Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Waugaman VS Waugaman
On December 02, 2016 a civil case was filed by Waugaman, Danielle, against Waugaman, Clifford, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Lupe C. Garcia presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 02, 2016
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
DV-100 Request for Order, Domestic Violence Prevention
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Case Duration
2 years, 11 months and 4 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate Filed | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed for Danielle Waugaman | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed for Danielle Waugaman | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Domestic Violence Restraining Order (CLETS) Filed | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Domestic Violence Restraining Order (CLETS) Filed | |
May 14, 2018 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Lupe C. Garcia |
||
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Restraining Order After Hearing Granted | |
May 03, 2018 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Lupe C. Garcia |
||
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Continued | |
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Domestic Violence Hearing dept: 521 date: 05/14/2018 time: 09:00 AM | |
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing to Renew Restraining Order (Domestic Violence) (CLETS) Filed | |
April 23, 2018 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Lupe C. Garcia |
||
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing to Renew Restraining Order (Domestic Violence) (CLETS) Filed | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Continued | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Domestic Violence Hearing dept: 521 date: 05/03/2018 time: 09:00 AM | |
March 19, 2018 |
Hearing to Renew Restraining Order (Domestic Violence)
Judge: Lupe C. Garcia |
||
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Request Re: Hearing to Renew Restraining Order (Domestic Violence) Granted | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 04/23/2018 09:00 AM D- 521 | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Request Re: Hearing to Renew Restraining Order (Domestic Violence) Filed for Danielle Waugaman | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Request Re: Hearing to Renew Restraining Order (Domestic Violence) Granted | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing to Renew Restraining Order (Domestic Violence) (CLETS) Filed | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 03/19/2018 09:00 AM D- 521 | |
October 13, 2017 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Lupe C. Garcia |
||
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention Dropped | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 09/08/2017 09:00 AM D- 521 | |
September 08, 2017 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Lupe C. Garcia |
||
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 10/13/2017 09:00 AM D- 521 | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Amended Domestic Violence Restraining Order (CLETS) Filed | |
February 28, 2017 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Elizabeth Hendrickson |
||
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing Granted | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance (Domestic Violence) (CLETS) Filed | |
December 19, 2016 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Delia Trevino |
||
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 02/28/2017 09:00 AM D- 520 | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Reissuance of Temporary Restraining Order (DV) Granted and Notice of Hearing Issued | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance (Domestic Violence) (CLETS) Filed | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Amended Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS) Filed | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 12/19/2016 09:00 AM D- 504 | |
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (DV) Granted and Notice of Hearing Issued | |
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention Filed | |
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Domestic Violence Prevention) Received for Danielle Waugaman |