Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Chou Lily, Chow Yuk Ling, Del Mar Gardens Llc, Suen Andrew, Suen Jeffrey, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Fu David Dai-Wung, against Chow Yuk Ling, Del Mar Garden Llc Aka Del Mar Gardens Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Ong Frank, Suen Andrew, Suen Jeffrey, (total of 13) See All represented by Cheng Jack Guan-Ting, Law Offices Of Cheng & Associates, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Glendale Courthouse with Ralph C. Hofer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph C. Hofer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management401 days |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions262 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseGlendale Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeTransfrd To Lasc Nc Dist.-Burbank |
Case Cycle Time168 days |
Notice - Notice of OSC
Date: January 30, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 30, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: January 30, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 30, 2018Summons
Date: January 30, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons
Date: February 16, 2018Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: March 12, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration
Date: April 03, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration
Date: April 04, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Miscellaneous-Other
Date: June 15, 2018Summons
Date: June 15, 2018Notice - Civil Deposit
Date: June 22, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: June 18, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: June 25, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-07-02 00:00:00
Date: July 02, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service -
Date: July 16, 2018Proof of Personal Service -
Date: July 16, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-07-17 00:00:00
Date: July 17, 2018Notice -
Date: July 31, 2018Declaration -
Date: July 31, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service -
Date: August 30, 2018Cross-Complaint -
Date: October 04, 2018Case Management Statement -
Date: October 11, 2018Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling re demurrer to cross complaint
Date: November 01, 2018Answer - Answer to cross complaint
Date: November 06, 2018Request For Copies
Date: November 09, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 17, 2018Certificate - Certificate of Mailing
Date: December 19, 2018Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: December 19, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 03, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 25, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: April 11, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: April 19, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL
Date: May 31, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL
Date: October 17, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF LILY CHOU IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 22, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 22, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 22, 2019Separate Statement
Date: November 22, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: November 25, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 22, 2019Notice - SECOND NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: December 02, 2019Request for Refund / Order
Date: December 13, 2019Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: January 06, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION EX PARTE CONTINUE TRIAL/MSJ
Date: January 13, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 15, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 29, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: February 21, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: June 10, 2020Other - - EXHIBIT LIST
Date: June 10, 2020Objection - OBJECTION RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: June 10, 2020Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: February 16, 2018Objection - OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR FINANCIAL DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANTS
Date: June 11, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR FINANCIAL DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANTS
Date: June 11, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 06, 2020Response - RESPONSE TO TENTATIVE RULING
Date: September 02, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER ORDER PERMITTING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY...)
Date: November 03, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: November 03, 2020Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF RULING
Date: November 04, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE
Date: November 06, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: November 10, 2020Order - PROPOSED ORDER
Date: November 18, 2020Motion re: - MOTION RE: CLARIFICATION OF ORDER RE MSJ
Date: November 24, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/14/2020
Date: December 14, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION
Date: January 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER CLARIFICATION OF ORDER RE MSJ FILED...)
Date: February 05, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2021
Date: April 15, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: April 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 15, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER
Date: April 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 29, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: April 29, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/29/2021
Date: April 29, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: July 21, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: July 27, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 27, 2020Order - ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO CONDUCT PRETRIAL DISCOVERY
Date: April 14, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: April 15, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA (CORRECTED)
Date: April 16, 2020Notice - NOTICE MINUTE ORDER -NEW HRG DATES
Date: April 27, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff); As to: VITUS F. SUEN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Second Notice of Errata; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability of Counsel; Filed by: VIRGINIA SUEN (Defendant); As to: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Default entered as to SHAU TANG CHEN; On the Complaint filed by LILY CHOU, AN INDIVIDUAL on
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Default entered as to STEPHEN HU; On the Complaint filed by LILY CHOU, AN INDIVIDUAL on
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by: Attorney; As to: SHAU TANG CHEN (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Objection re Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication; Filed by: VITUS F. SUEN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff); As to: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing on Demurrer Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Objection to Motion for Financial Discovery of Defendants; Filed by: VITUS F. SUEN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Request For Copies; Filed by: ANGELA YU (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Errata; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00; Default not entered as to SHAU TANG CHEN; On the Complaint filed by LILY CHOU, AN INDIVIDUAL on
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Answer to cross complaint; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Errata; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Opposition Ex Parte Continue Trial/MSJ; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Default entered as to ANGELA YU; On the Complaint filed by LILY CHOU, AN INDIVIDUAL on
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of Motion For Summary Judgment; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Errata (Corrected); Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Response to Tentative Ruling; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: VITUS F. SUEN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued (1ST APPEARANCE FEES PAID ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Minute Order; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Trial Date and Final Status Conference Date; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (AS TO ANGELA YU ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Summons Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Answer (to cross complaint) Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Summons Filed (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Updated -- Proposed Order: Filed By: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (ANDREW SEUN ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference and Status of Service of Defendant...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (AS TO SHAU TANG CHEN ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by null
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; and CASE MANA...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Opposition (Ex Parte Continue Trial/MSJ) Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Virginia Suen (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complainants' Unverified Cross-Complaint) Filed by Angie Yu Roe 1 (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference and Status of Service as to Defend...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by VITUS F. SUEN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Notice (Minute Order -New Hrg Dates) Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel) Filed by Vitus F. Suen (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE CHANGE OF HEARING DATE AND TIME OF HEARING)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Continuance of Hearing set on April 17, 2020 t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Order (Granting Permission to Conduct Pretrial Discovery) Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Notice (of Errata (Corrected)) Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Andrew Suen (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by: Attorney; As to: PATRICK, SUEN (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by: Attorney; As to: VITUS F. SUEN (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by:
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Document:Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Jury Fee Deposit by Defendant Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by: Legacy
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by: Attorney; As to: VIRGINIA SUEN (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Notice of OSC; Filed by:
