Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Barkan, James, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Theida Salazar, against County Of San Bernardino, Deputy Haas, Deputy Mccarthy, Deputy Moore, Does 1 Through 50, (total of 5) See All represented by Law Offices Of Pelayes & Bolander, Apc, Law Offices Of Pelayes &Yu, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas S Garza presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 10, 2021 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJune 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Notice Filed
Date: January 12, 2022Answer Filed
Date: December 20, 2021Answer Filed
Date: February 04, 2022Declaration re:
Date: April 27, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: May 31, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 10, 2021Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: June 05, 2024Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 10, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: May 03, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 02, 2022Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: June 05, 2024Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Doc
Date: April 27, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: November 10, 2021Declaration re:
Date: April 27, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 09, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: November 15, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: May 16, 2022Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: June 05, 2024Declaration re:
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
June 13, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
June 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE, ARGUMENT AND OPINION RELATED TO UNPLED CLAIMS AND THEORIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JOSEPH N. BOLANDER; [PROPOSED] ORDERendants' (Motions) |
|
June 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EXPERT OPINIONS OR BASES FOR EXPERT OPINIONS THAT WERE NOT DISCLOSED IN DEPOSITION; DECLARATION OF JOSEPH N. BOLANDER; [PROPOSED] ORDER (Motions) |
|
June 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE, ARGUMENT AND OPINION RELATED TO DEFENDANTS LAWFUL USE OF DECEPTION IN EXECUTING THE SEARCH WARRANT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JOSEPH N. BOLAN (Motions) |
|
May 13, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
May 09, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address Filed | |
October 23, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
October 19, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.