Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
Pointe Assets Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Allayee Azadeh, Hennigh Scott Edward, against Benson Industries Inc., Quanex I.G. Systems Inc, Quanex I.G. Systems Inc., Truseal Technologies Inc., Viracon Inc, (total of 7) See All represented by Allen David C, Cleeland Bruce L., Fisher Eric Seth, Schaus Elizabeth Trent, Christensen Hsu Sipes Llp, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Ralph C. Hofer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 07, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206
Date: 2023-07-28T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: January 12, 2024Appeal Document B330587; Relief Order for Respt. Extension of Time; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 22, 2023Application
Date: November 22, 2017Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: November 22, 2017Answer
Date: December 08, 2017Answer -
Date: December 08, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Compel
Date: December 08, 2017Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: December 19, 2017Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-12-21 00:00:00
Date: December 21, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration
Date: December 21, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: December 21, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Joinder
Date: December 22, 2017Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-12-22 00:00:00
Date: December 22, 2017Joinder -
Date: December 22, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion for an Order
Date: December 28, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 12, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Reply in Support
Date: January 19, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-01-26 00:00:00
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: February 02, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 09, 2018Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: February 05, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration
Date: February 13, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Request
Date: February 15, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: February 22, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 23, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Compel
Date: February 23, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: February 23, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration
Date: February 23, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 28, 2018Application
Date: February 28, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice of Application
Date: February 28, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-03-12 00:00:00
Date: March 12, 2018Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: March 12, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: March 12, 2018Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Protective Order
Date: March 12, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: March 14, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Compel
Date: March 15, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-03-23 00:00:00
Date: March 23, 2018Association of Attorney
Date: March 20, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order
Date: March 23, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order
Date: March 26, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration
Date: September 24, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion for an Order
Date: September 24, 2018Proof of Service by Mail -
Date: September 24, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 24, 2018Opposition -
Date: October 05, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-10-03 00:00:00
Date: October 03, 2018Notice - of Hearing
Date: October 05, 2018Declaration - of Garrett M Mott in support of plaintiff pointe assets, LLC's reply
Date: October 12, 2018Reply - in support of plaintiff pointe assets motion for leave
Date: October 12, 2018Declaration - Declaration of Joseph M. Wahl
Date: November 13, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Motion for Leave)
Date: October 19, 2018Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: November 13, 2018Declaration - Declaration of John R.Maley
Date: November 13, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 26, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time ...)
Date: November 27, 2018Opposition - Opposition Pltf's Ex Parte Request to Shorten Time
Date: November 27, 2018Declaration - Declaration of Eric J. Nystrom
Date: November 30, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 30, 2018Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application to confirm proper hearing
Date: November 30, 2018Declaration - Declaration in support of plaintiff's ex parte
Date: November 30, 2018Opposition - Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Request to Change Hearing Date
Date: November 30, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex Parte Application for an Order to Confirm Proper Hearing D...)
Date: December 03, 2018Order - Kristine M. Hicks, CSR 13634 for 12/03/2018 Ex Parte Hearing in Department NCD
Date: December 03, 2018Opposition - Opposition to defendant's viracon, inc. motion to compel
Date: December 03, 2018Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: December 06, 2018Declaration - Declaration of Eric J Nystrom in support of ex parte
Date: December 12, 2018Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application to Recover Increased Travel Costs
Date: December 12, 2018Notice - Notice of Entry of Order
Date: December 12, 2018Opposition - Opposition to defendant viracon, inc. ex parte application
Date: December 13, 2018Declaration - Declaration of Bryan M Gragg in support of plaintiff's ex parte
Date: December 14, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel))
Date: December 14, 2018Notice - Notice of ruling
Date: December 17, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint, filed 10/05/2018...)
Date: December 21, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 07, 2017Complaint
Date: November 07, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 07, 2017Notice - Notice of order to show cause RE failure to comply with trial court delay reduction act
Date: November 07, 2017Summons
Date: November 08, 2017Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: November 13, 2017Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 17, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 17, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 22, 2017Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Case Management Order Vacating Fi...)
Date: February 22, 2019RETURNED MAIL
Date: March 05, 2019Notice - Notice OF COURT'S NOTICE OF VACATING FEB 28 2019
Date: March 06, 2019Order - DEBORAH L. STOUGH, CSR NO. 8925 12/14/2018 FOR DEPARTMENT NCD
Date: March 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 13, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRE
Date: July 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION)
Date: July 13, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 21, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: July 22, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: July 22, 2020Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: July 24, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 05, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE
Date: August 05, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 05, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: August 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRE;)
Date: August 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER MINUTE ORDER OF 8/19/2020 FOR DEPARTMENT D)
Date: September 01, 2020Order - ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: September 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED ...)
