Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America, A Connecticut Corporation, filed a(n) Limited Civil case represented by Dean P. Sperling, against Alfred Antonini, Alva Antonini, Texas Valla Real Estate I, Inc., A Texas Corporation, Wellington La Peak, Inc., Texas Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2003 |
CategoryLimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: October 12, 2005OEX - Continued
Date: January 13, 2006OEX - Bench Warrant ordered for $250
Date: October 21, 2005Order of Examination 10/21/2005 09:00 AM D- 504
Date: September 08, 2005Declaration Filed
Date: November 29, 2004Notice of Order Assigned to Dept 512 for All Purposes Filed
Date: December 21, 2004Declaration re: default Filed
Date: November 29, 2004Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: November 17, 2004Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: November 17, 2004Declaration Other: Application for entry of default
Date: September 27, 2004Proposed Judgment Request
Date: September 27, 2004Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: November 03, 2004Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Request
Date: September 27, 2004Rejection Letter Issued on Default Court Judgment (CCP 585)
Date: September 17, 2004Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: July 28, 2004Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: April 27, 2004Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alva Antonini Filed
Date: March 03, 2004Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alfred Antonini Filed
Date: March 03, 2004For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.