Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
John E. Hill, Law Offices Of John E. Hill, Michael Guta, Michael Smith, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against John E. Hill, Law Offices Of John E. Hill, Michael Guta, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2004 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: February 09, 2006Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: May 04, 2005Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: May 04, 2005Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: January 06, 2005Miscellaneous Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed
Date: May 03, 2006Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: April 11, 2006Motion to Tax Costs - Granted in Part
Date: February 03, 2006Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: February 03, 2006Declaration in Opposition
Date: January 23, 2006Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: January 09, 2006Declaration in Support
Date: January 03, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: January 03, 2006Motion to Tax Costs Filed for Debtor
Date: January 03, 2006Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for John E. Hill, Michael guta, Law Offices Of John E. Hill
Date: December 16, 2005Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: December 09, 2005Judgment Entered
Date: December 08, 2005Judgment after Jury Trial Filed
Date: December 08, 2005Log of Court Reporter Fees Filed
Date: December 07, 2005List of Jurors and Fees Paid Filed
Date: December 07, 2005Log of Court Reporter(s) Filed
Date: December 07, 2005Receipt for Withdrawal of Exhibit(s) Filed
Date: December 07, 2005List of Witness Filed
Date: December 07, 2005Exhibit Lists Filed
Date: December 07, 2005Final Jury Instructions Filed
Date: December 07, 2005Jury Verdict (Special) Filed
Date: December 07, 2005Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: December 07, 2005Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: December 06, 2005Miscellaneous Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 05, 2005Declaration in Support of Defendamts' Motion For Directed Verdict Filed
Date: December 05, 2005Miscellaneous Defendants' Motion For Directed Verdict Filed
Date: December 05, 2005Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: December 05, 2005Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: December 01, 2005Miscellaneous Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 30, 2005Declaration in Support of Defendants' Motion For Nonsuit Filed
Date: November 30, 2005Miscellaneous Defendants' Motion For Nonsuit Filed
Date: November 30, 2005Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: November 30, 2005Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: November 29, 2005Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: November 28, 2005Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: November 16, 2005Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: November 15, 2005Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: November 14, 2005Miscellaneous Plaintiff and Defendants' Combined List of Trial Exhibits Filed
Date: November 07, 2005Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion No. 2 Filed
Date: November 07, 2005Miscellaneous Request for Jury Instructions (Plaintiff's) Filed
Date: November 07, 2005Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion No. 1 Filed
Date: November 07, 2005Trial Brief (Plaintiff's) Filed
Date: November 07, 2005Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 Filed
Date: November 04, 2005Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: November 07, 2005Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 Filed
Date: November 04, 2005Trial Brief (Defendants') Filed
Date: November 04, 2005Miscellaneous Defenants' Trial Witness List Filed
Date: November 04, 2005Miscellaneous Proof of Service (Defendants') Filed
Date: November 04, 2005Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion No. 12 Re Excluding Plaintiff's Trial Exhibits Filed
Date: November 04, 2005Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion No. 5 Re Excluding Evidence of Tax Issues Filed
Date: November 04, 2005Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion No. 2 Re Excluding Evidence of Insurance Filed
Date: November 04, 2005Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion No. 1 Re Excluding Evidence of Settlement Offers Filed
Date: November 04, 2005Miscellaneous Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions Filed
Date: November 04, 2005Statement of Damages (Defendants') Filed
Date: November 04, 2005Miscellaneous Defendants' Proposed Special Verdict Filed
Date: November 04, 2005Miscellaneous Defendants' List of Trial Exhibits Filed
Date: November 04, 2005Miscellaneous Defendants' Proposed Jury Questionnaire Filed
Date: November 04, 2005Miscellaneous Defendants' Proposed Voir Dire Filed
Date: November 04, 2005Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: November 04, 2005Master Jury Trial Called and Completed
Date: November 04, 2005Statement of The Case (Defendants') Filed
Date: November 01, 2005Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: November 01, 2005Notice of Filed
Date: October 27, 2005Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: October 21, 2005Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Denied
Date: October 21, 2005Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Taken Under Submission
Date: October 17, 2005Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: October 17, 2005Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 12, 2005Opposition to Motion to Strike Filed
Date: October 13, 2005Objections of John E. Hill, Michael guta, Law Offices Of John E. Hill Filed
Date: October 12, 2005Reply Separate Statement in Support of Motion Filed
