Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JUAN M SANCHEZ VS. LUKE LEONHARD
On May 22, 2018 a domestic violence prevention without children case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Rochelle C. East presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 22, 2018
Last Refreshed
August 29, 2022
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Roger C. Chan;Category
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION WITHOUT CHILDREN
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Case Duration
1 month and 28 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2018 | hearing |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Z
Judge: ROCHELLE EAST |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-20-2018 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 403 | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Z ON JUL-20-2018 OFF CALENDAR - PARTIES STIPULATED TO A NON-CLETS RESTRAINING ORDER | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING, HEARD ON JUL-20-2018 | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Z ON JUL-20-2018 OFF CALENDAR - PARTIES STIPULATED TO A NON-CLETS STAY AWAY ORDER | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST AND RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR DVRO FILED BY RESPONDENT LEONHARD, LUKE AS TO PETITIONER SANCHEZ, JUAN M | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER ON CALENDAR ON JUL-20-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 403 FILED BY RESPONDENT LEONHARD, LUKE AS TO PETITIONER SANCHEZ, JUAN M | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER SANCHEZ, JUAN M | |
June 29, 2018 | hearing |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Z
Judge: ROGER C. CHAN |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING FILED BY RESPONDENT LEONHARD, LUKE AS TO PETITIONER SANCHEZ, JUAN M | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: CARVALHO, FLAVIO SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR LEONHARD, LUKE | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Z ON JUN-29-2018 CONTINUED TO DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Z CALENDAR ON JUL-20-2018 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 403 | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER SANCHEZ, JUAN M AS TO RESPONDENT LEONHARD, LUKE | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-29-2018 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 403 | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY RESPONDENT LEONHARD, LUKE | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) FILED BY RESPONDENT LEONHARD, LUKE AS TO PETITIONER SANCHEZ, JUAN M | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) FILED BY RESPONDENT LEONHARD, LUKE AS TO PETITIONER SANCHEZ, JUAN M HEARING SET FOR JUN-29-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 403 | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) LUKE LEONHARD AGAINST JUAN M SANCHEZ | |
June 08, 2018 | hearing |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Z
Judge: ROGER C. CHAN |
|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-08-2018 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 403 | |
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (DV-109, DV-100, BLANK DV-120) FILED BY PETITIONER SANCHEZ, JUAN M | |
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING (CONTINUANCE REQUESTED BY RESTRAINED PARTY LUKE LEONHARD) FILED BY PETITIONER SANCHEZ, JUAN M AS TO RESPONDENT LEONHARD, LUKE | |
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Z ON JUN-08-2018 CONTINUED TO DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Z CALENDAR ON JUN-29-2018 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 403 | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) FILED BY PETITIONER SANCHEZ, JUAN M AS TO RESPONDENT LEONHARD, LUKE HEARING SET FOR JUN-08-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 403 | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) AS TO RESPONDENT LEONHARD, LUKE | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) FILED BY PETITIONER SANCHEZ, JUAN M AS TO RESPONDENT LEONHARD, LUKE |