Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bomar, Thomas H., Konstin, John, Konstin, Ann, Konstin, Sydna, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Murphy, Daniel Denis, Park, Arthur A., against Bomar, Thomas H., Konstin, John, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Peter J. Busch presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 30, 2010 |
CategoryTrust (Petition To Compel Trustee) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions560 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1465 days |
This complaint is a judgment in a probate case involving the Konstin Family Revocable Trust. The judgment dismisses Thomas H. Bomar from the petitioners' second amended petition and awards him costs of suit. The judgment was granted on September 6, 2...
ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENT THOMAS H. BOMAR'S JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: February 17, 2012RESPONDENT J. KONSTIN'S STATUS REPORT FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: April 16, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AMENDED FILED BY RESPONDENT BOMAR, THOMAS H.
Date: December 06, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, SYDNA KONSTIN, ANN
Date: March 09, 2012NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PETITIONER BOMAR, THOMAS H.
Date: February 22, 2012ORDER AFTER HEARING TO SECOND AMENDED PETITION FILED BY RESPONDENT KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: September 18, 2012NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY ZISER, GEORGE JOHN
Date: October 23, 2012ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: November 09, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, SYDNA KONSTIN, ANN
Date: March 06, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: October 11, 2011NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY ATTORNEY PARK, ARTHUR A.
Date: December 27, 2011NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY OTHER KONSTIN, CONSTANTINE AKA GUS KONSTIN
Date: August 17, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, SYDNA KONSTIN, ANN
Date: October 26, 2011NOTICE OF APPEAL/REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KONSTIN, SYDNA KONSTIN, ANN
Date: November 14, 2012AMENDED POS OF STATUS CONFERENCE STMT. FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, SYDNA KONSTIN, ANN
Date: February 27, 2013CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: December 31, 2012NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: April 18, 2013CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: November 19, 2012DIRECTORY NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT PURSUANT TO DECLARATION (CSR R. GALTEN)
Date: December 05, 2012ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS (CONSOLIDATED WITH ALL PURPOSES WITH PTR-11-294591
Date: July 27, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: January 10, 2011NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY OBJECTOR KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: June 14, 2011PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, SYDNA KONSTIN, ANN
Date: December 22, 2010RESPONDENT J. KONSTIN'S STATUS REPORT. FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: September 08, 2011NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY PARK, ARTHUR A.
Date: June 28, 2012PETITIONER'S STATUS CONFERENCE STMT. FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, SYDNA KONSTIN, ANN
Date: February 26, 2013MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY RESPONDENT BOMAR, THOMAS H.
Date: April 04, 2012NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL SENT BY COURT
Date: June 06, 2013PROBATE RESPONSE/ANSWER TO PETITION TO COMPEL TRUSTEE FILED BY OBJECTOR KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: January 07, 2011RESPONDENT J. KONSTIN'S STATUR REPORT. FILED BY RESPONDENT KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: February 26, 2013NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: February 10, 2011DECLARATION OF GLENDA GUTIERREZ FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: May 17, 2011NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, SYDNA KONSTIN, ANN
Date: November 30, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, SYDNA KONSTIN, ANN
Date: January 19, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, SYDNA KONSTIN, ANN
Date: December 22, 2010MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY OBJECTOR KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: October 04, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RESPONDENT BOMAR, THOMAS H.
Date: August 06, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL -AMENDED- FILED BY PETITIONER BOMAR, THOMAS H.
Date: February 23, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: February 15, 2011NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: November 30, 2011MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY RESPONDENT BOMAR, THOMAS H.
Date: August 06, 2012NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY RESPONDENT KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: August 08, 2012ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENT THOMAS H. BOMAR'S DEMURRER TO PETITIONER'S SECOND AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 10, 2012CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 54628783) FILED BY RESPONDENT KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: November 27, 2013ORDER DENYING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND REQUEST FOR STAY (A139159 DIV 1)
Date: August 02, 2013ORDER DENYING TRUSTEE JOHN KONSTINS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS
Date: December 27, 2012REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A137123 DIV 1
Date: May 19, 2014NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (8.124)
Date: November 14, 2012JUDGMENT FOR COSTS IN FAVOR OF RESPONDENT THOMAS H. BOMAR
Date: December 12, 2012NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY RESPONDENT BOMAR, THOMAS H.
Date: December 17, 2012MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY RESPONDENT KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: October 30, 2012NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: September 19, 2012MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED BY RESPONDENT BOMAR, THOMAS H.
Date: October 02, 2012NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY RESPONDENT BOMAR, THOMAS H.
Date: October 01, 2012RESPONDENT J. KONSTIN'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. FILED BY RESPONDENT KONSTIN, JOHN
Date: October 30, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2014 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Clarify Court Ruling
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CLARIFY COURT RULING, CALENDAR OF DEC-12-2014, OFF CALENDAR (MATTER SETTLED) PER COURT | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR DEC-01-2014. MATTER SETTLED WITH SETTLEMENT MANAGER, PANY LY, IN DEPT. 603. (206) | |
December 01, 2014 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CLARIFY COURT RULING (TRANSACTION ID # 56282150) FILED BY PETITIONER KONSTIN, SYDNA KONSTIN, ANN HEARING SET FOR DEC-12-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 204 | |
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 55675010), $588.53 ACCRUED COSTS AS TO TRUSTEE KONSTIN, JOHN | |
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $1,041.59 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE JUL-14-2014,, (TRANSACTION ID # 55635452) FILED BY RESPONDENT BOMAR, THOMAS H. | |
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 55584582) FILED BY ATTORNEY RANG, AMIR ATASHI | |
May 28, 2014 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A137123 DIV 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.