Date: October 12, 2005Declaration in Support Filed
Date: October 12, 2005Reply Brief in Support of Motion Filed
Date: October 12, 2005Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: October 03, 2005Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication - Motion Rescheduled
Date: October 03, 2005Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: October 03, 2005Declaration to motion to strike Filed by Michael Smith
Date: September 29, 2005Proposed Order Filed
Date: September 27, 2005Proof of Service Re: Objection To Motion Summary Judgment Filed
Date: September 27, 2005Declaration in Support Andrew . Wanger In Support Re: Objection Filed
Date: September 27, 2005Objection To And Motion To Strike Plaintiffs' Opposition Filed
Date: September 27, 2005Separate Statement
Date: September 26, 2005Declaration second
Date: September 26, 2005Declaration in Opposition
Date: September 26, 2005Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: September 26, 2005Separate Statement
Date: July 20, 2005Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 20, 2005Proof of Service on Motion
Date: July 20, 2005Declaration in Support
Date: July 20, 2005Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: July 20, 2005Notice of Unavailability of counsel Filed
Date: July 11, 2005Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 04, 2005Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: May 04, 2005Case Management Statement of Michael Smith Filed
Date: April 19, 2005Letter re selection of mediater Filed
Date: February 07, 2005Case Management Statement of Michael Smith Filed
Date: February 04, 2005Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: January 06, 2005Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: January 06, 2005Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: January 06, 2005Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Philip J. Duncan, Duncan & Rainwater
Date: December 23, 2004Case Management Statement of Michael Smith Filed
Date: December 22, 2004Case Management Statement of Michael guta, Law Offices Of John E. Hill Filed
Date: December 22, 2004Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 15, 2004Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: November 18, 2004Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend
Date: November 18, 2004Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: November 18, 2004Proposed Order
Date: November 08, 2004Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed
Date: November 12, 2004Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: November 08, 2004Case Management Conf Continuance 01/06/2005 09:00 AM D- 113
Date: November 02, 2004Case Management Statement of Michael Smith Filed
Date: October 22, 2004Notice of Motion
Date: October 22, 2004Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 22, 2004Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 22, 2004Demurrer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Philip J. Duncan, Duncan & Rainwater
Date: October 22, 2004Case Management Statement of Philip J. Duncan, Duncan & Rainwater Filed
Date: October 19, 2004Case Management Statement of John E. Hill, Michael guta, Law Offices Of John E. Hill Filed
Date: October 18, 2004Initial Case Management Conference 11/03/2004 09:00 AM D- 113
Date: August 30, 2004Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: August 24, 2004Answer to Complaint Filed for John E. Hill, Michael guta, Law Offices Of John E. Hill
Date: August 13, 2004Cross-Complaint Filed for John E. Hill, Michael guta, Law Offices Of John E. Hill
Date: August 17, 2004Notice of unavailability of counsel Filed
Date: August 02, 2004Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Michael Smith
Date: June 30, 2004Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed
Date: June 30, 2004Objection To And Motion To Stike Plaintiff's Opposition Re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: September 27, 2005Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed
Date: December 08, 2004Proposed Order Filed
Date: 2005-09-27T00:00:00Notice of unavailability of counsel Filed
Date: 2004-08-02T00:00:00Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed
Date: 2004-06-30T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2004-11-18T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for John E. Hill, Michael guta, Law Offices Of John E. Hill
Date: 2004-08-17T00:00:00Objections of John E. Hill, Michael guta, Law Offices Of John E. Hill Filed
Date: 2005-10-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2005-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of John E. Hill, Michael guta, Law Offices Of John E. Hill Filed
Date: 2005-04-27T00:00:00Proof of Service Re: Objection To Motion Summary Judgment Filed
Date: 2005-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2005-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2005-10-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2005-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 01/06/2005 09:00 AM D- 113
Date: 2004-11-02T00:00:00Objection To And Motion To Stike Plaintiff's Opposition Re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: 2005-09-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2005-10-03T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for John E. Hill, Michael guta, Law Offices Of John E. Hill
Date: 2004-08-13T00:00:00Summons with Proof of Service As to John E. Hill, Michael guta, Law Offices Of John E. Hill Filed
Date: 2004-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2005-05-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Michael Smith Filed
Date: 2004-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Filed
Date: 2005-10-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Filed by John E. Hill, Michael guta, Law Offices Of John E.
