Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Dokko, Elsie, Lee, Patty, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Stephen M. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint was electronically filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco on January 5, 2022. The document is signed by Deputy Clerk Alison Agbay.
Unfortunately, the provided text does not contain any specific dollar amou...
PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL) (TRANSACTION ID # 67198327)
Date: December 28, 2021PROBATE WILL DATED FEB-09-2021 ADMITTED TO PROBATE ON MAR-08-2022
Date: March 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION REPORT, FEES FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE LEE, PATTY DOKKO, ELSIE | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF AUG-01-2023, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER AS MODIFIED. | |
August 01, 2023 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Report, Fees, Final Distribution
Judge: STEPHEN M. MURPHY |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF AUG-01-2023, TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF AUG-01-2023 | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-01-2023 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 204 | |
July 11, 2023 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Report, Fees, Final Distribution
Judge: STEPHEN M. MURPHY |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM JUL-11-2023 TO AUG-01-2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING ESTATE ACCOUNT (TRANSACTION ID # 70346753) FILED BY PETITIONER LEE, PATTY DOKKO, ELSIE | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING (TRANSACTION ID # 70346753) FILED BY PETITIONER LEE, PATTY DOKKO, ELSIE | |
June 14, 2023 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Report, Fees, Final Distribution
Judge: STEPHEN M. MURPHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.