Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Luiz, Paul 4149 Sante Fe San Luis Obispo, Ca, filed a(n) Money case against Luiz, Paul 4149 Sante Fe San Luis Obispo, Ca, Yelp, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2021 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUIZ, PAUL
Date: December 28, 2021DECLARATION RE:REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUIZ, PAUL
Date: December 28, 2021REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY DEFENDANT YELP
Date: October 15, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: November 08, 2021REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUIZ, PAUL
Date: October 19, 2021ORDER RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM **GRANTED**
Date: October 20, 2021ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER **DENIED** -COPIES MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Date: October 15, 2021ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL
Date: January 24, 2022DECLARATION RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUIZ, PAUL
Date: October 19, 2021DECLARATION RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY DEFENDANT YELP
Date: September 27, 2021ORDER RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM **DENIED-UNTIMELY**
Date: October 04, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUIZ, PAUL AS TO DEFENDANT YELP
Date: August 03, 2021ORDER RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM **GRANTED**
Date: September 27, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: January 27, 2022SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE HEARING SET FOR JAN-06-2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 525
Date: November 23, 2021CASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD AND EXHIBITS TRANSFERRED
Date: November 12, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT YELP MAILED TO RESPONDENT LUIZ, PAUL
Date: November 12, 2021ORDER RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM **GRANTED**
Date: October 18, 2021DECLARATION RE:REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUIZ, PAUL
Date: October 01, 2021DECLARATION RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY DEFENDANT YELP
Date: October 15, 2021REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUIZ, PAUL
Date: October 01, 2021DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUIZ, PAUL AS TO DEFENDANT YELP
Date: August 03, 2021REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY DEFENDANT YELP
Date: September 27, 2021SC-105 REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER AS TO PLAINTIFF LUIZ, PAUL
Date: August 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORD REMANDED TO SMALL CLAIMS (PLAINTIFF[2] & DEFENDANT[2 EXHIBITS RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION) | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT APPELLANT YELP TAKE NOTHING FROM RESPONDENT LUIZ, PAUL THE COURT DISMISSES PAUL LUIZ DBA AMPAC REPAIR'S ACTION IN FAVOR OF THE PARTIES' JUNE 22, 2014 TERMS OF SERVICE AGREEMENT, WHICH CONTAINS A MANDATORY ARBITRATION CLAUSE. [PLEASE SEE JUDGMENT FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS] PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS RECEIVED NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
January 27, 2022 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIM APPEALS
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
January 27, 2022 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS CIVIL SPECIAL SETTING CALENDAR OF JAN-27-2022 - ASSIGNED TO SMALL CLAIM APPEALS ON JAN-27-2022 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 504, JUDGE GARRETT WONG. (206) | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL CALENDAR OF JAN-27-2022 TRANSFERRED TO DEPT. 206 FOR REASSIGNMENT. (206) | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-27-2022 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 504 | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL CALENDAR OF JAN-27-2022 - SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT REVERSED. YELP DOES NOT OWE PAUL LUIZ ANY MONEY. THE JUDGMENT ON APPEAL IS FINAL AND REPLACES THE SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT SIGNED NOV-01-2022. EXHIBITS WILL BE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO CCP 1952. | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.