Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Albiso, Juanita, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Stuck, Gregory James, Stuck, Matthew, represented by Mckenna, J Justin, Navaratnasingham, Priya, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management119 days |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2019 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial554 days |
Last RefreshedJuly 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Motion to Consolidate
Date: September 23, 2020*Ex Parte
Date: September 01, 2020Motion to Consolidate
Date: October 28, 2020*Ex Parte
Date: February 18, 2021*Motion
Date: December 18, 2020*Other Pre-Disposition Hearing
Date: June 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference STATUS RE: DISMISSAL Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE MCADAM FOR REVIEW OF ORDER |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Party Dismissed AS TO PLTFF JUANITA ALBISO ONLY |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Other Pre-Disposition Hearing MINORS COMPROMISE FILED BY HECTOR LOMELI Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Granted FOR MINOR'S COMPROMISE |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH DISABILITY FILED BY HECTOR LOMELI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.