Case Last Refreshed: 16 hours ago
Burr, Tiffany, Ryan Burr, Tiffany Burr, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Le, Camnhung T., Esq., against Antonio Jose Mendoza, Gurney Trucking Inc, Gurney Trucking, Inc., Mendoza, Antonio Jose, represented by Schrader, Daniel P., Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Freeland, John D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Tort: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Stanislaus. The plaintiffs, Tiffany Burr and Ryan Burr, individually and as the guardian ad litem for their minor daughter Taylor Burr, are filing a complaint for personal injurie...
Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s)
Date: February 13, 2019Order Granted
Date: February 26, 2019Case Management Conference Statement
Date: June 26, 2019Summons Issued / Filed
Date: February 27, 2019Declaration
Date: March 09, 2021Declaration
Date: March 02, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: January 24, 2020Proposed Order
Date: March 02, 2021Opposition to Motion
Date: March 09, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: May 29, 2020Declaration
Date: August 12, 2021Demand for Jury Trial
Date: June 16, 2020Reply to Opposition
Date: August 12, 2021Declaration
Date: February 22, 2022Proposed Order
Date: July 23, 2021Proposed Judgment/Order
Date: February 13, 2019Proposed Order
Date: February 13, 2019Application for Ex Parte Hearing
Date: March 08, 2021Declaration
Date: February 22, 2022Reply to Opposition
Date: August 18, 2021Declaration
Date: April 30, 2021Application for Ex Parte Hearing
Date: February 22, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Declaration
Date: February 13, 2019Objection
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Declaration
Date: March 09, 2021Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Jury Instructions Not Given
Date: April 11, 2022Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: February 23, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Case Management Conference Statement
Date: January 10, 2020Declaration
Date: August 06, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: April 30, 2021Memorandum of Costs
Date: April 28, 2022Notice of Motion
Date: April 30, 2021Declaration
Date: July 23, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: June 21, 2019Declaration
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Motion
Date: July 28, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: April 30, 2021Proposed Order
Date: March 16, 2021Declaration
Date: March 15, 2022Application for Ex Parte Hearing
Date: February 22, 2022Pleading Document
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Declaration
Date: March 17, 2021Order After Hearing
Date: March 10, 2021Witness List
Date: March 15, 2022Order Approving Compromise
Date: May 10, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 02, 2019Proposed Order
Date: February 22, 2022Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
Date: March 22, 2021Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable)
Date: June 16, 2020Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable)
Date: June 21, 2019Pleading Document
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition to Motion
Date: March 01, 2022Notice Of Trial
Date: July 14, 2020Notice
Date: May 13, 2022Stipulation
Date: April 09, 2021Declaration
Date: March 15, 2022Declaration
Date: May 07, 2021Application for Ex Parte Hearing
Date: April 28, 2021Declaration
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Declaration
Date: March 15, 2022Notice
Date: March 04, 2022Declaration
Date: March 01, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Declaration
Date: March 15, 2022Declaration
Date: March 01, 2021Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: March 28, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 27, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 09, 2021Application for Ex Parte Hearing
Date: March 01, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: April 19, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Verdict by Jury
Date: April 11, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 02, 2021Witness List
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition to Motion
Date: March 01, 2022Objection
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Declaration
Date: March 15, 2022Declaration
Date: February 23, 2022Opposition
Date: March 08, 2021Notice
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Pleading Document
Date: March 15, 2022Proposed Order
Date: April 30, 2021Trial Requested After Settlement Conference
Date: February 28, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Order After Hearing
Date: April 29, 2021Declaration
Date: March 08, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: October 22, 2019Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Declaration
Date: July 28, 2021Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 17, 2021Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Notice
Date: June 23, 2022Proposed Order
Date: February 23, 2022Declaration
Date: March 24, 2022Pleading Document
Date: April 04, 2022Settlement Conference Statement
Date: March 26, 2021Proposed Order
Date: July 28, 2021Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise or Disposition
Date: May 04, 2022Ordered/Referred to Settlement Conference
Date: June 15, 2020Pleading Document
Date: April 04, 2022Opposition to Motion
Date: August 06, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: October 15, 2019Answer/General Denial
Date: April 11, 2019Proposed Order
Date: March 08, 2021Opposition
Date: April 05, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Exhibit List
Date: March 15, 2022Application for Ex Parte Hearing
Date: March 16, 2021Motion - In Limine
Date: March 24, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: July 28, 2021Opposition to Motion
Date: March 15, 2021Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Exhibit List
Date: March 15, 2022Request
Date: February 18, 2022Settlement Conference Statement
Date: February 18, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Notice
Date: March 04, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Jury Proposed Instructions
Date: March 15, 2022Separate Statement
Date: March 17, 2021Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full
Date: May 11, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 29, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 29, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 29, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 29, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Declaration
Date: March 15, 2022Invoice - Fiscal
Date: June 21, 2022Motion
