Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Gifford Business Park, Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Seide, Richard Laurence, against All Unknown Occupants, Does 1 To 10, Samir Salim Elashkar, An Individual, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A. Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael A. Sachs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial Unlawful Detainer $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is an unlawful detainer case filed by Gifford Business Park, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, against Samir Salim Elashkar, an individual doing business as SSS Auto Service. The complaint was filed in the Superior Court of Ca...
Landlord-Tenant Case Coversheet Filed
Date: April 06, 2023Status Conference - Unlawful Detainer
Date: April 06, 2023Notice to defendant
Date: April 06, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 06, 2023Unlawful Detainer Complaint <$10,000 Filed
Date: April 06, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 06, 2023Answer Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted
Date: May 08, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 11, 2023Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: May 23, 2023Request to Set Filed. Estimated Time:
Date: May 23, 2023Proof of Service of Pre Judgment Claim
Date: June 06, 2023Proof of Personal Service of Summons & Cmplt filed
Date: June 06, 2023Proof of Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: June 06, 2023Notice of Association of Attorney Filed
Date: June 12, 2023Notice Filed
Date: June 12, 2023Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: June 16, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Denied
Date: June 20, 2023Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: July 03, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment Filed
Date: July 03, 2023Trial Brief Filed
Date: July 11, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 11, 2023Proof of Electronic Service
Date: July 11, 2023Witness List Filed
Date: July 11, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2023Witness List Filed
Date: July 12, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 25, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: August 04, 2023Summary Judgment Filed
Date: August 04, 2023Application for Writ of Possession Filed
Date: August 23, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 23, 2023Memo of Costs Filed. Costs in the Amount of
Date: October 05, 2023Filing Fee Paid by
Date: November 17, 2023Writ of Possession Returned - San Bernardino
Date: December 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Returned - San Bernardino SATISFIED WITH COST OF 145.00 |
|
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $40.00 paid via file submit for Abstract and MOC 11/29/23 |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): rcvd via File Submit, abstract returned judgment amount doesnt match |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document(s) received via FileSubmit abstract kayla |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Memo of Costs Filed. Costs in the Amount of | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): As of 10/02/2023 Memo of Costs can no longer be submitted via File Submit. Please Resubmit via E-File. |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Fax rejected. Party notified to submit by FileSubmit | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued - San Bernardino mailed to attorney's office |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $41.38 file submit paid on 08/24/23 for writ/postage/copy fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.