Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The Red Brennan Group, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate Unlimited case against Does 1 Through 50, Jimenez, Michael, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Winston Keh presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2022 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a verified petition for a writ of mandate and a complaint for injunctive and declaratory relief. The petitioner, The Red Brennan Group, is seeking to protect the integrity of the democratic process and the will of the electors of Sa...
Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: June 02, 2023Notice Filed
Date: February 02, 2023Declaration re:
Date: November 21, 2022Reply Filed
Date: December 08, 2022Judgment Filed
Date: May 23, 2023Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript On Appeal Filed
Date: May 05, 2023Notice Filed
Date: March 10, 2023Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: March 10, 2023Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: December 02, 2022Answer Filed
Date: November 28, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 01, 2022Answer Filed
Date: November 16, 2022Reply Filed
Date: December 02, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 01, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: November 01, 2022Amended Petition Filed
Date: October 25, 2022Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: March 20, 2023Notice Filed
Date: December 14, 2022Reply Filed
Date: December 08, 2022Points and Authorities in Support of Motion Rcvd & Filed
Date: December 02, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: November 21, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: November 21, 2022Reply Filed
Date: September 30, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: September 29, 2022Petition Filed (Civil)
Date: September 28, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: September 28, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 30, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 28, 2022Reply Filed
Date: October 03, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 07, 2022Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: October 14, 2022Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: October 24, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 01, 2022Summons Issued on
Date: October 25, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 02, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: December 23, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 27, 2023Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: March 10, 2023Notice To Reporter For Estimate Of Costs Filed and Mailed
Date: April 04, 2023Notice of Election to Proceed Pursuant to CRC 8.124 Filed
Date: March 21, 2023Ntc of Cost for Clerk/Reporter Trans on Appeal Filed/Mailed
Date: April 18, 2023Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: May 25, 2023Record on Appeal Certified to Reviewing Court & Parties
Date: June 05, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Record on Appeal Certified to Reviewing Court & Parties | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Reporters Transcripts on Appeal Received | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date RPI's motion for calendar preference and shortening time for service and filing appellant's briefs is GRANTED. Request to expedite reporter's transcript is DENIED. |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Filed | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Denied | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript On Appeal Filed | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
GC70632- Reporters Transcript Trust Fee paid |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
GC70632- Reporters Transcript Trust Fee waived per GC 6103 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.