Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee For Cmlti 2007-Ar1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Heaney, Alexandra Rose, Risalvato, Anthony Joseph, against Cecilia Diaz, Gustavo A. Diaz, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. As Nominee For American Brokers Conduit, Nassau County Clerk, People Of The State Of New York, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Nassau Fp2 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNassau Fp2 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI)
Date: September 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 17, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 26, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004) Pacer closing Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004) Notice of sale Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004) Notice of sale Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004) Pacer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004) Notice of Sale Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004) Notice of Sale Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004) Order Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004) Pacer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004) Motion Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 17, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 17, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004) Judgment of Foreclosure and sale Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 17, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: May 28, 2021HARDSHIP DECLARATION
Date: March 04, 2021HARDSHIP DECLARATION
Date: March 11, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: October 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 17, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: March 03, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 17, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: March 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2023 | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) | ||
September 26, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 17, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 17, 2022 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
October 17, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #004) Pacer closing Redacted per 22 NYCRR Pacer closing Redacted |
||
October 17, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #004) Notice of sale Redacted per 22 NYCRR Notice of sale Redacted |
||
October 17, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #004) Notice of sale Redacted per 22 NYCRR Notice of sale Redacted |
||
October 17, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #004) Pacer Redacted per 22 NYCRR Pacer Redacted |
||
October 17, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #004) Notice of Sale Redacted per 22 NYCRR Notice of Sale Redacted |
||
October 17, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #004) Notice of Sale Redacted per 22 NYCRR Notice of Sale Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.