Related Content
in San Bernardino County
Case
Estate of David Ferguson Print
May 23, 2024 |
Candice Garcia-Rodrigo |
Petition for Letters of Administration |
Petition for Letters of Administration |
PROVA2400471
Case
Estate of JOSEPH BAGWILL Print
May 13, 2024 |
Candice Garcia-Rodrigo |
Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary |
Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary |
PROVA2400413
Ruling
EST OF RIFFEL
Jul 10, 2024 |
CVPB19-0030280
ESTATE OF BENNETT RIFFEL
Case Number: CVPB19-0030280
This matter is on calendar for further proceedings on Status of Special Administration. A Status Report
has been filed which indicates that the wrongful death action has settled and that the Special
Administrator will be filing a Petition for Discharge. This matter is continued to Monday, October 14,
2024, at 2:30 p.m. in Department 44 for further proceedings on Status of Special Administration and
Status of Petion for Discharge. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.
Ruling
In Re: Patrick N. Braunagel and JoAnn E. Braunagel Revocable Trust
Jul 11, 2024 |
23PB-0031909
IN RE: PATRICK AND JOANN BRAUNAGEL TRUST
Case Number: 23PB-0031909
This matter is on calendar for status of the case. The parties previously stipulated to vacate the trial
dates and to proceed with mediation. No Status Report has been filed. An appearance is necessary on
today’s calendar to provide the Court with a status of the mediation and, if appropriate, to re-set
this matter for trial.
Ruling
EST OF RIFFEL
Jul 10, 2024 |
CVPB19-0030282
ESTATE OF MELVIN RIFFEL
Case Number: CVPB19-0030282
This matter is on calendar for further proceedings on Status of Special Administration. A Status Report
has been filed which indicates that the wrongful death action has settled and that the Special
Administrator will be filing a Petition for Discharge. This matter is continued to Monday, October 14,
2024, at 2:30 p.m. in Department 44 for further proceedings on Status of Special Administration and
Status of Petion for Discharge. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.
Ruling
In Re: Lynda R Rice Revocable Living Trust
Jul 11, 2024 |
24PB-0032484
IN RE: LYNDA R RICE TRUST
Case Number: 24PB-0032484
This matter is on calendar for hearing on a Petition for Order Determining Trust’s Title to Real Property.
The matter has been properly noticed, with proof of service on file. The Petition establishes the
Trustor’s intent to hold the real property in the Trust. No objections have been raised. The paperwork
appears in order. The Petition is GRANTED. No proposed order was lodged with the Court. This
matter is set for Monday, August 12, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. in Department 44 for confirmation of lodging
and execution of order. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.
Ruling
GDN OF SANDERS
Jul 11, 2024 |
CVPG17-0029363
GUARDIANSHIP OF DEONDRE SANDERS
Case Number: CVPG17-0029363
This matter is on calendar for hearing on a Petition for Termination of Guardianship. Proof of
service is on file for the father. There is no proof of service on the minor, the mother, or the paternal
grandmother. The minor and the mother are required to be personally served; the paternal
grandmother may be served by mail.
This matter is continued to Monday, August 5, 2024, at 8:30 a.m. in Department 42. Petitioner
is ordered to file and serve a new Notice of Hearing with the continued hearing date on the parties
identified above. In the alternative, if Petitioner cannot serve the parties identified, the Court will
require a declaration explaining why they cannot be served and the efforts of Petitioner to locate
and serve the parties identified, in order to permit the Court to dispense with notice to the party.
Warning: Failure to properly serve or provide adequate basis to dispense with service as to
the necessary relatives will result in denial of the Petition. Notice is preserved. No
appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.
Ruling
Guardianship of CASADOS, et al.
Jul 10, 2024 |
CVPG12-0027051
GUARDIANSHIP OF AUBREY AND EVAN CASADOS
Case Number: CVPG12-0027051
This matter is on calendar for further proceedings on a Petition for Termination. This matter has
been properly noticed with proof of service on all living parties. No objections have been raised.
The Court has reviewed and considered the Court Investigator’s Report filed on April 4, 2024,
which recommends granting the Petition. The Petition is GRANTED. An Order Terminating
Guardianship has been submitted and will be executed. The minors are to be returned to the care
of their mother, Lindsey Cox. Upon execution of the order, the clerk is instructed to close the file
and vacate all future dates. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.
Ruling
Estate of Moseman
Jul 10, 2024 |
23PB-0032218
ESTATE OF RICHARD MOSEMAN
Case Number: 23PB-0032218
This matter is on calendar for hearing on the First and Final Report of Executor on Waiver of Account,
Petition for Compensation and for Confirmation of Advance Distribution. The matter has been properly
noticed with proof of service on file. No objections have been raised. The paperwork appears to be in
order. The Petition is GRANTED. A proposed order has been submitted and will be executed by the
Court. This matter is set for Monday, September 16, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. in Department 44 for
confirmation of filing of Receipts and a Petition for Final Discharge. No appearance is necessary on
today’s calendar.
Ruling
Estate of Zuno
Jul 10, 2024 |
24PB-0032428
ESTATE OF JOSE ZUNO
Case Number: 24PB-0032428
This matter is on calendar for hearing on an Amended Petition for Probate of Will. The matter has been
properly noticed, with proof of service on file. Proof of proper publication has been filed. The heirs
have waived the bond requirement. No objections have been raised. The paperwork appears to be in
order. The Petition is GRANTED. A proposed Order was lodged with the Court and will be executed.
The Will is admitted to probate, and the original will shall be filed. The requirement of a bond has been
properly waived, and letters shall issue. The matter is set for Monday, November 18, 2024, at 2:30
p.m. in Department 44 for Confirmation of Filing the Inventory and Appraisal. The matter is set for
Monday, July 14, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. in Department 44 for Status of Administration. The personal
representative is ORDERED to comply with Probate Code section 12200 et seq. No appearance is
necessary on today’s calendar.
TRUSTS