Date: July 23, 2021Order
Date: February 23, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Response
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Notice
Date: March 29, 2022Judgment Jury Trial
Date: April 19, 2022Declaration
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Objection
Date: March 15, 2022Brief Filed
Date: March 15, 2022Request for Dismissal - Entire Action
Date: July 19, 2022Party Appeared by Audio/Video
Date: June 23, 2022Notice
Date: March 15, 2022Trial Requested After Settlement Conference
Date: April 05, 2021Evidence Received
Date: May 06, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Hearing on Motion for New Trial
Date: May 04, 2022Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service
Date: April 25, 2019Opposition
Date: March 17, 2022Opposition
Date: April 05, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Declaration
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Proposed Order
Date: March 17, 2021Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Motion
Date: July 23, 2021Order
Date: August 24, 2021Objection
Date: March 23, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Statement
Date: March 17, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Jury Sworn
Date: March 18, 2022Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: February 23, 2022Notice
Date: May 13, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Objection
Date: March 23, 2022Pleading Document
Date: March 24, 2022Pleading Document
Date: March 25, 2022Jury Instructions Given
Date: April 11, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Jury Proposed Instructions
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Proposed Order
Date: April 28, 2021Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Case Management Conference Statement
Date: May 14, 2020Declaration
Date: April 28, 2021Order
Date: February 23, 2022Notice
Date: April 28, 2021Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Declaration
Date: February 23, 2022Jury Grid
Date: April 11, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Order
Date: April 15, 2021Declaration
Date: March 01, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 23, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Declaration
Date: February 13, 2019Pleading Document
Date: April 05, 2021Juror Notes
Date: April 11, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Order
Date: February 23, 2022Declaration
Date: March 08, 2021Declaration
Date: March 15, 2021Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: March 09, 2021Application for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: February 27, 2019Declaration
Date: February 23, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Order After Hearing
Date: March 17, 2021Complaint
Date: February 13, 2019Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Notice
Date: February 10, 2020Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: March 17, 2021Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: May 03, 2022Declaration
Date: March 16, 2021Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition to Motion
Date: May 07, 2021Proposed Order
Date: March 09, 2021Settlement Conference Statement
Date: April 02, 2021Return Letter
Date: March 26, 2021Opposition to Motion
Date: August 12, 2021Declaration
Date: March 29, 2022Proposed Order
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration
Date: August 12, 2021Order Granted
Date: March 03, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 23, 2022Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: March 02, 2021Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Objection
Date: April 06, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Motion - In Limine
Date: March 15, 2022Opposition
Date: March 15, 2022Invoice - Fiscal
Date: April 08, 2022Jury Instructions Given
Date: April 11, 2022Jury Instructions Not Given
Date: April 11, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 02, 2021Answer/General Denial
Date: April 11, 2019Complaint
Date: February 13, 2019Opposition
Date: March 08, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 09, 2021Opposition to Motion
Date: March 09, 2021Opposition to Motion
Date: March 15, 2021Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: March 17, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: March 26, 2021Separate Statement
Date: March 17, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 17, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: March 19, 2021Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
Date: March 22, 2021Witness List Filed
Date: March 15, 2022Witness List Filed
Date: March 15, 2022Notice
Date: April 28, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: April 30, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: April 30, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: May 18, 2021Jury Trial
Date: March 18, 2022Motion: Other Pre-Disposition
Date: August 19, 2021Application and Order Appt of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: February 27, 2019Jury Trial
Date: March 15, 2022Jury Trial
Date: March 16, 2022Settlement Conference
Date: February 28, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: March 03, 2022Jury Trial
Date: March 17, 2022Motion: Other Pre-Disposition
Date: March 03, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: March 12, 2021Exparte Appointment Hearing
Date: April 29, 2021Settlement Conference
Date: April 05, 2021Exparte Appointment Hearing
Date: March 09, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: February 10, 2020Exparte Appointment Hearing
Date: March 17, 2021Exparte Appointment Hearing
Date: March 02, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: November 12, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: June 15, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: July 08, 2019Jury Trial
Date: March 22, 2022Jury Trial
Date: March 23, 2022Jury Trial
Date: March 24, 2022Jury Trial
Date: April 06, 2022Jury Trial
Date: March 30, 2022Jury Trial
Date: March 29, 2022Jury Trial
Date: March 25, 2022Jury Trial
Date: April 05, 2022Jury Trial
Date: April 11, 2022Jury Trial
Date: April 07, 2022Jury Trial
Date: April 08, 2022Motion for New Trial
Date: June 23, 2022Proof of Deposited Funds Hearing
Date: June 23, 2022Exparte Appointment Hearing
Date: February 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Party Appeared by Audio/Video | |
June 23, 2022 | Hearing | Motion for New Trial | |
June 23, 2022 | Proof of Deposited Funds Hearing | ||
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Invoice - Fiscal | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Approving Compromise |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.