Date: September 02, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: December 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO VACATE THE ARBITRATOR'S MAY 4, 2...)
Date: December 11, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: December 18, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ASSOCIATION OF CO-COUNSEL
Date: March 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 08, 2021Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: January 20, 2022Subpoena & Proof of Service
Date: January 20, 2022Subpoena & Proof of Service
Date: January 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: May 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STAY; POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 27, 2022Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: December 20, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 20, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STAY)
Date: December 15, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 20, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 30, 2022Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: March 26, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Request for Dismissal-Partial
Date: April 10, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order
Date: April 13, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-04-13 00:00:00
Date: April 13, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: April 17, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Request
Date: April 19, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Objection
Date: April 27, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: April 30, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration
Date: May 18, 2018Brief
Date: May 18, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 18, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: June 07, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Reply
Date: June 08, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order
Date: June 22, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-06-22 00:00:00
Date: June 22, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: June 26, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - No Order
Date: July 10, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: July 10, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - NO Order
Date: July 10, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: July 17, 2018Notice of Continuance -
Date: July 17, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: July 17, 2018Request for Judicial Notice -
Date: July 20, 2018Notice of Motion -
Date: July 20, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 20, 2018Proof of Service by Mail -
Date: July 20, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities -
Date: July 20, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 20, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: July 20, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 20, 2018RETURNED MAIL -
Date: July 23, 2018Notice of Motion -
Date: July 23, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION
Date: July 23, 2018Declaration -
Date: July 23, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: July 23, 2018RETURNED MAIL -
Date: August 03, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment -
Date: September 04, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: September 04, 2018Declaration -
Date: September 24, 2018Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: January 10, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF REJECTION - PLEADINGS
Date: January 10, 2023Correspondence - CIVIL DEPOSIT FORM - PAYMENT OF PRO HAC VICE FEES
Date: January 24, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO FILE THREE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL ...)
Date: February 24, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: March 01, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 10, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 15, 2023Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: March 17, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: March 21, 2023Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: March 24, 2023Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEYS OF RECORD
Date: March 23, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: March 27, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: April 24, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 11, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/11/2023
Date: April 11, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)
Date: April 27, 2023Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: April 27, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 27, 2023Judgment
Date: April 27, 2023Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: April 28, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: May 04, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: May 12, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 16, 2023Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: May 16, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: June 08, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration
Date: June 08, 2018Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Date: July 22, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: March 14, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION CONFERENCE)
Date: September 18, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FURTHER ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: September 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION)
Date: January 14, 2020Request For Copies
Date: September 26, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 15, 2020Motion to Transfer
Date: July 09, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: May 31, 2023Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale
Date: June 30, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF BOND
Date: July 20, 2023Undertaking - SUPERSEDEAS BOND BOND NO. 190053815
Date: July 20, 2023Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Joinder; Filed by:
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Document:Joinder Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Notice of order to show cause RE failure to comply with trial court delay reduction act; Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Document:Application-Pro Hac Vice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice-Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Document:Complaint Fld - No Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Document:Reply in Support Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by:
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Document:Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn. Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by:
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal-Partial Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Document:Notice, Association of Counsel Filed by: Associated Counsel
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Document:Application - Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Document:Objection Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Document:Reply Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Interested Party
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Document:Notice of Status Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Document:Reply Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Requestor
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Protective Order; Filed by:
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Interested Party
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Declaration of Eric J Nystrom in support of ex parte; Filed by: VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to confirm proper hearing; Filed by: POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Reply in support of plaintiff pointe assets motion for leave; Filed by: POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Declaration of Garrett M Mott in support of plaintiff pointe assets, LLC's reply; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; Filed by: VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Opposition to defendant's viracon, inc. motion to compel; Filed by: POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Opposition to defendant viracon, inc. ex parte application; Filed by: POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Declaration of Eric J. Nystrom; Filed by: VIRACON, INC (Defendant); Viracon, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Declaration in support of plaintiff's ex parte; Filed by: POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Order proposed order granting; Filed by: VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Lori Anastasiou, CSR NO. 4345; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Kristine M. Hicks, CSR 13634 for Ex Parte Hearing in Department NCD; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00Notice NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ASSOCIATION OF CO-COUNSEL; Filed by: VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Subpoena & Proof of Service; Filed by: POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Declaration Declaration In Support Of Motion To Vacate; Filed by: VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Joinder; Filed by: VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Complex Civil Case Questionnaire;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Natalie I Uhlemann (Attorney)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Viracon, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Pla...)
