Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Contractors Indemnity Company, Home Construction Solutions Corp A California Corporation, Ramos Antonio, Ramos Petra, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case against American Contractors Indemnity Company, Beloskty Vitaly, Home Construction Solutions Corp, Kenney Daniel, Tuffnell Design Group Inc., (total of 8) See All represented by Buchanan Natasha, Fallat John, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with Shirley K. Watkins presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management147 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2018 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint -
Date: September 25, 2018Summons -
Date: September 25, 2018Notice of Trial -
Date: September 25, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: September 25, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -
Date: October 04, 2018Answer
Date: November 05, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: November 08, 2018Answer
Date: December 18, 2018Proof of Service - No Service
Date: February 14, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 14, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: February 19, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: March 04, 2019Answer
Date: March 04, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: March 15, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 26, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 26, 2019Answer
Date: May 09, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: June 03, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: June 05, 2019Answer
Date: June 28, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: June 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 25, 2019Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment
Date: July 26, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: July 29, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 26, 2019Answer
Date: August 28, 2019Order - ORDER RE: MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: August 28, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 05, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 15, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 15, 2019Separate Statement
Date: December 13, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 11, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: December 13, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL P...)
Date: December 19, 2019Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: March 19, 2020Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: February 26, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 28, 2020Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: March 19, 2020Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: March 19, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 27, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 27, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 20, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 21, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 21, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: April 21, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 29, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 04, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 01, 2020Answer
Date: July 08, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: September 01, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 22, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 29, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: October 30, 2020Answer
Date: November 03, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 04, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: November 09, 2020Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: November 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: November 19, 2020Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: January 15, 2021Status Report
Date: July 22, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS
Date: July 29, 2021Status Report
Date: January 11, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 18, 2022Status Report
Date: January 20, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: January 31, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 14, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY CASE OF HOME CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS
Date: August 09, 2022Notice - NOTICE STATUS REPORT TO COURT RE: DEFENDANT WESTERN SURETY COMPANY
Date: September 26, 2022Brief - BANKRUPTCY COURT DOCKET
Date: October 11, 2022Notice of Motion - (AMENDED)
Date: November 18, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 18, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: November 22, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER OF DISCHARGE AND AWARD OF COSTS A...)
Date: December 08, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF BOND FUNDS
Date: January 06, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: March 02, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE /TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: March 17, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: May 25, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: June 06, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: June 08, 2023Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 14, 2023Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: June 15, 2023Joint Status Conference Report
Date: June 15, 2023Order - ORDER RE: FSC/TRIAL POLICIES
Date: June 22, 2023On the Complaint filed by ANTONIO RAMOS, ET AL on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Document:Notice-Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Proposed Answer to Complaint; Filed by: Daniel Kenney (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Western Surety Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: American Contractors Indemnity Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Joseph Robert Zetz, Sr (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Western Surety Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Antonio Ramos (Plaintiff); Petra Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Joseph Robert Zetz, Sr (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Order Re: Motion to Vacate Entry of Default; Signed and Filed by: Daniel Kenney (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Daniel Kenney (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Western Surety Company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Antonio Ramos (Plaintiff); Petra Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Daniel Kenney (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Bankruptcy Court Docket; Filed by: Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Western Surety Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Antonio Ramos (Plaintiff); Petra Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Antonio Ramos (Plaintiff); Petra Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: American Contractors Indemnity Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: James J Orland (Attorney)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment Filed by Daniel Kenney (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Antonio Ramos (Plaintiff); Petra Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Antonio Ramos (Plaintiff); Petra Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Antonio Ramos (Plaintiff); Petra Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by Daniel Kenney (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service Filed by Antonio Ramos (Plaintiff); Petra Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Antonio Ramos (Plaintiff); Petra Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Code of Civil P...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Answer Filed by Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Robert Houston Dewberry (Attorney)
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Antonio Ramos (Plaintiff); Petra Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Western Surety Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Home Construction Solutions Corp, a California corporation (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Antonio Ramos (Plaintiff); Petra Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Order (Re: Motion to Vacate Entry of Default) Filed by Daniel Kenney (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by Western Surety Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Answer Filed by Joseph Robert Zetz, Sr (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Proposed Answer to Complaint) Filed by Daniel Kenney (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Summons Filed by null
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Daniel Kenney (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: January 26, 2021Separate Statement Filed by Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint) Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Joseph Robert Zetz, Sr (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by Antonio Ramos (Cross-Defendant); Petra Ramos (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Antonio Ramos (Plaintiff); Petra Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Western Surety Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order of Discharge and...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Western Surety Company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Bankruptcy Court Docket Filed by Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Hearing on Motion for Order...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by James J Orland (Attorney)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Western Surety Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Western Surety Company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Antonio Ramos (Plaintiff); Petra Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing) Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted Filed by Western Surety Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by Kimberly Powell (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearings) Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Notice Notice of Hearing; Filed by: American Contractors Indemnity Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Answer Filed by Home Construction Solutions Corp (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Western Surety Company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order (Vacating Trial and FSC dates; Setting Trial Sett...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order of Discharge and...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order of Discharge and Award of Costs a...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Trial Setting Conference; H...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Order (Re: Motion to Vacate Entry of Default)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Cross-Complaint (First Amended)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00First Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Code of Civil P...))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Proposed Answer to Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Motion for Order (Motion for Order of Discharge and Award of Costs and Attorneys Fees)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order (Vacating Trial and FSC dates; Setting Trial Sett...))
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...))
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order (Vacating Trial and FSC dates; Setting Trial Sett...) of )
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order of Discharge and...) of )
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order of Discharge and...))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Trial Setting Conference; H...))
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Default entered as to Daniel Kenney; On the Complaint filed by ANTONIO RAMOS, ET AL on
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Daniel Kenney (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by ANTONIO RAMOS, ET AL on
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Antonio Ramos (Plaintiff); Petra Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Document:Summons Issued Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: American Contractors Indemnity Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Western Surety Company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Kimberly Powell (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Western Surety Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Hearing on Motion for Order...))
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearings)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint (First Amended)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Proposed Answer to Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...))
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Order (Re: Motion to Vacate Entry of Default)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Code of Civil P...))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order (Vacating Trial and FSC dates; Setting Trial Sett...))
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Motion for Order (Motion for Order of Discharge and Award of Costs and Attorneys Fees)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order of Discharge and...))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Hearing on Motion for Order...))
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearings)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Trial Setting Conference; H...))
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Home Construction Solutions Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Antonio Ramos (Plaintiff); Petra Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Answer Filed by Antonio Ramos (Cross-Defendant); Petra Ramos (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.