Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Liu, Li Zhu, Li Zhu Liu, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Aaron Yu, Yu, Aaron, against Alfred Bianchi, Alfred Bianchi As Trustee Of The Bianchi Trust Dated November 13, 2006, Lois Bianchi, Lois Bianchi As Trustee Of The Bianchi Trust Dated November 13, 2006, represented by Sosan Akbar, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Paul D. Herbert presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management134 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2014 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Time To Trial226 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1410 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time1459 days |
Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed
Date: February 04, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Li Zhu Liu
Date: February 04, 2014Case Management Statement of Li Zhu Liu Filed
Date: August 27, 2014Case Management Statement of Alfred Bianchi as Trustee of the Bianchi Trust dated November 13, 2006,
Date: September 02, 2014Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 18, 2014Rejection Letter Issued on Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: January 23, 2015Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: February 04, 2014Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: February 20, 2015Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: February 20, 2015Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: January 08, 2016Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: September 18, 2014Initial Case Management Conference 06/20/2014 10:00 AM D- 20
Date: February 10, 2014Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Defendant
Date: January 27, 2015Proof of Service on Motion
Date: January 27, 2015Declaration in Support
Date: January 27, 2015Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: February 10, 2014Rejection Letter Issued on General Denial To Complaint
Date: March 18, 2014Proposed Order
Date: January 27, 2015Non-Opposition to Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Li Zhu Liu
Date: February 13, 2015Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alfred Bianchi Filed
Date: February 26, 2014Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 05, 2014Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 18, 2014Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 05, 2014Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 05, 2014Proposed Judgment Received
Date: January 25, 2017Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: February 02, 2017Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 18, 2014Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Granted
Date: February 20, 2015Case Management Statement of Li Zhu Liu Filed
Date: December 24, 2015Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed
Date: February 20, 2015Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: June 12, 2015Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: March 03, 2015Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: July 22, 2015Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 22, 2015Case Management Statement of Li Zhu Liu Filed
Date: May 26, 2016Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: June 10, 2016Returned Mail: Dispute Resolution Program Filed
Date: July 01, 2016Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 23, 2016Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: July 22, 2015Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 27, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 05, 2017Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: March 30, 2017Letter from Lois Bianchi Filed
Date: March 24, 2017Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 27, 2017Miscellaneous fax from defendant received on 03/30/17 Filed
Date: March 30, 2017Notes: Interpreter Request filed for Li Zhu Lin
Date: April 03, 2017Case Management Statement of Li Zhu Liu Filed
Date: August 24, 2015Miscellaneous Notice to the Court Received
Date: September 02, 2015Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: September 10, 2015Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 10, 2015Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 10, 2015Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 28, 2015Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: November 10, 2015Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: January 08, 2016Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 10, 2016Substitution of Attorney Filed for Li Zhu Liu
Date: January 15, 2016Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: January 08, 2016Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: June 10, 2016Substitution of Attorney Filed for Li Zhu Liu
Date: May 26, 2016Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: September 23, 2016Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 23, 2016Case Management Statement of Li Zhu Liu Filed
Date: November 17, 2016Motion for Admissions Deemed Admitted Granted
Date: April 05, 2017Affidavit in Fact for a Matter on Public Record Filed
Date: November 28, 2016Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Li Zhu Liu
Date: April 04, 2017Motion for Terminating Sanctions Denied
Date: April 05, 2017Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: December 02, 2016Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: December 02, 2016Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: December 02, 2016Notes: Interprester requested for Plaintiff.