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: June 30, 2023Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: June 27, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 13, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: July 14, 2023Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 18, 2023Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order Minute Order of for Department D) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Motion to Transfer; Filed by: POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Viracon, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Lodging COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRE; Filed by: POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Viracon, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-01T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: Viracon, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-31T00:00:00Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Viracon, Inc., (Defendant); As to: POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-04T00:00:00Updated -- Judgment: Filed By: Viracon, Inc., (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date:
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00Notice of ruling; Filed by: VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Request For Copies; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Correspondence Civil Deposit form - Payment of Pro Hac Vice Fees; Filed by:
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER )
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Request (FOR COPIES - 8 PAGES )
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint, filed ...))
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA RE DEFT VIRACON, INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO PLTF'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER )
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Application
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Request (FOR COPIES OF DECLARATION & ORDER ADVANCING JURY FEES - 2 PAGES )
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Complex Civil Case Questionnaire;))
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Request
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER )
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER )
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Application
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Opposition (to defendant viracon, inc. ex parte application)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ASSOCIATION OF CO-COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Notice, Association of Counsel
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Request (FOR COPY OF DISMISSAL, DATED - 6 PAGES )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA RE PLTF'S REPLY TO DEFTS VIRACON'S AND QUANEX/TRUSEAL'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING )
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel (DEPOSITION OF BENSON INDUSTRIES, INC.'S PERSON(S) MOST QUALIFIED; SET ON )
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Joseph M. Wahl)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Notice (AMENDED NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER )
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Declaration (AND ORDER RE ADVANCE JURY FEES )
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re: Status of Arbitration Conference))
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal-Partial
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFT BENSON INDUSTRIES INC. )
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Application
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Request
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Notice (OF COURT'S NOTICE OF VACATING FEB 28 2019)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Notice (of order to show cause RE failure to comply with trial court delay reduction act)
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Request (FOR COPIES OF NOTICE AND DISMISSAL 11 PAGES )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Counsel)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Reply (TO DEFTS VIRACON'S AND QUANEZ/ TRUSEAL'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING )
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Motion re: (for Non-Monetary and Monetary Sanctions, Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Objection (TO PLTF'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER )
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Notice (OF RULINGS FROM JULY 13, 2020 HEARING ON COURT?S OSC REGARDING STATUS OF ARBITRATION)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF HEARING)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Brief (SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF JOINDER TO MOTION TO COMPEL AR- BITRATION )
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Declaration (in support of plaintiff's ex parte)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference; Status Conference Re: Stay))
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Motion to Transfer
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Subpoena & Proof of Service
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Request
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Declaration (OF JENNIFER K. STINNETT )
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Reply in Support
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference; Status Conference Re: Stay))
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Subpoena & Proof of Service
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel (AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRA- TION AND STAY LITIGATION; SET )
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel (ARBITRATION AND STAY LITIGATION; SET )
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF JOINDER TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION )
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Establishing a Protocol for the P...))
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Stay; Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Recover Increased Travel Costs)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order Shortening Time for Hearing Related to 128.7 Motion)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARB ITRATION AND STAY LITIGATION )
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Eric J. Nystrom)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRE)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time ...))
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order Minute Order of for Department D))
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Opposition (to defendant's viracon, inc. motion to compel)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Bryan M Gragg in support of plaintiff's ex parte)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF FURTHER ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Deborah L. Stough, CSR No. 8925 for Department NCD
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Establishing a P...))
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Arbitration))
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Motion for an Order (TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; SET )
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Opposition (Pltf's Ex Parte Request to Shorten Time)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Complex Civil Case Questionnaire;) of )
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Notice (of ruling)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Cross-Defendants Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT )
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Declaration (of John R.Maley)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY LITIGATION )
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Establishing a Protocol for the P...))
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration In Support Of Motion To Vacate)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF JOSEPH M. WAHL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION )
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Arbitration))
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Eric J Nystrom in support of ex parte)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion for Leave))
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Vacate the Arbitrator's May 4, 2...))
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Motion for Order (Notice Of Motion And Motion To Vacate The Arbitrator's May 4, 2020 Ruling)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Notice of Rejection - Pleadings)
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Objection (DEFENDANT VIRACON, INC.'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF POINTE ASSETS, LLC'S PROPOSED JUDGMENT)
Date: 2023-04-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2023-03-15T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2023-05-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2023-05-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Judgment) of )
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2023-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Stay; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Ar...))
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Withdrawal of Attorneys of Record)
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Pla...))
