Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Caire Medical Systems, Inc., Psm Magna Carta Insurance Companies, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case represented by William H. Westover, against Apria Healthcare, Inc., Caire Medical Systems, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2006 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 14, 2008Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 10, 2008Case Management Statement of PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies Filed
Date: July 29, 2008Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 16, 2008Rejection Letter Issued on Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party
Date: July 10, 2008Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: July 07, 2008Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 07, 2008Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: May 27, 2008Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 27, 2008Notice of Settlement of Statement Filed
Date: May 20, 2008Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: May 09, 2008Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: May 02, 2008Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 02, 2008Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: April 25, 2008Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: April 25, 2008Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Application
Date: April 24, 2008Declaration Application of Samuel L. Phillips
Date: April 24, 2008Proposed Order Application
Date: April 24, 2008Application Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies
Date: April 24, 2008Case Management Statement of PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies Filed
Date: March 14, 2008Case Management Statement of Apria Healthcare, Inc. Filed
Date: March 12, 2008Order and Stipulation for Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) Filed
Date: March 06, 2008Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 05/28/2008 01:45 PM D- 31
Date: March 06, 2008Case Management Statement of Caire Medical Systems, Inc. Filed
Date: March 05, 2008Separate Statement
Date: February 27, 2008Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 27, 2008Declaration
Date: February 27, 2008Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: February 27, 2008Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Apria Healthcare, Inc.
Date: February 27, 2008Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts
Date: February 25, 2008Index Table of Contents and Table of Authorities
Date: February 25, 2008Declaration in Support Nina M. Patane
Date: February 25, 2008Declaration in Support Andrea C. Avila
Date: February 25, 2008Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: February 25, 2008Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Caire Medical Systems, Inc.
Date: February 25, 2008Proof of Service on Deposition Subpoena as to Witness Karl Mims- Fire Investigator Filed
Date: February 06, 2008Proof of Service on Deposition Subpoena as to Witness Lawrence Picinion- Officer in Charge Filed
Date: February 06, 2008Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: January 03, 2008Cross-Complaint Filed for Caire Medical Systems, Inc.
Date: December 03, 2007Letter re selection of mediator Filed
Date: November 19, 2007Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: November 06, 2007Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: November 06, 2007Case Management Statement of Apria Healthcare Filed
Date: October 25, 2007Case Management Statement of PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies Filed
Date: October 22, 2007Case Management Statement of Caire Medical Filed
Date: October 12, 2007Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Caire Medical
Date: October 12, 2007Notice of Change of Name and Address Filed
Date: September 28, 2007Answer to Complaint Filed for Apria Healthcare
Date: September 19, 2007Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort As to Caire Medical Filed
Date: September 17, 2007Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort As to Apria Healthcare Filed
Date: September 17, 2007Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: August 29, 2007Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 29, 2007Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies
Date: August 28, 2007Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 28, 2007First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: August 28, 2007Case Management Statement of PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies Filed
Date: August 23, 2007Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/04/2007 09:00 AM D- 301
Date: June 28, 2007Notice of Judicial Assignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: May 21, 2007Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: May 02, 2007Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 02, 2007Case Management Statement of PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies Filed
Date: April 16, 2007Substitution of Attorney Filed for PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies
Date: April 16, 2007Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 07, 2007Case Management Statement of PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies Filed
Date: February 20, 2007Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 07, 2007Initial Case Management Conference 03/07/2007 02:00 PM D- 303
Date: January 18, 2007Miscellaneous Returned Mail to Plaintiff Filed
Date: December 12, 2006Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: August 31, 2006Initial Case Management Conference 01/19/2007 08:30 AM D- 21
Date: November 27, 2006Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies
Date: August 31, 2006Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed (Amended)
Date: August 31, 2006Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: August 01, 2008Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed
Date: July 11, 2008Application Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted
Date: April 25, 2008Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2007-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort As to Caire Medical Filed
Date: 2007-09-17T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2007-08-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies Filed
Date: 2007-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Name and Address Filed
Date: 2007-09-28T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/04/2007 09:00 AM D- 301
Date: 2007-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Assignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2007-05-21T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Apria Healthcare
Date: 2007-09-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2007-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2007-03-07T00:00:00Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Caire Medical
Date: 2007-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort As to Apria Healthcare Filed
Date: 2007-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2007-05-02T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2006-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2007-03-07T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 03/07/2007 02:00 PM D- 303
Date: 2007-01-18T00:00:00Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed (Amended)
Date: 2006-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2007-08-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies
Date: 2007-08-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies Filed
Date: 2007-10-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous Returned Mail to Plaintiff Filed
Date: 2006-12-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2007-11-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies
Date: 2006-08-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies
Date: 2007-04-16T00:00:00Letter re selection of mediator Filed
Date: 2007-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Apria Healthcare Filed
Date: 2007-10-25T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 01/19/2007 08:30 AM D- 21
Date: 2006-11-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies Filed
Date: 2007-02-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement of PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies Filed
Date: 2007-08-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Caire Medical Filed
Date: 2007-10-12T00:00:00Letter from Law office of Borton Petrini faxed to Court re: Status Report Filed
Date: 2008-05-02T00:00:00Order After plaintiffs' Exparte application to continue hearing dates on motions for Summary Judgmen
Date: 2008-04-25T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: August 01, 2008Case Management Statement of PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies Filed
Date: 2008-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2008-01-03T00:00:00Proof of Service on Deposition Subpoena as to Witness Karl Mims- Fire Investigator Filed
Date: 2008-02-06T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2008-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Caire Medical Systems, Inc. Filed
Date: 2008-03-05T00:00:00Order and Stipulation for Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) Filed
Date: 2008-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies Filed
Date: 2008-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2008-05-09T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed
Date: 2008-07-11T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies
Date: 2008-04-24T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Caire Medical Systems, Inc.
Date: 2008-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Settlement of Statement Filed
Date: 2008-05-20T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted
Date: 2008-04-25T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party
Date: 2008-07-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Pltf's Ex Parte Application for Continuance Fi
Date: 2008-04-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Apria Healthcare, Inc. Filed
Date: 2008-03-12T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 05/28/2008 01:45 PM D- 31
Date: 2008-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2008-05-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2008-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 10, 2008Proof of Service on Deposition Subpoena as to Witness Lawrence Picinion- Officer in Charge Filed
Date: 2008-02-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for PSM/Magna Carta Insurance Companies
Date: 2008-03-05T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Caire Medical Systems, Inc. Filed
Date: 2008-07-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2008-07-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for Caire Medical Systems, Inc.
Date: 2007-12-03T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Apria Healthcare, Inc.
Date: 2008-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 14, 2008Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2008-07-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.