Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Stewart Title Of Sacramento, Inc., filed a(n) Civil: Limited-Roseville case represented by Jensen, Martin Niels Porter Scott A Prof Corp, against Daniela Goldsmith, Jeffrey Crews, Robert Goldsmith, Theresa Crews, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryCivil: Limited-Roseville |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Summons
Date: January 13, 2023Notice Case Management Conference
Date: January 18, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 13, 2023Complaint Interpleader
Date: January 13, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: December 18, 2023Declaration Supplemental of Martin N. Jensen in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Discharge
Date: December 07, 2023Proof Service- Summons Jeffrey M. Crews
Date: March 08, 2023Declaration Support of Martin N. Jensen in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Discharge
Date: August 30, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: August 24, 2023Case Management Conference Statement 8/28/2023
Date: August 11, 2023Declaration Support of Clark Davenport in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Discharge
Date: August 30, 2023Proof Service- Summons Daniela Goldsmith
Date: June 21, 2023Proof Service- Summons Theresa J. Crews
Date: February 24, 2023Case Management Conference Statement 05/15/23
Date: April 28, 2023Notice Change of Address
Date: August 01, 2023Reply Non-Opposition in Reply to Motion for Discharge
Date: November 17, 2023Proof Service- Summons Robert B. Goldsmith
Date: February 24, 2023Notice Rejection
Date: August 24, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: November 27, 2023Notice Case Management Conference
Date: August 30, 2023Memorandum Points & Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Discharge
Date: August 30, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: May 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | M-CV-0083110 Stewart Title of Sacramento, Inc. vs. Crews, Theresa J. ** NOTE: telephonic appearances are strongly encouraged Appearance required. Complaint is not at issue - Need responsive pleading, ... | |
January 08, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | M-CV-0083110 Stewart Title of Sacramento, Inc. vs. Crews, Theresa J. ** NOTE: telephonic appearances are strongly encouraged Appearance required. | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Supplemental of Martin N. Jensen in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Discharge | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply Non-Opposition in Reply to Motion for Discharge | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Support of Martin N. Jensen in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Discharge | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Support of Clark Davenport in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Discharge | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Case Management Conference | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Dishcarge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.