Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Credit Corp Solutions Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Offices Of Patenaude & Felix Apc, against Does 1 Through 15, Lopez, Sylvia, represented by Litigation Practice Group Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Ronald J Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 02, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: July 13, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: September 16, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 16, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 12, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: January 14, 2022Answer Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.