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER)
Date: 2023-04-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Judgment))
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Reply in Support
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Notice (OF PLTF'S WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY )
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Request
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Reply (MEMO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION AND COMPEL AR- BITRATION )
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Quanex and Truseal's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to Amend Complaint
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (application for an order to show cause re pro hac vice)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Reply (in support of plaintiff pointe assets motion for leave)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex Parte Application for an Order to Confirm Proper Hearing D...))
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice (RE CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CON- FERENCE )
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2023-03-01T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Request to Change Hearing Date)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Case Management Order Vacating Fi...))
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order filed ...))
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to confirm proper hearing)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to File Three Documents under Seal ...))
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order Minute Order of for Department D) of )
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For A Protective Order filed ...))
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Order (Denying Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For Protective Order)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel)))
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel (ARBITRATION AND JOINDER TO VIRACON, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; SET )
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Notice Filed by Quanex I.G. Systems, Inc., (Defendant); Truseal Technologies Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Viracon, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Viracon, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Truseal Technologies Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Summons Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Declaration Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to confirm proper hearing) Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Motion for an Order Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Declaration (in support of plaintiff's ex parte) Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Notice Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Request (FOR COPIES OF NOTICE AND DISMISSAL 11 PAGES ) Filed by Interested Party
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Request Filed by Interested Party
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Notice (OF PLTF'S WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Objection (TO PLTF'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Reply Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Objection Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Notice Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Notice Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by QUANEX I.G. SYSTEMS INC (Defendant); TRUSEAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice (AMENDED NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Request Filed by Interested Party
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Eric J. Nystrom) Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant); Viracon, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Application Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Declaration Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Brief Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Quanex I.G. Systems, Inc., (Defendant); Truseal Technologies Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Notice, Association of Counsel Filed by Associated Counsel
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Reply (in support of plaintiff pointe assets motion for leave) Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Order Filed by QUANEX I.G. SYSTEMS INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by BENSON INDUSTRIES INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal-Partial Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by BENSON INDUSTRIES INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRE) Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF HEARING) Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Declaration Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Order Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF FURTHER ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE) Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex Parte Application for an Order to Confirm Proper Hearing D...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re: Status of Arbitration Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Request (FOR COPIES - 8 PAGES ) Filed by Requestor
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Notice Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Establishing a Protocol for the P...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Opposition (to defendant viracon, inc. ex parte application) Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration In Support Of Motion To Vacate) Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE) Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Request For Copies Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Establishing a Protocol for the P...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Joinder Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Notice (OF COURT'S NOTICE OF VACATING FEB 28 2019) Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Court
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Benson Industries Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Quanex I.G. Systems, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Application Filed by Viracon, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Notice (of order to show cause RE failure to comply with trial court delay reduction act) Filed by Court
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Notice Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Application Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Request (FOR COPY OF DISMISSAL, DATED - 6 PAGES ) Filed by Interested Party
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Declaration Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Joinder Filed by Quanex I.G. Systems, Inc., (Defendant); Truseal Technologies Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Declaration (AND ORDER RE ADVANCE JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Complex Civil Case Questionnaire;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Complex Civil Case Questionnaire;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For A Protective Order filed ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Viracon, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order Minute Order of for Department D) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion for Leave)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order Minute Order of for Department D)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Notice of Rejection - Pleadings) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Stay; Post-Arbitration Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to File Three Documents under Seal ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Complaint Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Reply in Support Filed by Quanex I.G. Systems, Inc., (Defendant); Truseal Technologies Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Reply (TO DEFTS VIRACON'S AND QUANEZ/ TRUSEAL'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Request Filed by Viracon, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed by QUANEX I.G. SYSTEMS INC (Defendant); TRUSEAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Reply Filed by QUANEX I.G. SYSTEMS INC (Defendant); TRUSEAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice (RE CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CON- FERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Declaration Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Opposition (to defendant's viracon, inc. motion to compel) Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Eric J Nystrom in support of ex parte) Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Notice Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Notice Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel (ARBITRATION AND STAY LITIGATION; SET ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Declaration Filed by QUANEX I.G. SYSTEMS INC (Defendant); TRUSEAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice (of ruling) Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Request Filed by Requestor
