Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Doe #10, Doe #11, Doe #12, Doe #13, Doe #14, (total of 19) See All filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited case against Ascension Ventures Ii Ewc, Inc., Ascension Ventures, Inc., Does 1 -200 Inclusive, Does 1-400, Inclusive, Fortyfour Stones, Llc, (total of 9) See All represented by Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara, Gordon Rees Scully Mansukahani Llp, Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, Llp, Sack, Ricketts & Case , Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas S Garza presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas S Garza Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2019 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 17, 2020Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: March 10, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: May 26, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 15, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 13, 2021Stipulation Filed re:
Date: May 19, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: December 31, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 08, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 31, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 08, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 11, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: December 13, 2023Comment:
Date: January 08, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 13, 2021Notice Filed
Date: November 20, 2020Answer Filed
Date: January 21, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: January 26, 2022Declaration re:
Date: March 18, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 09, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 15, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: August 28, 2019Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: January 28, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 28, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 12, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 29, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 20, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 14, 2020Comment:
Date: December 18, 2020Motion re:
Date: November 05, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 28, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: December 13, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 30, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 09, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 22, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 05, 2020Motion re:
Date: December 07, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: November 03, 2020Motion re:
Date: November 03, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: November 05, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 30, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 03, 2020Declaration re:
Date: December 08, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 11, 2020Reply Filed
Date: December 11, 2020Objection Filed
Date: December 08, 2020Motion re:
Date: March 18, 2021Reply Filed
Date: December 11, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 05, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 23, 2021Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: August 29, 2022Declaration re:
Date: December 11, 2020Proof of Service
Date: March 23, 2021Notice Filed
Date: July 22, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 18, 2021Motion re:
Date: December 13, 2023Proof of Service
Date: December 13, 2023Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: December 22, 2021Notice Filed
Date: April 19, 2022Answer Filed
Date: January 20, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 21, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: June 14, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 07, 2021Comment:
Date: March 30, 2021Summons Issued on
Date: October 01, 2020Proof of Service
Date: March 10, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 21, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: July 07, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 19, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed re:
Date: September 13, 2021Comment:
Date: December 18, 2020Comment:
Date: April 20, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: January 20, 2022Judgment Filed
Date: May 21, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: October 01, 2020Declaration re:
Date: March 10, 2021Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: March 21, 2024Comment:
Date: March 30, 2021Comment:
Date: March 30, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 15, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Non Opposition To The Motion Filed PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF NON- OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO AMEND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 473 |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF ROBERT W. THOMPSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP 473 |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO AMEND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP 473 |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion re: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO AMEND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP 473 |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Declaration of Service via electronic means |
|
November 07, 2022 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed Proof of service regarding request for dismissal |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed WIth Prejudice- Entire Action, filed by plaintiff on 08/29/22 |
|
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Disassociation of Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.