Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Doe, Jane Bns, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Manly, Stewart & Finaldi, against Barstow Unified School District, Doe 1, Does 2 To 100, represented by Cummings, Mcclorey, David & Acho, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald Alvarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice Filed
Date: June 12, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: February 27, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 06, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 31, 2023Miscellaneous Opposition Filed
Date: July 17, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: November 17, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 02, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 28, 2023Objection Filed
Date: September 05, 2023Motion re:
Date: July 11, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 20, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 12, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 23, 2023Notice Filed
Date: July 13, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 06, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 16, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: December 04, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: August 28, 2023Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: October 26, 2023Motion for Order
Date: January 17, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 10, 2022Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: December 04, 2023Reply Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: October 10, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 13, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: September 11, 2023Declaration re:
Date: July 11, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 27, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: March 11, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: November 18, 2021Ex Parte Order Filed
Date: January 13, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 08, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 11, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 11, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: October 26, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: March 03, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 15, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 25, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: July 08, 2022Ex Parte Order Filed
Date: October 28, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 26, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 12, 2022Answer Filed
Date: May 02, 2022Notice Sent re:
Date: June 02, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 01, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: June 02, 2021Answer Filed
Date: December 16, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: January 12, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 08, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: August 31, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: December 11, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: February 09, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
August 15, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
March 25, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
March 21, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
March 11, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically PLAINTIFF JANE BNS DOE S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BARSTOW UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT S MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Government Exemption - Fees Waived pursuant to GC 6103.5 for issuing two subpoenas. |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Government Exemption - Fees Waived pursuant to GC 6103.5 motion fee |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce her psychological and psychiatric records filed by defendant Barstow USD on 12.11.23 |
|
December 05, 2023 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.