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Reply Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Joinder Filed by Viracon, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Notice Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint, filed ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Motion to Transfer Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Viracon, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ASSOCIATION OF CO-COUNSEL) Filed by VIRACON, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference; Status Conference Re: Stay)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Subpoena & Proof of Service Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Establishing a P...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Case Management Order Vacating Fi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Natalie I Uhlemann (Attorney)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Viracon, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by QUANEX I.G. SYSTEMS INC (Defendant); TRUSEAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Subpoena & Proof of Service Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order filed ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Vacate the Arbitrator's May 4, 2...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Court
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Filed by Viracon, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by QUANEX I.G. SYSTEMS INC (Defendant); TRUSEAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Brief Filed by QUANEX I.G. SYSTEMS INC (Defendant); TRUSEAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Declaration (OF JENNIFER K. STINNETT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order) Filed by POINTE ASSETS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference; Status Conference Re: Stay)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Request (FOR COPIES OF DECLARATION & ORDER ADVANCING JURY FEES - 2 PAGES ) Filed by Interested Party
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Reply in Support Filed by Benson Industries Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Notice (of order to show cause RE failure to comply with trial court delay reduction act)
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (AND ORDER RE ADVANCE JURY FEES )
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Request (FOR COPIES OF DECLARATION & ORDER ADVANCING JURY FEES - 2 PAGES )
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel (DEPOSITION OF BENSON INDUSTRIES, INC.'S PERSON(S) MOST QUALIFIED; SET ON 05/18/18 )
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER )
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Notice (AMENDED NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER )
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel (AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRA- TION AND STAY LITIGATION; SET 04/13/18 )
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER )
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFT BENSON INDUSTRIES INC. )
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER )
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Request (FOR COPIES OF NOTICE AND DISMISSAL 11 PAGES )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Request (FOR COPY OF DISMISSAL, DATED 04/10/2018- 6 PAGES )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Objection (TO PLTF'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER )
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA RE DEFT VIRACON, INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO PLTF'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER )
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Brief (SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF JOINDER TO MOTION TO COMPEL AR- BITRATION )
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Declaration (OF JENNIFER K. STINNETT )
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Reply (TO DEFTS VIRACON'S AND QUANEZ/ TRUSEAL'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING )
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Request (FOR COPIES - 8 PAGES )
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Reply (MEMO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION AND COMPEL AR- BITRATION )
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF JOINDER TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION )
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA RE PLTF'S REPLY TO DEFTS VIRACON'S AND QUANEX/TRUSEAL'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING )
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice (OF PLTF'S WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY )
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Notice (RE CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CON- FERENCE )
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARB ITRATION AND STAY LITIGATION )
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY LITIGATION )
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Motion to Compel (ARBITRATION AND STAY LITIGATION; SET 11/30/18 )
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Declaration (OF JOSEPH M. WAHL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION )
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT )
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Motion for an Order (TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; SET 10/19/18 )
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion for Leave))
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Reply (in support of plaintiff pointe assets motion for leave)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Declaration (of John R.Maley)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Joseph M. Wahl)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Opposition (Pltf's Ex Parte Request to Shorten Time)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order Shortening Time for Hearing Related to 128.7 Motion)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time ...))
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Motion re: (for Non-Monetary and Monetary Sanctions, Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Eric J. Nystrom)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (in support of plaintiff's ex parte)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Request to Change Hearing Date)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to confirm proper hearing)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex Parte Application for an Order to Confirm Proper Hearing D...))
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Opposition (to defendant's viracon, inc. motion to compel)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Cross-Defendants Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Recover Increased Travel Costs)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Eric J Nystrom in support of ex parte)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Opposition (to defendant viracon, inc. ex parte application)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Bryan M Gragg in support of plaintiff's ex parte)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (application for an order to show cause re pro hac vice)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Deborah L. Stough, CSR No. 8925 12/14/2018 for Department NCD
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel)))
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint, filed 10/05/2018...))
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Notice (of ruling)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Case Management Order Vacating Fi...))
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Notice (OF COURT'S NOTICE OF VACATING FEB 28 2019)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Counsel)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF FURTHER ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re: Status of Arbitration Conference))
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Arbitration))
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF HEARING)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRE)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Arbitration))
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Notice (OF RULINGS FROM JULY 13, 2020 HEARING ON COURT?S OSC REGARDING STATUS OF ARBITRATION)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Establishing a P...))
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Establishing a Protocol for the P...))
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Establishing a Protocol for the P...))
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00in Department D
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Motion for Order (Notice Of Motion And Motion To Vacate The Arbitrator's May 4, 2020 Ruling)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00in Department D
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration In Support Of Motion To Vacate)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order filed ...))
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Complex Civil Case Questionnaire;) of 08/20/2020)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Complex Civil Case Questionnaire;))
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Vacate the Arbitrator's May 4, 2...))
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order Minute Order of 8/19/2020 for Department D))
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Order (Denying Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For Protective Order)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For A Protective Order filed ...))
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ASSOCIATION OF CO-COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.