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Jury Fee Deposit by Defendant; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Document:Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by: Attorney; As to: JEFFREY, SUEN (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Civil Deposit; Filed by: VIRGINIA SUEN (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability of Counsel; Filed by: Vitus F. Suen (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00; Default not entered as to ANGELA YU; On the Complaint filed by LILY CHOU, AN INDIVIDUAL on
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: VITUS F. SUEN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: VITUS F. SUEN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer; Filed by: Legacy
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer to Cross Complaint; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Notice (of Errata) Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing on Motion...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Virginia Suen (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Second Notice of Errata re: MSJ Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by VITUS F. SUEN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice (of Errata re: MSJ) Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel) Filed by VIRGINIA SUEN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Objection (re Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication) Filed by VITUS F. SUEN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Clarification) Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re SETTING OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re CONTINUANCE OF HEARING SET ON JUNE 24, 2020 TO...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS SET AUGUST 07, 2020 TO...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by VITUS F. SUEN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Order Permitting Pretrial Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Objection (to Motion for Financial Discovery of Defendants) Filed by VITUS F. SUEN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Order Permitting Pretrial Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Motion For Summary Judgment) Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Motion re: (Clarification of Order re MSJ) Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Response (to Tentative Ruling) Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Proposed Order Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice (of Minute Order) Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Date and Final Status Conference Date) Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Clarification of Order re MSJ Filed...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Objection (to Defendants' Notice of Ruling) Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by DEL MAR GARDEN LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (JEFFREY SUEN )
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Declaration (OF COUNSEL RE 4/16/18 OSC RE FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH TRIAL COURT DELAY REDUCTION ACT )
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (ANDREW SEUN )
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (YUK LING CHOW )
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Counsel re 4/16/18 OSC re Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act)
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS )
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Summons Filed (CROSS-COMPLAINT )
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Summons Filed (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Jury Fee Deposit by Defendant
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued (1ST APPEARANCE FEES PAID 06/15/18 )
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Jury Fee Deposit by Defendant
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice (of Posting Jury Fees)
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES )
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Civil Deposit
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice (of Errata)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE CHANGE OF HEARING DATE AND TIME OF HEARING))
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Motion for Order (Permitting Pretrial Discovery of Defendants' Profits and Financial Condition)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice (of Errata (Corrected))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Continuance of Hearing set on April 17, 2020 t...))
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Order (Granting Permission to Conduct Pretrial Discovery)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice (Minute Order -New Hrg Dates)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order RE CHANGE OF HEARING DATE AND TIME OF HEARING) of 04/22/2020)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Patrick Suen re Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Virginia Suen re Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeffrey Suen re Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Andrew Suen re Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Jack Cheng re Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Objection (re Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Vitus F. Suen re Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Yuk Ling Chow re Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Response (to Separate Statement re Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Charles A. Gabriels re Opposition to Motion for Financial Discovery of Defendants)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Patrick Suen re Opposition to Motion for Financial Discovery of Defendants)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Virginia Suen re Opposition to Motion for Financial Discovery of Defendants)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Andrew Suen re Opposition to Motion for Financial Discovery of Defendants)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Jack Cheng re Opposition to Motion for Financial Discovery of Defendants)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Financial Discovery of Defendants)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Vitus F. Suen re Opposition to Motion for Financial Discovery of Defendants)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Objection (to Motion for Financial Discovery of Defendants)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Order Permitting Pretrial Discovery...))
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re CONTINUANCE OF HEARING SET ON JUNE 24, 2020 TO...))
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Yuk Ling Chow re Opposition to Motion for Financial Discovery of Defendants)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Order re Evidentiary Objection re Motion for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeffrey Suen re Opposition to Motion for Financial Discovery of Defendants)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Proposed Order
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Request For Copies Filed by ANGELA YU (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference) Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Jury Fee Deposit by Defendant Filed by VIRGINIA SUEN (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((CROSS-DEFENDANT, LILY CHOU, DEMURRER TO DEFENDANTS AND CROSS-...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Summons Filed by null
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion for Clarification; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer Filed by null
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Objection to Defendants' Notice of Ruling; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (YUK LING CHOW ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Summons Filed (CROSS-COMPLAINT ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Civil Deposit Filed by VIRGINIA SUEN (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (JEFFREY SUEN ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Summary Judgment: Filed By: LILY CHOU (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by LILY CHOU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Jury Fee Deposit by Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Order Permitting Pretrial Discovery...))
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Objection (to Defendants' Notice of Ruling)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Response (to Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Date and Final Status Conference Date)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS SET AUGUST 07, 2020 TO...))
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Motion re: (Clarification of Order re MSJ)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Clarification)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Clarification of Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Order)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Order (re Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication and for Financial Discovery)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/14/2020)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Declaration (of Counsel in Support of Plaintiff and Cross Defendant's Demurrer to Cross Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (AS TO SHAU TANG CHEN )
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to Cross Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (AS TO ANGELA YU )
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; and CASE MANA...))
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((CROSS-DEFENDANT, LILY CHOU, DEMURRER TO DEFENDANTS AND CROSS-...))
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (re demurrer to cross complaint)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Answer (to cross complaint)
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference and Status of Service of Defendant...))
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Second Notice of Errata re: MSJ
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Notice (of Errata re: MSJ)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Lily Chou in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference and Status of Service as to Defend...))
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Samuel H. Jones in Support of Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment/Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing on Motion...))
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment and to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Opposition (Ex Parte Continue Trial/MSJ)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complainants' Unverified Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.