Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michelle Gilleece presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichelle Gilleece Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 17, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order Approving Final Accounting Filed
Date: September 12, 2022Stipulation & Order re: Appointment of Judge Pro Tem filed
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Administration to Creditors Filed
Date: July 20, 2021Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: April 08, 2022Proof of Publication re:
Date: June 08, 2021Receipt Filed
Date: May 18, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 11, 2022Notice Filed
Date: July 20, 2021Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed
Date: May 17, 2021Petition for Letters of Special Administration Filed
Date: May 17, 2021Initial Petition for Letters of Administration Filed
Date: May 17, 2021Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Accounting Report Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: September 24, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 17, 2021Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: May 24, 2021Order Appointing Personal Representative
Date: May 24, 2021Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed
Date: May 24, 2021Letters Issued - Special Administration
Date: June 02, 2021Surety Bond Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Surety Bond Issued
Date: July 12, 2021Order Appointing Personal Representative
Date: July 12, 2021Letters Issued
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Administration to Creditors Filed
Date: October 20, 2021Notice of Proposed Action Filed
Date: November 15, 2021Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: April 04, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 01, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 01, 2022Receipt Filed
Date: May 18, 2023Ex Parte Petn for Final Discharge and Order Filed - Probate
Date: May 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Petn for Final Discharge and Order Filed - Probate | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed RECEIPT FOR FEES |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed RECEIPT FOR DISTRIBUTIVE SHARE BY LANA OWENS |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Final Accounting Filed ORDER APPROVING WAIVER OF ACCT AND FIRST AND FINAL REPORT |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Signed | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Accounting Approved | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed SUPPLEMENT TO WAIVER OF ACCOUNT |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed Disclaimer |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal Filed SUPPLEMENTAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.