Date: 2005-07-20T00:00:00Declaration to motion to strike Filed by Michael Smith
Date: 2005-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Michael guta, Law Offices Of John E. Hill Filed
Date: 2004-12-22T00:00:00Demurrer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Philip J. Duncan, Duncan & Rainwater
Date: 2004-10-22T00:00:00Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend
Date: 2004-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2005-05-04T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed
Date: 2004-12-08T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2005-10-03T00:00:00Reply Separate Statement in Support of Motion Filed
Date: 2005-10-12T00:00:00Objection To And Motion To Strike Plaintiffs' Opposition Filed
Date: 2005-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Michael Smith Filed
Date: 2005-04-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion No. 6 Re Excluding Evidenceof 6/7/04 Court of Appeal Decision Fi
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed
Date: 2004-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Philip J. Duncan, Duncan & Rainwater Filed
Date: 2004-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement of John E. Hill, Michael guta, Law Offices Of John E. Hill Filed
Date: 2004-10-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2004-11-08T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 11/03/2004 09:00 AM D- 113
Date: 2004-08-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support Filed
Date: 2005-10-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Michael Smith Filed
Date: 2005-02-04T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Michael Smith Filed
Date: 2004-10-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendants' Proposed Voir Dire Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Reply Brief in Support of Motion Filed
Date: 2005-10-12T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Denied
Date: 2005-10-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2005-09-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Michael Smith
Date: 2004-06-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support Andrew . Wanger In Support Re: Objection Filed
Date: 2005-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2004-08-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Philip J. Duncan, Duncan & Rainwater
Date: 2004-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2004-12-15T00:00:00Letter re selection of mediater Filed
Date: 2005-02-07T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Taken Under Submission
Date: 2005-10-17T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2005-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability of counsel Filed
Date: 2005-07-11T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2005-11-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion No. 2 Re Excluding Evidence of Insurance Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2005-11-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion No. 9 Re Excluding Evidence of Plaintiff's Health Issues Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendants' Proposed Jury Questionnaire Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion No. 8 Re Excluding Evidence of Alleged Underlying Fee Award Fil
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous Request for Jury Instructions (Plaintiff's) Filed
Date: 2005-11-07T00:00:00Master Jury Trial Called and Completed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2005-10-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion No. 2 Filed
Date: 2005-11-07T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2005-11-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion No. 4 Re Excluding Evidence of Undisclosed Expert Opinions Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion No. 1 Filed
Date: 2005-11-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion No. 7 Re Excluding Trial Witnesses and Potential Trial Witnesses
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion No. 12 Re Excluding Plaintiff's Trial Exhibits Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Strike Filed
Date: 2005-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion No. 3 Re Excluding Evidence Not Produced During Discovery Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2005-11-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion No. 5 Re Excluding Evidence of Tax Issues Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion No. 1 Re Excluding Evidence of Settlement Offers Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Statement of The Case (Defendants') Filed
Date: 2005-11-01T00:00:00Trial Brief (Defendants') Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous Proof of Service (Defendants') Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Trial Brief (Plaintiff's) Filed
Date: 2005-11-07T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Defendants') Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiff and Defendants' Combined List of Trial Exhibits Filed
Date: 2005-11-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendants' List of Trial Exhibits Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion No. 10 Re Excluding Evidence Relating to the Thelf of Def. Hill'
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2005-11-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defenants' Trial Witness List Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion No. 11 Re Excluding Evidence of Any Party's Financial Condition
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendants' Proposed Special Verdict Filed
Date: 2005-11-04T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Defendants' Motion For Nonsuit Filed
Date: 2005-11-30T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: February 03, 2006Motion to Tax Costs - Granted in Part
Date: 2006-02-03T00:00:00List of Jurors and Fees Paid Filed
Date: 2005-12-07T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2005-12-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendants' Motion For Directed Verdict Filed
Date: 2005-12-05T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Defendamts' Motion For Directed Verdict Filed
Date: 2005-12-05T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2005-11-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendants' Motion For Nonsuit Filed
Date: 2005-11-30T00:00:00Judgment after Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2005-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2006-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: April 11, 2006Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for John E. Hill, Michael guta, Law Offices Of John E. Hill
Date: 2005-12-16T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2005-12-07T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: 2005-12-08T00:00:00Log of Court Reporter(s) Filed
Date: 2005-12-07T00:00:00Receipt for Withdrawal of Exhibit(s) Filed
Date: 2005-12-07T00:00:00Log of Court Reporter Fees Filed
Date: 2005-12-07T00:00:00List of Witness Filed
Date: 2005-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: 2005-12-09T00:00:00Exhibit Lists Filed
Date: 2005-12-07T00:00:00Final Jury Instructions Filed
Date: 2005-12-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed
Date: May 03, 2006Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: February 09, 2006Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2005-12-06T00:00:00Jury Verdict (Special) Filed
Date: 2005-12-07T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2005-12-01T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2005-11-30T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to Motion for Tax cost Filed by John E. Hill, Michael guta, Law Offices Of
Date: 2006-01-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2005-12-05T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed for Debtor
Date: 2006-01-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2005-11-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.