Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against David C. Sanders, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Subject Property Described In The Complaint,, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Jennifer M. Noto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennifer M. Noto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 09, 2021HARDSHIP DECLARATION - PROOF OF SERVICE AND AFFIDAVIT ATTESTING NO RECEIPT
Date: February 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2021SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.
Date: February 09, 2021NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: February 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N/A Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 09, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: February 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: February 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N/A Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT Â (Motion #01)
Date: July 28, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N/A Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: November 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #01)
Date: July 05, 2022ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N/A Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 29, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: November 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
November 04, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
September 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
September 01, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order of Reference, and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
July 28, 2022 |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #01) Default Judgment, Order of Reference, and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
July 05, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #01) Amended Notice of Motion for a Default Judgment, Order of Reference, and Judgment of Foreclosure and Amended Notice of Motion for a Default Judgment, Order of Reference, and Judgment of Foreclosure and ... show more |
||
July 05, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) Affirmation of Service |
||
June 29, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
June 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N/A (Motion #01) Order of Reference |
||
June 29, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) Affirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.