Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Robles, Yesenia, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Heraldez Law Pc, against Does 1-20, Inclusive, Himnel Usa Incorporated, Himnel Usa Incorporated Dba St. Mary'S Montessori School, represented by California Business Lawyer & Company Lawyer, Inc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2023 |
CategoryWrongful Termination Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 11, 2024Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 26, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 05, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 05, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: July 05, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: July 05, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 22, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 05, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: July 17, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Declaration re:
Date: August 24, 2023Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: August 24, 2023Response Filed to:
Date: September 19, 2023Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Reply Filed
Date: October 12, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 23, 2023Objection Filed
Date: October 24, 2023Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 09, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 21, 2023Motion for Protective Order
Date: November 21, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: November 21, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 27, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: November 27, 2023Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: November 29, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: November 29, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 04, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: December 04, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: December 04, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 26, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: January 09, 2024Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 12, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 16, 2024Affidavit of Prejudice filed pursuant to CCP170.6
Date: January 16, 2024Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: January 24, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
January 25, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Copy of Minute Order |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date Respondent and real party in interest are invited to file a response to the petition for writ of mandate on or before 2/13/24. The proceedings are STAYED pending the determination of the petition on its merits or further order of this court. |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Orders Matter Stayed Appeals order dated 01/24/2024 |
|
January 17, 2024 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
January 16, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Minute order |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Prejudice filed pursuant to CCP170.6 | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Peremptory Challenge Under CCP 170.6 Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.