Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Souter, Amy, Souter, Scott, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Flesher Schaff & Schroeder, Inc, Schaff, Jeffrey Michael, Schaff Law Group, Inc., Schroeder Schaff & Low Inc, against City Of Hesperia, Does 1-20, Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Sandra, represented by Bordin Semmer Llp, Ford Walker Haggerty & Behar, Law Offices Of Thomas D Pokladowski & Assoc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Winston Keh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWinston Keh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Answer Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 08, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: February 08, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 27, 2023Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: February 01, 2022Amended Document Filed re:
Date: August 19, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 11, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 11, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: February 22, 2024Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 22, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 01, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: August 05, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: September 01, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: February 28, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 28, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: August 05, 2022Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: March 21, 2024Separate Statement Filed
Date: August 05, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 26, 2024Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Reply Filed
Date: October 03, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: March 25, 2024Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: February 22, 2024Complaint Filed
Date: August 11, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: October 24, 2023Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: June 01, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: October 10, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 27, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 27, 2022Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: January 11, 2024Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: February 08, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 03, 2023Answer Filed
Date: February 01, 2022Separate Statement ISO Motion Filed Electronically
Date: February 22, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2024 |
Department V11 - Victorville
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
April 09, 2024 |
Department V11 - Victorville
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Electronically filed |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration Filed | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Separate Statement ISO Motion Filed Electronically | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff |
|
November 08, 2023 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.