Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mai My Le, Phan Cammie Myhieu, Nguyen Michelle, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bohm James Glenn, against Nguyen Michelle, represented by Lai Hai, Nguyen Phu Do, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona Courthouse South with Gloria White-Brown presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management185 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 03, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions818 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HousePomona Courthouse South |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time986 days |
Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: February 20, 2019Answer
Date: March 01, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: April 03, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: May 07, 2019Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING
Date: May 07, 2019Order - ORDER PROPSED ORDER
Date: June 21, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: July 26, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR JUDGEMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: July 29, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: July 02, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EXPARTE APPLICATION
Date: July 31, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 30, 2019Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING
Date: August 02, 2019Order - ORDER ORDER ON EXPARTE
Date: August 02, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FOR MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Date: August 12, 2019Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION
Date: August 16, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: August 14, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SEAL MOTION TO SEAL DECLARATIION)
Date: August 23, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: August 23, 2019Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: September 05, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MICHELLE NGUYEN'S EX PARTE RE DEPOSITIONS OF MY LE MAI AND CAMMIE PHAN
Date: September 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAIN...)
Date: September 06, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MICHELLE NGUYEN'S EX PARTE ON 9/9/2019
Date: September 06, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL
Date: September 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIF...)
Date: September 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; HEARI...)
Date: September 13, 2019Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION ON OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE
Date: September 12, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: September 13, 2019Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RULING BY PLAINTIFFS MY LE MAI AND CAMMIE MYHIEU PHAN
Date: September 17, 2019Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED ISSUES
Date: December 11, 2019Witness List
Date: December 11, 2019Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF CONTROVERTED ISSUES
Date: December 11, 2019Trial Brief
Date: December 12, 2019Witness List
Date: December 16, 2019Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT MICHELLE NGUYEN'S STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED ISSUES
Date: December 16, 2019Statement of the Case
Date: December 16, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ...)
Date: December 16, 2019Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT MICHELLE NGUYEN'S STATEMENT OF CONTROVERTED ISSUES
Date: December 16, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF TRANSCRIPTS OF MICHELLE NGUYEN AND KEVIN TRINH
Date: December 18, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 1 TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANT TRIAL EXHIBIT NO.110
Date: December 18, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS OF MY LE MAI AND CAMMIE MYHIEU PHAN
Date: December 31, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE #1
Date: January 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (5-7 DAY ESTIMATE))
Date: January 07, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT MICHELLE NGUYEN'S MIL #1
Date: January 07, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL
Date: January 23, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION
Date: January 30, 2020Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER TO STAY ACTION
Date: January 31, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: July 16, 2020OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to file Compulsorycross-complaint)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND APPLICATION TO DISQUALIFY ATTORNEY)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint; Hearin...))
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Opposition (To Defendants Motion for Leave to File Compulsory Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Cammie Phanin)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Declaration (in support of opposition to ex parte application)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Compel Appearance at Deposition.Mai, et al. v. Nguyen; KC069769)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Declaration (in Support for Motion to File under Seal)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Order (propsed order)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel (Set by Court per Ex ...))
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to seal Declaration; Hearing...))
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Unavailability)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (For Judgment on the Pleadings as to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel (to appear for deposition)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continued Trial Date)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to seal Declaratiion))
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Order (Order on Exparte)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (For Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel (Set by Court per Ex ...))
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel (Set by Court per Ex ...))
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) re: Written Se...))
Date: January 30, 2020Opposition (to Ex Parte Application for Order to Compel)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in Response to Order to Show Cause re Dismissal)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS OF MY LE MAI and CAMMIE MYHIEU PHAN)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Stay Action)
Date: January 30, 2020Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (5-7 day estimate)))
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Compelling Plaintif...))
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiffs Statement of Controverted Issues)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: November 03, 2017Complaint
Date: November 03, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 03, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 08, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: December 05, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: December 01, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: December 06, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: March 21, 2018Answer
Date: December 19, 2017Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-04-05 00:00:00
Date: April 05, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-08-01 00:00:00
Date: August 01, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-05-07 00:00:00
Date: May 07, 2018Motion for Leave - Motion for Leave to file Compulsorycross-complaint
Date: December 05, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 07, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: December 19, 2018Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: January 18, 2019Opposition - Opposition To Defendants Motion for Leave to File Compulsory Cross-Complaint
Date: January 23, 2019Declaration - Declaration in support of opposition to ex parte application
Date: February 06, 2019Order - Order Tentative Ruling
Date: February 06, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint; Hearin...)
Date: February 06, 2019Notice - Notice Notice of Continued Trial Date
Date: February 06, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: February 06, 2019Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: February 08, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: February 19, 2019Motion in Limine (Defendant Michelle Nguyen's MIL #1)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Transcripts of Michelle Nguyen and Kevin Trinh)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Notice of Ruling by Plaintiffs My Le Mai and Cammie Myhieu Phan)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice (Defendant Michelle Nguyen's Statement of Uncontroverted Issues)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Appear at Deposition and Produce Documents)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Michelle Nguyen's Ex Parte re Depositions of My Le Mai and Cammie Phan)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For An Order Compelling Plain...))
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (on opposition to ex parte)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Number 1 to Exclude Defendant Trial Exhibit No.110)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application For Order Compelling Appearance At Deposition)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiffs Statement of Uncontroverted Issues)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Michelle Nguyen's Ex Parte on 9/9/2019)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: July 16, 2020Opposition (Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #1)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Discovery; Heari...))
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application For ...))
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice (Defendant Michelle Nguyen's Statement of Controverted Issues)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order to Stay Action)
Date: January 31, 2020Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.