Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rahman, Fatima, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Augustine Law Corp, against Does 1 To 50, Ewing, Alyson, represented by Keith L. Shoji & Associates, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 10, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case. The plaintiffs are Fatima Rahman and Saad Rahman, represented by attorney Stacy Augustine. The defendant is Alyson Ewing. The jurisdiction is the Superior Court of Califor...
Complaint Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Answer Filed
Date: November 23, 2022Application and Order for Guardian Ad Litem filed. GAL is:
Date: January 07, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 23, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 10, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: January 04, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 28, 2022Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: March 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
August 15, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
May 09, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
January 20, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed filed by defendant Alyson Ewing on Complaint filed 11/10/2021 |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed | |
October 12, 2022 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Fax Received | |
July 05, 2022 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.