Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
Abdi, Abdifatah Mohamed, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bowen Hatch Law, Pc, Wood Law Firm, against Does 1-20, Kal Freight, Inc., Kalif, Kader Ismail, Pro Tec, Inc., represented by Heath & Yuen, Apc, Hosp Gilbert & Associates, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jeffrey R Erickson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Court's Notice of Continuance sent.
Date: December 27, 2021Separate Statement ISO Motion Filed Electronically
Date: January 11, 2024Memo of Points & Authorities ISO Motion Filed Electronically
Date: January 11, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 29, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: January 11, 2024Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 18, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: January 14, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: January 14, 2022Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: February 02, 2024Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: February 07, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 23, 2022Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Answer Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 29, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 14, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: January 19, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: February 08, 2024Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: February 13, 2024Order Filed Re:
Date: March 14, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 30, 2022Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Notice Sent re:
Date: December 15, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 15, 2022Index of Exhibits
Date: December 30, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: January 13, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 16, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: August 16, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: December 30, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 16, 2021Motion re:
Date: December 30, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: September 10, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 10, 2021Notice Filed
Date: January 10, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 31, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 31, 2023Reply Filed
Date: February 07, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Declaration re:
Date: February 24, 2023Index of Exhibits
Date: May 12, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Declaration re:
Date: May 04, 2023Motion Re: Summary Adjudication
Date: February 24, 2023Index of Exhibits
Date: May 04, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: February 24, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: February 24, 2023Objection Filed
Date: May 12, 2023Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: March 09, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: April 26, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Objection Filed
Date: May 12, 2023Objection Filed
Date: May 12, 2023Reply Filed
Date: May 12, 2023Objection Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Objection Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: September 28, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 23, 2023Reply Filed
Date: May 12, 2023Objection Filed
Date: May 12, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: May 12, 2023Commission to Take Deposition Out-of-State Filed
Date: July 17, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: September 23, 2021Compendium of Exhibits ISO Motion Filed Electronically
Date: January 11, 2024Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: October 01, 2021Request Filed Re:
Date: October 08, 2021Declaration of Good Faith Attempt to Meet & Confer
Date: November 01, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 30, 2021Index of Exhibits
Date: November 30, 2021Declaration re:
Date: November 30, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: November 30, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: November 30, 2021Index of Exhibits
Date: November 30, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: November 30, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: November 30, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: November 30, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: November 30, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 22, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: December 22, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: December 22, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 22, 2021Declaration re:
Date: November 30, 2021Motion Re: Summary Adjudication
Date: January 11, 2024Reply to Motion re:
Date: December 28, 2021Reply to Motion re:
Date: December 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
April 26, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
April 25, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
March 29, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
March 28, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed (Notices) | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Separate Statement ISO Motion Filed Electronically |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.