Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Anzora, Joseph, filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited case represented by Bibiyan Law Group, Pc, Bibiyan Law Group, P.C., against Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive, Inland Behavioral And Health Services, Inc., represented by Greene & Roberts, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Cohn, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCohn, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 22, 2022 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Bernardino, Central District. The plaintiff, Joseph Anzora, is an aggrieved employee and is representing all other aggrieved employees. The defendant is Inland Be...
Case Management Conference Electronically Filed
Date: October 13, 2023Notice Filed
Date: December 05, 2022Motion re:
Date: June 05, 2023Case Management Conference Electronically Filed
Date: October 12, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 22, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 14, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: December 14, 2022Motion re:
Date: December 14, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 18, 2023Notice Filed
Date: July 21, 2023Request Filed Re:
Date: June 05, 2023Declaration re:
Date: June 05, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 07, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: October 14, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 15, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: December 14, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: October 11, 2022Answer Filed
Date: December 14, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: August 22, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 22, 2022Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: July 28, 2023Tentative decisions
Date: July 28, 2023Report Filed
Date: June 05, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: December 14, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: June 05, 2023Reply Filed
Date: July 21, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: October 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
October 18, 2023 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Electronically filed | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Electronically Filed PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT (Comment) |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed Rocio Gonzalez |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative decisions Motion to Stay Case |
|
July 28, 2023 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
July 26, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
July 26, 2023 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of errata re: Notice of motion and motion by defendant Inland Behavioral and Healthservices, Inc. to stay case, pending outcome of earlier filed and related case. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.