Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Chaney, Steven R, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Aaron F Garcia, against Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Green, Brenda Lee, represented by Sheldon, Scott J, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Mann, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMann, Douglas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 25, 2022 |
CategoryOther Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Steven R. Chaney against Brenda Lee Green and fictitiously named defendants. The plaintiff alleges three causes of action: breach of fiduciary duty, money had and received, and accounting. The plaintiff is an individual res...
Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: August 09, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 09, 2022Objection Filed
Date: January 04, 2024Motion to Strike
Date: November 30, 2022Reply Filed
Date: January 23, 2023Amended Petition Filed
Date: December 19, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 25, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: September 09, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: December 01, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: October 26, 2022Notice Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 07, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 14, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 25, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: March 28, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: November 20, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 23, 2024Notice of Hearing
Date: August 04, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 09, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: July 25, 2022Statement of
Date: August 09, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Notice Filed
Date: September 14, 2023Reply Filed
Date: January 23, 2023Reply Filed
Date: November 27, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 30, 2023Objection Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: January 09, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: March 03, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 10, 2023Motion Filed
Date: August 09, 2023Proof of Service
Date: September 14, 2023Reply Filed
Date: August 31, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: December 06, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 23, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2024 |
Department F2 - Fontana
Judge: Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice |
||
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Reassignment |
|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Hearing regarding 12/23/23 |
|
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Objection Filed OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Filed FIRST AMENDED PET FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY, MONEY,ACCOUNTING |
|
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories (Set One) |
|
December 05, 2023 |
Department F2 - Fontana
Judge: Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice |
||
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE |
|
November 22, 2023 |
Department F2 - Fontana
Judge: Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.