Related Content
in San Francisco County
Ruling
LORAN SIMON VS. TODD BRABEC ET AL
Jul 23, 2024 |
CGC22601268
Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for July 23, 2024 line 1. PLAINTIFF LORAN SIMON NOTICE AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT 426 FILLMORE ASSOCIATION'S FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND FOR INTERROGATORIES, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS is continued to October 4, 2024. This action is stayed until September 23, 2024. As soon as the stay is lifted, parties shall meet and confer regarding (1) appointment of a referee and (2) the substance of this motion. No later than October 1, 2024 parties to file a joint statement addressing whether the parties agreed on the appointment and identity of the referee and outlining any remaining issues to be addressed on the merits of the motion. Joint statement shall not exceed 5 pages. =(501/CFH) Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 160 560 5023; Password: 172849; or Phone Dial in: (669) 254-5252; Webinar ID: 160 560 5023; Password: 172849). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified and the opposing party does not appear.
Ruling
ELIZABETH HSU VS. THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ET AL
Jul 22, 2024 |
CGC24613229
Matter on the Law & Motion calendar for Monday, July 22, 2024, Line 8. DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA's DEMURRER to 1ST Amended COMPLAINT. Off calendar. The parties failed to meet and confer in compliance with CCP 430.41. (Gonzalez Decl.) The parties are ordered to comply with the code. The Regents response to the amended complaint is now due by August 22, 2024. For the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address. =(302/CK)
Ruling
FUNG LEE VS. ANNIE O'KEEFFE ET AL
Jul 23, 2024 |
CGC23609939
Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for July 23, 2024 line 4. DEFENDANT ANNIE O'KEEFFE, MICHAEL MOORE DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT is OFF CALENDAR. Notice of Settlement on file. =(501/CFH) Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 160 560 5023; Password: 172849; or Phone Dial in: (669) 254-5252; Webinar ID: 160 560 5023; Password: 172849). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified and the opposing party does not appear.
Ruling
YAN KALIKA VS. TOMMY LE ET AL
Jul 22, 2024 |
CGC24614687
Matter on the Law & Motion calendar for Monday, July 22, 2024, Line 10. DEFENDANT TOMMY LE AND MICHAEL SCHIMMEL's DEMURRER to COMPLAINT. Sustained with leave to amend. Defendants demur to the first and third causes of action on the same grounds, that is, that these are fraud allegations and the specificity required of such allegations has not been provided. Defendants argue that these facts have not been pled: the "how, when and [by] what means" the fraud was communicated; that defendants had the requisite intent; a fiduciary relationship. Moving Memorandum at 4:8-14. It is correct that details of the communications have not been pleaded. I take the complaint to allege the statements were made by both defendants, but the complaint does not allege whether the communication was in writing or oral, or the date of the communication. Thus, the demurrers are sustained with leave to amend. The other objections to the complaint are overruled. Intent is alleged (complaint paragraphs 13-15) and there is no need to allege a fiduciary relationship. A new complaint must be filed and served not later than August 2, 2024. For the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address. =(302/CK)
Ruling
MHYF HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY ET AL VS. CHRIS V. KELLY ET AL
Jul 26, 2024 |
CGC21596771
Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for July 26, 2024 line 1. 1-CROSS DEFENDANT CHRIS KELLY INDIV AND AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE KELLY FAMILY TRUST, LARA KELLY DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT. Continued to July 30, 2024 to be heard with other pending motions. =(501/CFH) Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 160 560 5023; Password: 172849; or Phone Dial in: (669) 254-5252; Webinar ID: 160 560 5023; Password: 172849). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified and the opposing party does not appear.
Ruling
ANN WEST VS. MANOUSO MANOS ET AL
Jul 26, 2024 |
CGC23611164
Matter on the Law & Motion calendar for Friday, July 26, 2024, Line 12. 1 - DEFENDANT B.K.S. IYENGAR YOGA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION US' DEMURRER to Amended COMPLAINT. Defendant B.K.S. Iyengar Yoga National Association US's (IYNAUS) demurrer to the First Amended Complaint (FAC) is sustained in part with leave to amend and overruled in part. (The Court's complete tentative ruling has been emailed to the parties.) Friday's Law & Motion Calendar will be called out of Dept. 301. Anyone intending to appear in person should report to Dept. 301. However, anyone intending to appear remotely should use the regular Zoom information for Dept. 302's Law & Motion Calendar for 9:30 a.m. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the defendant is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address. =(302/RCE)
Ruling
1167 MISSION STREET, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED VS. IMAGE INTERIORS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED ET AL
Jul 24, 2024 |
CGC23609091
Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for July 24, 2024 line 3. PLAINTIFF 1167 MISSION STREET, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND TO STRIKE IMAGE INTERIORS LLC'S ANSWER DUE TO SUSPENDED CORPORATE STATUS is OFF CALENDAR, moot. See July 10, 2023 Lee Declaration. =(501/CFH) Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 160 560 5023; Password: 172849; or Phone Dial in: (669) 254-5252; Webinar ID: 160 560 5023; Password: 172849). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified and the opposing party does not appear.
Ruling
LATAYA ROBINSON VS. CHINATOWN COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CENTER ET AL
Jul 25, 2024 |
CGC22597463
Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Thursday, Jul-25-2024, Line 2, PLAINTIFF LATAYA ROBINSON's Motion To Compel Supplemental Discovery Responses To Form Interrogatories; Special Interrogatories; Requests For Admission And Request For Production Of Documents And For Sanctions. Pro Tem Judge William Lynn, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: Parties to appear if the motion remains unresolved. For the 9:00 a.m. Discovery calendar, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPARTMENT 302 DAILY AT 9:00 A.M.), or dial the corresponding number and use the meeting ID, and password for Discovery Department 302. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to williamclynn@gmail.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem. The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Discovery Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address. =(302/JPT)
Document
IN THE MATTER OF THE RAYMOND L. MAR REVOCABLE TRUST
Mar 07, 2019 |
Mary E. Wiss
|
TRUST (petition to modify trust, to compel co-trustees to account, to remove co-trustees, to declare deeds void; for redress of breaches of trust; to enjoin) |
TRUST (petition to modify trust, to compel co-trustees to account, to remove co-trustees, to declare deeds void; for redress of breaches of trust; to enjoin) |
PTR19302661