Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Super Parking Inc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Peebles, Scott, against Does 1 To 10, Gozun, Fernando, Nepomuceno, Imelda, represented by Hashim, Che L., Kim, Dae Hee, Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ronald Evans Quidachay presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald Evans Quidachay Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2008 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Commercial |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions134 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time254 days |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT NEPOMUCENO, IMELDA
Date: November 06, 2008ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: June 03, 2009REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, AS TO DEFENDANT GOZUN, FERNANDO
Date: December 09, 2008SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF SUPER PARKING INC
Date: June 16, 2009NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: October 28, 2008DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, AS TO DEFENDANT GOZUN, FERNANDO
Date: March 11, 2009NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL
Date: May 26, 2009REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, AS TO DEFENDANT GOZUN, FERNANDO
Date: December 16, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUPER PARKING INC | |
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $2,289.05 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE JUL-20-2009, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUPER PARKING INC | |
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SUPER PARKING INC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT NEPOMUCENO, IMELDA GOZUN, FERNANDO THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 1645 PACIFIC AVE. 1ST FLR. SF, CA 94109 $83,651.72 RENT, TOTAL JUDGMENT $83,651.72, LEASE FORFEITED, PLUS COST PER MEMO.(SEE SCANNED DOC) | |
June 23, 2009 | Hearing |
COURT TRIAL
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
June 23, 2009 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM COURT TRIAL CALENDAR ON JUN-23-2009 IN DEPT. 501. JUDGEMENT FOR THE PLAINTIFF. PREVAILING PARTY TO PREPARE ORDER. JUDGE R. QUIDACHAY, CLERK R. PASCUAL, REPORTER R. BALIAN # 5220. | |
June 22, 2009 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: JAMES J. MCBRIDE |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event | MASTER COURT CALENDAR OF JUN-22-2009 ASSIGNED TO COURT TRIAL CALENDAR ON JUN-23-2009 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 501, RONALD E QUIDACHAY. JUDGE: JAMES MCBRIDE; CLERK: E. BURA; REPORTER: KENT GUBBINE, CSR# 5797 (206) | |
June 16, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF SUPER PARKING INC | |
June 16, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, AS TO DEFENDANT GOZUN, FERNANDO | |
June 10, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUPER PARKING INC SERVED JUN-08-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT GOZUN, FERNANDO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.