Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Campbell, Travis, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Cross, Orestes, against Does 1 To 20, Hathaway, Kimberly, Hathaway-Siegel, Kimberly, Hoffman, John, represented by Danielson, Catherine, Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ronald Evans Quidachay presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald Evans Quidachay Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 01, 2011 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions667 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time710 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The case number is CUD-11-639244 and it was filed by Wesley G. Ramirez. The case involves Travis Campbell as the plaintiff and Kimberly Hathaway et al as the defendants. The request for dismi...
DECLARATION OF JOHN HOFFMAN FILED BY DEFENDANT HATHAWAY, KIMBERLY HOFFMAN, JOHN
Date: August 05, 2013DECLARATION OF THOMAS J. O'BRIEN FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAMPBELL, TRAVIS
Date: October 11, 2013DECLARATION OF CATHERINE DANIELSON FILED BY DEFENDANT HATHAWAY, KIMBERLY HOFFMAN, JOHN
Date: August 05, 2013ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ATTORNEY FEES
Date: August 06, 2013DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY HATHAWAY FILED BY DEFENDANT HATHAWAY, KIMBERLY HOFFMAN, JOHN
Date: August 05, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HOFFMAN, JOHN HATHAWAY-SIEGEL, KIMBERLY
Date: November 07, 2011RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAMPBELL, TRAVIS
Date: July 10, 2013OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR SUMM JUDGMNT FILED BY DEFENDANT HATHAWAY, KIMBERLY HOFFMAN, JOHN
Date: August 05, 2013DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT
Date: August 29, 2013ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.
Date: July 29, 2013ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER
Date: August 23, 2013OBJECTION TO DEFTS MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAMPBELL, TRAVIS
Date: October 11, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF THOMAS J. O'BRIEN FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAMPBELL, TRAVIS | |
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO DEFTS MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAMPBELL, TRAVIS | |
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JASON BRYAN FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAMPBELL, TRAVIS | |
September 30, 2013 | Hearing |
UD JURY TRIALS
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
September 27, 2013 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM UD JURY CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-30-2013 - DISMISSAL ON FILE.(D501) | |
September 26, 2013 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
September 16, 2013 | Hearing |
UD JURY TRIALS
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-26-2013 - DISMISSAL ON FILE. (D501) | |
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $19,811.25 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE OCT-03-2013,, (SUMMARY) FILED BY DEFENDANT HATHAWAY, KIMBERLY HOFFMAN, JOHN | |
September 12, 2013 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.