 2021Case Management Statement of Hunter Lenthe, Mycalah Lenthe Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 11, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 10, 2021Proposed Order
Date: August 06, 2021Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Notice of Appearance Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 16, 2021Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Mycalah Lenthe Filed
Date: June 08, 2021Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: October 23, 2020Notice of Annual Payment of Pro Hac Vice for John W. Knottenerus and Thomas Purcell Filed
Date: February 25, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed for East Bay Motorsports, Inc.
Date: November 12, 2020Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: October 14, 2020Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted
Date: October 14, 2020Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: October 14, 2020Civil Jury Trial 01/10/2022 09:30 AM D- 25
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00TR - Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Granted
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 12/17/2021 11:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: September 29, 2020Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 12/07/2021 09:00 AM D- 301
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 08/10/2021 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 29, 2020Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: April 24, 2020Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: March 16, 2020Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: May 29, 2020Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: July 17, 2020Proposed Order
Date: September 18, 2020Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: April 06, 2020TR - Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Granted
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 03/03/2021 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: May 29, 2020Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 10/28/2021 03:00 PM D- 25
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 10/28/2021 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Motion for Pro Hac Vice Filed by Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Inc., Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Co
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 03/03/2021 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Motion for Pro Hac Vice Filed by East Bay Motorsports, Inc.
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2025 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing Payment Of Annual Renewal Pro Hac Vice Fees For John W. Knottnerus RCD / Department 25 |
|
March 05, 2025 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing Payment Of Annual Renewal Pro Hac Vice Fees For Thomas Purcell RCD / Department 25 |
|
February 03, 2025 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing - PHV renewal Jeffery Warren RCD / Department 25 |
|
August 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion to Compel Two Deposition and to Reopen Discovery; filed by Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Inc. (Defendant) + RCD / Department 25 |
|
July 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial RCD / Department 25 |
|
July 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion in Limine (early) RCD / Department 25 |
|
July 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference RCD / Department 25 |
|
July 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing RCD / Department 25 |
|
July 02, 2024 | Compliance Hearing | ||
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial RCD / Department 25 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.