Date: April 13, 2017Miscellaneous Closing Argument Statement Filed
Date: June 22, 2017Proof of Service by Mail Tentative Case Management Order dated November 22, 2016 Filed
Date: December 02, 2016Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses... Filed
Date: March 21, 2017Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Li Zhu Liu
Date: March 17, 2017Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 30, 2017Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: March 30, 2017Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 30, 2017Motion for Terminating Sanctions Filed by Li Zhu Liu
Date: April 04, 2017Motion for Admissions Deemed Admitted Filed for Plaintiff
Date: April 04, 2017Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: April 05, 2017Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: April 19, 2017Application Re: Order Shortening Time Granted
Date: April 04, 2017Order Shortening Time Filed
Date: April 04, 2017Civil Court Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: April 19, 2017Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: June 22, 2017Ruling Taken Under Submission
Date: June 22, 2017Affidavit of Mistake re: Presentation of Clerk's Judgment Filed
Date: June 05, 2017Brief Plaintiff's Closing Brief Filed
Date: June 22, 2017Motion in Limine 1 - to Exclude the Use of Documents not Previously Produced Filed
Date: April 04, 2017List of Witness Filed
Date: April 04, 2017Miscellaneous Proposed Statement of Decision Filed
Date: August 02, 2017Order re Statement of Decision Issued
Date: August 02, 2017Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: June 22, 2017Proposed Judgment Received
Date: October 18, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: December 19, 2017Substitution of Attorney Filed for Li Zhu Liu
Date: February 02, 2018Statement of the Case Filed
Date: April 04, 2017Exhibits Filed
Date: April 04, 2017Proposed Order Filed
Date: April 04, 2017Civil Court Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: April 20, 2017Judgment Entered
Date: December 15, 2017Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: October 18, 2017Judgment after Court Trial - Contested Filed
Date: December 15, 2017Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-09-18T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed
Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on General Denial To Complaint
Date: 2014-03-18T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2014-09-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Li Zhu Liu
Date: 2014-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Defendant
Date: 2015-01-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2014-06-18T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 06/20/2014 10:00 AM D- 20
Date: 2014-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alfred Bianchi Filed
Date: 2014-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2014-02-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Li Zhu Liu Filed
Date: 2014-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Granted
Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alfred Bianchi as Trustee of the Bianchi Trust dated November 13, 2006,
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed
Date: 2014-02-04T00:00:00Non-Opposition to Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Li Zhu Liu
Date: 2015-02-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alfred Bianchi as Trustee of the Bianchi Trust dated November 13, 2006,
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2015-03-03T00:00:00General Denial To Complaint Filed for Alfred Bianchi as Trustee of the Bianchi Trust dated November
Date: 2014-04-02T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Tentative Case Management Order dated November 22, 2016 Filed
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Proof of Service Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion To Compel Further Responses To Form Interrogatorie
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-06-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-07-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Proposed Judgment Received
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Li Zhu Liu Filed
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Affidavit in Fact for a Matter on Public Record Filed
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Li Zhu Liu
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Li Zhu Liu
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Li Zhu Liu Filed
Date: 2015-12-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-11-10T00:00:00Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses... Filed
Date: 2017-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous Notice to the Court Received
Date: 2015-09-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2015-10-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Letter from Lois Bianchi Filed
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Li Zhu Liu Filed
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Li Zhu Liu Filed
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Returned Mail: Dispute Resolution Program Filed
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Li Zhu Liu
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Proposed Judgment Received
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous fax from defendant received on 03/30/17 Filed
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine 1 - to Exclude the Use of Documents not Previously Produced Filed
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Lois Bianchi as Trustee of the Bianchi Trust dated November 13, 2
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Proposed Order Filed
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous Closing Argument Statement Filed
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Affidavit of Mistake re: Presentation of Clerk's Judgment Filed
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Motion for Admissions Deemed Admitted Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Civil Court Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Li Zhu Liu
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Order Shortening Time Filed
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Order re Statement of Decision Issued
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Brief Plaintiff's Closing Brief Filed
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Proposed Statement of Decision Filed
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00List of Witness Filed
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Application Re: Order Shortening Time Granted
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions Filed by Li Zhu Liu
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions Denied
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Civil Court Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Ruling Taken Under Submission
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Lois Bianchi as Trustee of the Bianchi Trust dated November
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine 2 - to Exclude Testimony of Witnesses not Previously Identified Filed
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Motion for Admissions Deemed Admitted Granted
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Li Zhu Liu
Date: February 02, 2018Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: December 15, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: December 19, 2017Judgment after Court Trial - Contested Filed
Date: December 15, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.