Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
American Civil Liberties Union Of Northern, Asian Americans Advancing Justice Asian Law Caucus, California, Council On American-Islamic Relations, Council On Americanislamic Relations, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Writs Of Mandate Or Proh., Certi., Etc./Admin. Agen case represented by Anderson, David L., against City And County Of San Fracnisco, Scott, William, United States Of America, represented by Snodgrass, Wayne Kessler, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ethan P. Schulman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEthan P. Schulman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2019 |
CategoryWrits Of Mandate Or Proh., Certi., Etc./Admin. Agen |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions162 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time169 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiff/petitioner is Asian Americans Advancing Justice, et al., and the defendant/respondent is the City and County of...
ORDER DENYING PETITIONERS' MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: August 29, 2019ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE A158317 DIV 3 [SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS]
Date: October 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100090596) FILED BY PETITIONER ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE ASIAN LAW CAUCUS COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS CALIFORNIA AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100090257) FILED BY PETITIONER ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE ASIAN LAW CAUCUS COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS CALIFORNIA AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100090257) | |
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE A158317 DIV 3 [SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS] | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DENYING PETITIONERS' MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE (TRANSACTION ID # 64149027) FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRACNISCO SCOTT, WILLIAM IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS THE SAN FRANCISCO POLICE DEPARTMENT CHIEF | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PETITIONERS' MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, DEPT. 302, PREVIOUSLY SUBMITTED ON AUG-27-2019, THE COURT NOW HEREBY DENIES PETITIONERS' MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE. (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.) JUDGE: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN. (302/EPS) | |
August 27, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion For Peremptory Writ Of Mandate
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 302, THE COURT TAKES UNDER SUBMISSION PETITIONERS ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE, ASIAN LAW CAUCUS, COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS, CALIFORNIA, AND AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA'S MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE. JUDGE: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN; CLERK: SEAN KANE; COURT REPORTER: MARIA A. TORREANO, CSR#8600, E-MAIL: MARIA.TORREANO@GMAIL.COM (302/EPS) | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-27-2019 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.